Grimes et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John Grimes, Linda Phelps and Linda F. Phelps
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Cororporation, General Electric Company, Crane Co. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv08361
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441as
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2019. (kv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/20/2019) (kv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). This case is to be tried to a jury. All Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2019. All Expert Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/21/2019) (kv)
May 13, 2019 Filing 60 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicole M. Kozin dated May 13, 2019. Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Kozin, Nicole)
April 2, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. Document filed by Crane Co..(Pehush, Tara)
March 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Deposition due by 7/26/2019., Expert Discovery due by 7/26/2019., Fact Discovery due by 5/24/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (mro)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting #57 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All fact discovery is to be completed no later than May 24, 2019. Depositions shall be completed by May 24, 2019. All expert discovery, including disclosure of expert reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 7/26/2019. Expert Witness depositions to be completed by 7/26/2019. Referral to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. The parties seek the above-noted referral at a later date. This case is to be tried to a jury. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for June 28, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/25/2019) (mro) Modified on 3/26/2019 (mro).
March 20, 2019 Filing 57 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery from March 25, 2019 to May 24, 2019 addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicole M. Kozin dated March 20, 2019. Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Kozin, Nicole)
March 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel John Woodard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Linda F. Phelps, As Administratix of the Estate of John J. Grimes, deceased. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 56 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #55 Amended Complaint, against CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Linda F. Phelps, As Administratix of the Estate of John J. Grimes, deceased. Related document: #55 Amended Complaint,.(Woodard, Daniel) Modified on 3/20/2019 (pc).
March 19, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Linda Phelps, As Administratix of the Estate of John J. Grimes, deceased added. Party added pursuant to #55 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Linda Phelps, As Administratix of the Estate of John J. Grimes, deceased. Related document: #55 Amended Complaint,.(Woodard, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Woodard to RE-FILE re: Document No. #55 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Add Linda F. Phelps to CM ECF with the party text "As Administratix of the Estate of John J. Grimes, deceased". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Linda Phelps, John Grimes.(Woodard, Daniel) Modified on 3/19/2019 (pc).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's motion to amend is hereby granted. This resolves Dkt. No. 47. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/15/2019) (kv)
January 15, 2019 Filing 53 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicole M. Kozin dated January 15, 2019 re: Proposed Amended Complaint. Document filed by Crane Co..(Kozin, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion to amend its complaint in light of the death of Mr. Grimes. Dkt. No. 47. On or before January 15, 2019, Defendants shall put in a letter indicating whether they consent to Plaintiff's proposed amendments. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2019) (cf)
January 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Fact Discovery due by 3/25/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:(Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (cf)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' request to extend the deadline for fact discovery to March 25, 2019, is hereby granted. The conference currently scheduled for February 15, 2019, is adjourned to May 3, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall submit a letter on or before April 26, 2019, stating whether they seek referral to a magistrate judge for settlement. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2019) (cf)
January 9, 2019 Filing 50 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicole M> Kozin dated January 9, 2019. Document filed by Crane Co..(Kozin, Nicole)
January 9, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Woodard, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Woodard in Support re: #47 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendants FW and GE's Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Second Amended Complaint)(Woodard, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 47 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Woodard, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #41 Motion to Stay. Foster Wheeler's motion to stay is therefore DENIED. The parties are advised that they may provide the Court with further briefing on the impact, if any, of the Supreme Court's opinion in De Vries once that opinion has been released. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/7/2019) (cf)
November 2, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #41 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Vega, Dennis)
October 26, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #41 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Woodard, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Woodard in Opposition re: #41 MOTION to Stay .. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - John Grimes Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Relevant Portions of Deposition of John J. Grimes, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law, McAfee, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Consolidated Statement of Undisputed Facts, Hammel)(Woodard, Daniel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #41 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Vega, Dennis)
October 12, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay . Document filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Vega, Dennis)
September 18, 2018 Initial Pre trial Conference held. Case Management Plan entered. See transcript for complete details. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (qs)
September 17, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Gilmartin, JR on behalf of CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. (Gilmartin, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All fact discovery is to be completed no later than 1/11/2019. Deposition due by 1/11/2019. All expert discovery, including disclosure of expert reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 2/25/2019. This case is to be tried to a jury. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/14/2018) (mro) (mro)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the initial pretrial conference presently scheduled for September 14, 2018 at 3:45 p.m. is hereby adjourned to September 14, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/12/2018) (jca)
September 7, 2018 Filing 37 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Woodard, Daniel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from BRENDAN J. TULLY dated 9/7/2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference - Joint Letter. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Woodard, Daniel)
August 16, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dennis Enrique tabentabnebauVega on behalf of CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. New Address: Tanenbaum Keale LLP, Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Suite 1301, Newark, NJ, United States 07102, 9732420002. (tabentabnebauVega, Dennis)
