June 1, 2021 |
Filing
108
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have reached a settlement for this action, it is, on this 1st day of June, 2021, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that w ithin 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within 30 day s of this order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same 30-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/01/2021) (ama)
|
February 9, 2021 |
Filing
101
ORDER: IT IS, on this 9th day of February, 2021, ORDERED as follows: That Roy W. Breitenbach has withdrawn as Counsel for the Defendants. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/9/2021) Attorney Roy W. Breitenbach terminated. (ks) Modified on 2/10/2021 (ks).
|
November 24, 2020 |
Filing
96
ORDER: The plaintiff shall file the amended complaint through ECF by November 30, 2020, and the defendant should respond by December 11, 2020. Discovery should be completed by February 26, 2021. Dispositive motions are due March 19, 2021. The time to respond to any dispositive motion would be 30 days, and the time to reply would be 15 days. A joint pretrial order is due April 9, 2021, or 30 days after the decision on any dispositive motion. The joint pretrial order should be accompanied by any motions in limine, requested charges, or voir dire requests. The parties should be ready for trial with 48 hours notice, 14 days after the submission of the joint pretrial order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/24/2020) ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020., Discovery due by 2/26/2021., Motions due by 3/19/2021., Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021.) (ks)
|
November 6, 2020 |
Filing
95
ORDER: The plaintiff should provide the defendants with any proposed amended complaint by November 10, 2020. The Court will hold a teleconference on November 23, 2020, at 2pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/6/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
|
August 28, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER: The Court has received a motion from the plaintiff's counsel, dated August 24, 2020, by which that the plaintiff's counsel seeks to withdraw as attorney of record for the plaintiff. The plaintiff should respond to that motion in wr iting on or before September 11, 2020. If the plaintiff fails to respond to the motion, the motion may be granted without any further submissions. The plaintiff's counsel should serve acopy of this Order together with his motion papers on the p laintiff by September 3, 2020. The plaintiff's lawyer should file proof of service by September 7, 2020. This case is stayed until October 30, 2020. By that date the plaintiff should either file a notice of appearance by new counsel or a no tice that the plaintiff is representing herself pro se, together with an address at which papers can be served on the plaintiff. If the plaintiff fails to file such a notice by October 30, 2020, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed for fail ure to prosecute. If the plaintiff or the plaintiff's counsel seek to file any supporting affidavits or documents that are confidential, such documents may be filed ex parte and under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/28/2020) ( Responses due by 9/11/2020) (ks)
|
August 27, 2020 |
Filing
87
ORDER: The case is stayed pending a decision on the motion by the plaintiff's counsel to withdraw. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/27/2020) (ama)
|