Wimbush v. Horton et al
Plaintiff: |
Maurice Wimbush |
Defendant: |
Jervis Horton, Brian McCraw, New York City, John Doe 1-3 and Jane Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv08765 |
Filed: |
November 10, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Ronnie Abrams |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 16, 2020 |
Filing
93
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The parties have advised the Court that they have reached a settlement in principle. The above-captioned action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs. The dismissal is without prejudice to the right to reopen the action by June 15, 2020, if the settlement is not consummated. Any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/16/2020) (va)
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER CONVERTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: The Settlement Conference in this matter scheduled for Wednesday, April 8, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby converted to a telephonic conference. The Parties should call into the court conference line at (866) 434-5269 Code: 4858267 at the scheduled time. The Court will review procedures and then talk separately with each side by phone. The parties and their counsel must be available by phone from 2:00 p.m. to 5:00 p.m. so that the court can have more than one ex parte conversation with each side as needed. Each side shall establish its own conference call line to remain open during the settlement conference so that the court can join and re-join as needed. To ensure con fidentiality, each side shall provide the court with the dial-in number and passcode for its conference line via an ex parte email to Parker_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
|
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
76
ORDER: The parties are reminded that an Initial Pretrial Conference is scheduled for February 20, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall comply with the Court's Order and Notice of Initial Conference of September 24, 2019 (ECF No. 53), which set s forth the submissions due prior to the Initial Conference and other obligations associated with the Initial Conference. The parties are also directed to refer to the Court's individual rules pertaining to Initial Conferences. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/13/2020) (va)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?