August 16, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. New Address: Tanenbaum Keale LLP, Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Suite 1301, Newark, NJ, United States 07102, 9732420002. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
August 16, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. New Address: Tanenbaum Keale LLP, Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Suite 1301, Newark, NJ, United States 07102, 9732420002. (Okpewho, Afigo)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial pretrial conference presently scheduled for August 10, 2018, is hereby adjourned to September 14, 2018, at 3:45 pm. The materials described in docket No. 19 are due seven days before the conference. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 03:45 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/1/2018) (js)
August 1, 2018 Filing 31 FOURTH LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel J. Woodard dated August 1, 2018. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Woodard, Daniel)
July 23, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. Document filed by Crane Co..(Pehush, Tara)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19. filed by Crane Co. Defendant Crane Co. ("Crane") moves to require joinder of necessary parties under Rule I 9. See Dkt. No. 7. (As further set forth in this Order.) For the foregoing reasons, the motion for joinder is denied. This resolves Docket Number 7. The initial pretrial conference remains scheduled for August 10, 2018. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/21/2018) (cf)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial pretrial conference is hereby adjourned to August 10, 2018 at 3:45pm. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 03:45 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/20/2018) (cf)
June 20, 2018 Filing 27 THIRD LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel J. Woodard dated 06/20/2018. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Woodard, Daniel)
April 20, 2018 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicole M. Kozin dated April 20, 2018 re: outstanding motion. Document filed by Crane Co..(Kozin, Nicole)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial pretrial conference presently scheduled for April 27, 2018, is hereby adjourned to July 6, 2018, at 3:15pm. The materials described at Docket Number 19 are due seven days before the conference. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/6/2018 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/11/2018) (mml)
April 11, 2018 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel J. Woodard dated 4.11.18. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Woodard, Daniel)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference presently scheduled for February 16, 2018, is hereby adjourned to April 27, 2018, at 4:00pm. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/8/18) (yv)
February 7, 2018 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brendan J. Tully dated February 7, 2018. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps.(Tully, Brendan)
December 8, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19. . Document filed by Crane Co.. (Pehush, Tara)
December 7, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/7/2017) (ap)
December 1, 2017 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19. . Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Woodard, Daniel)
December 1, 2017 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Woodard in Opposition re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19.. Document filed by John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodard, Daniel)
November 28, 2017 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by CBS Corporation.(Vega, Dennis)
November 28, 2017 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc., Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation.(Vega, Dennis)
November 27, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel John Woodard on behalf of John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Woodard, Daniel)
November 17, 2017 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crane Co..(Pehush, Tara)
November 17, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Oxamendi on behalf of Crane Co.. (Oxamendi, David)
November 17, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Melody Kozin on behalf of Crane Co.. (Kozin, Nicole)
November 17, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Lynne Pehush on behalf of Crane Co.. (Pehush, Tara)
November 17, 2017 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19. . Document filed by Crane Co.. (Pehush, Tara)
November 17, 2017 Filing 8 DECLARATION of TARA L. PEHUSH in Support re: #7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19.. Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pehush, Tara)
November 17, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder / NOTICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION TO REQUIRE JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES UNDER RULE 19. Document filed by Crane Co..(Pehush, Tara)
November 17, 2017 Filing 6 JOINDER to join re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,, /DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF JOINDER OF REMOVAL. Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 4 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 4 (Part 4), #8 Exhibit 4 (Part 5), #9 Exhibit 4 (Part 6), #10 Exhibit 4 (Part 7), #11 Exhibit 4 (Part 8), #12 Exhibit 4 (Part 9), #13 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #16 Exhibit 5 (Part 4), #17 Exhibit 5 (Part 5), #18 Exhibit 5 (Part 6))(Pehush, Tara)
November 6, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan James Tully on behalf of John Grimes, Linda Phelps. (Tully, Brendan)
October 31, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 31, 2017 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
October 31, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
October 31, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dennis Enrique Vega. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) Modified on 10/31/2017 (pc).
October 30, 2017 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group Plc (Scotland), Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler LLC, Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation for Foster Wheeler LLC. Document filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Vega, Dennis)
October 30, 2017 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric Company. Document filed by General Electric Company.(Vega, Dennis)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vega, Dennis)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 190292/2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14304613).Document filed by Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Summons and Complaint index number 190292_2017_filed on Oct 3 2017, #2 Ex B Summons and Complaint_index no_190291_2017_filed Oct 3 2017, #3 Ex C Grimes John Amended Interrogatories_Redacted, #4 Ex D Schroppe affidavit Dec 18 2009, #5 Ex E Hobson January 28, 2008, #6 Ex F Betts Affidavit 020905, #7 Ex G Betts Affidavit Sept 27 2006, #8 Betts Exhibits_Part1, #9 Betts Exhibits_Part2, #10 Betts Exhibits_Part3, #11 Betts Exhibits_Part4, #12 Betts Exhibits_Part5, #13 Betts Exhibits_Part6, #14 Betts Exhibits_Part7, #15 Betts Exhibits_Part8, #16 Betts Exhibits_Part9, #17 Betts Exhibits_Part10, #18 Betts Exhibits_Part11, #19 Cert of Service, #20 Service List, #21 Notice of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party, #22 Notice of Notice of Removal to State Court)(Vega, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Robert Michael Gilmartin, JR.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Cororporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Robert Michael Gilmartin, JR.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Represented By: David Oxamendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Represented By: Robert Michael Gilmartin, JR.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grimes
Represented By: Brendan James Tully
Represented By: Daniel John Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Phelps
Represented By: Brendan James Tully
Represented By: Daniel John Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Phelps
Represented By: Daniel John Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?