Geiss et al v. The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Sagemiller, Louisette Geiss, Nannette Klatt, Zoe Brock, Katherine Kendall, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson, Jane Doe, Larissa Gomes, Caitlin Dulany, Sarah Ann Masse and Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt)
Defendant: James Dolan, Richard Koenigsberg, John Does 1-50, Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff, Tarak Ben Ammar, Jeff Sackman, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Robert Weinstein, Tim Sarnoff, Miramax Film Corp., Harvey Weinstein, Miramax, LLC, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Paul Tudor Jones, Miramax Does 1-10, David Glasser, The Walt Disney Company, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Rick Schwartz, Michael Eisner, Talent Agency Does 1-100, Barbara Schneeweiss, Frank Gil, Fabrizio Lombardo, Mark Gill, Irwin Reiter, Nancy Ashbrooke and Buena Vista International, Inc
Not Classified By Court: Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff, Alexandra Canosa, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III and Jane Doe IV
Interested Party: Miriam Haley
Case Number: 1:2017cv09554
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, attorney Lorie Almon, an attorney with the law firm of Seyfarth Shaw LLP, is hereby withdrawn as counsel for defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings, LLC. Seyfarth Shaw LLP still remains as counsel for defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings, LLC. The clerk is hereby directed to remove Ms. Lorie Almon from the Court docket and designate her status as terminated. SO ORDERED. Attorney Lorie Elizabeth Almon terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/4/2021) (vfr)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 419 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC..(Almon, Lorie)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #413 Notice of Appeal, filed by Caitlin Dulany, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, #412 Notice of Appeal, filed by Zoe Brock USCA Case Number 21-1007(L); 21-1011(CON). Appellants move to voluntarily dismiss the above-captioned appeals. Appellees do not oppose this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/1/2021. (tp)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #418 USCA Mandate. (tp)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance re: #93 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by Robert Weinstein..(Coster, Abigail)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #413 Notice of Appeal, filed by Caitlin Dulany, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, #412 Notice of Appeal, filed by Zoe Brock. USCA Case Number 21-1007; 21-1011. Appellants move the Court to hold this appeal in abeyance until their claims are resolved, but no later than September 30, 2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, on consent. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 8/16/2021..(nd)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PERIOD OF REINSTATEMENT AFTER VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1): NOW THEREFORE THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE AS FOLLOWS: The parties shall have on or before December 17, 2021, to reinstate this action in the event the Claims Fund is not distributed, and such time period will be with tolling and with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/2021) (kv)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #412 Notice of Appeal, filed by Zoe Brock were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #413 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #413 Notice of Appeal, filed by Caitlin Dulany, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #412 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 413 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #278 Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24434027. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Ellenberger, Lynn)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 412 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #278 Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Zoe Brock. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24433554. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Clune, John)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER CLOSING CASE: As all other claims were previously dismissed, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with leave to reinstate the action within 120 days with tolling if the Claims Fund are not distributed. The Clerk is hereby instructed to terminate civil case 17-cv-9554, and any open motions therein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/22/2021) (ks)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Elizabeth Fegan regarding Document No. #409 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pages missing from document. Do not refile document since it was correctly filed at document #410. (km)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Harvey Weinstein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Melissa Thompson, Sara Ann Thomas. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Fegan, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Harvey Weinstein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Melissa Thompson, Sara Ann Thomas. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/19/2021 (km).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Harvey Weinstein and without costs. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Melissa Thompson, Sara Ann Thomas. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/19/2021 (km).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Elizabeth Fegan. RE-FILE Document No. #408 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #410 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER: Further to my order, ECF No. 406, the Clerk shall strike ECF No. 396 from the docket but retain the summary docket text for the record, and remove the strike from ECF No. 402. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/18/2021) (ama)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER terminating #402 Motion to Seal. In response to Plaintiff Thompson's Motion to Seal and Motion for Sanctions, ECF No. 402, I find that Weinstein's submission of February 8, 2021, ECF No. 396, is replete with scandalous matter, unnecessary to the case. The court does not need to be persuaded by such material as to the appropriateness of a deposition of Melissa Thompson. The Clerk shall strike ECF No. 402 from the docket but retain the summary docket text for the record. The Clerk shall terminate the open motion, ECF No. 402. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/16/21) (yv)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #402 EMERGENCY MOTION to Seal Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Emergency Motion to Seal and For Sanctions. Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Reply in Further Support of her Emergency Motion to Seal and for Sanctions. Document filed by Melissa Thompson..(Ellenberger, Lynn)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lynn A. Ellenberger and Imran H. Ansari dated February 12, 2021 re: Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Joint Letter in Compliance with ECF Doc. 399. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #402 EMERGENCY MOTION to Seal Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Emergency Motion to Seal and For Sanctions. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Ansari, Imran)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 EMERGENCY MOTION to Seal Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Emergency Motion to Seal and For Sanctions. Document filed by Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn A. Ellenberger in Support of Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Emergency Motion to Seal and for Sanctions).(Ellenberger, Lynn) Modified on 2/17/2021 (yv). Modified on 2/18/2021 (ama).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE of of Plaintiff Melissa Thompson's Emergency Motion to Seal and for Sanctions. Document filed by Melissa Thompson..(Ellenberger, Lynn)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting #395 Letter Motion to Seal. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/9/21) (yv)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #394 Motion to Stay. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion for a 30-day stay, until March 12, 2021, is granted on condition that plaintiffs and defendant agree, by February 12, 2021, to firm dates for depositions of Harvey Weinstein and Melissa Thompson in the 20 days thereafter. Plaintiffs and defendant shall file their agreement on ECF. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/9/21) (yv)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Stayed (yv)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #396 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #406 Order on Motion to Seal. (ama)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #395 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Physician Letter addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Imran H. Ansari dated 02/08/2021. Letter Motion to Stay or Adjourn Deposition of Harvey Weinstein addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Imran H. Ansari dated 02/08/2021. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein, Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of William Cole, M.D.)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #395 .(Ansari, Imran)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #395 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Physician Letter addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Imran H. Ansari dated 02/08/2021. Letter Motion to Stay or Adjourn Deposition of Harvey Weinstein addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Imran H. Ansari dated 02/08/2021. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Letter of William Cole, M.D.).(Ansari, Imran)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #396 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #406 Order on Motion to Seal. . RESPONSE to Motion re: #394 MOTION to Stay Pending Filing of the Bankruptcy Plan Effective Date Notice. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Ansari, Imran) Modified on 2/18/2021 (ama).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Physician Letter addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Imran H. Ansari dated 02/08/2021. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MOTION to Stay Pending Filing of the Bankruptcy Plan Effective Date Notice. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lynn A. Ellenberger).(Ellenberger, Lynn)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Motion to Stay Case Pending Filing of the Bankruptcy Plan Effective Date Notice. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Ellenberger, Lynn)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #383 Motion to Compel. In response to Defendant Weinstein's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, ECF No. 383, Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to produce the requested documents by February 5, 2021. This case is independent from the action in Bankruptcy Court and must proceed on its own timeline. The oral argument, currently scheduled February 4, 2021, is hereby cancelled. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the open motion, ECF No. 383. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/28/21) (yv)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SCHEDULING ORDER with respect to #383 Motion to Compel. Parties are hereby ordered to appear for oral argument on February 4, 2021 at 10:00 am, on the open motion, ECF No. 383. The oral argument will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749; Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the argument. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2021) (va)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (va)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #383 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Discovery. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Ansari, Imran)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #383 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Discovery. . Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn A. Ellenberger in Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Outstanding Discovery Requests).(Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STAY denying #363 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); terminating #365 Motion for Joinder; denying #375 Letter Motion to Stay. For the following reasons, the Motions for Entry of Judgment, as well as Weinstein's Motion to Stay his deposition, are hereby denied. Weinstein's motion to stay is therefore denied. Should there be any medical reasons to limit, or attach conditions to, Weinstein's deposition so as to not unduly endanger the deterioration of his health, an application can be made to the Court. The oral argument, currently scheduled for January 21, 2021, is hereby cancelled. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the open motions, ECF Nos. 363, 365, 375. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/19/2021) (jca)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW granting #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff's pending motion to withdraw Jason A. Zweig as attorney, ECF No. 386, is hereby granted. The clerk shall mark the above motion terminated. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Jason Allen Zweig terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/15/21) (yv)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION for Jason Allen Zweig to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas..(Zweig, Jason)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel A. Tarnor on behalf of Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #383 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Discovery. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Ansari, Imran)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Discovery. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. Return Date set for 2/1/2021 at 10:00 AM..(Ansari, Imran)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument, currently scheduled for January 12, 2020 is hereby adjourned. Parties are hereby ordered to appear for oral argument on January 21, 2021 at 2:30pm, on the open motions, ECF Nos. 363, 365, and 375. The oral argument will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the argument. Finally, no later than January 12, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 1/21/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/23/2020) (ama)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ama)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #375 FIRST MOTION to Stay Deposition of Harvey Weinstein. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #375 FIRST MOTION to Stay Deposition of Harvey Weinstein. . Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #378 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Discovery due by 3/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/2020) (jca)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan and Imran H. Ansari dated November 30, 2020. Document filed by Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference previously scheduled for December 11, 2020 is hereby canceled. The oral argument scheduled for January 21, 2020 is adjourned and the parties are hereby ordered to appear for an oral argument on the open motions, ECF Nos. 363, 365, on January 12, 2021 at 2:30 p.m., which argument will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749, Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the argument. Finally, no later than January 5, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/23/20) (yv)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #375 FIRST MOTION to Stay Deposition of Harvey Weinstein. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Felony Complaint).(Ansari, Imran)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 FIRST MOTION to Stay Deposition of Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. Return Date set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM..(Ansari, Imran)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (SEE #375) FIRST MOTION to Stay Deposition of Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. Return Date set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM..(Ansari, Imran) Modified on 11/20/2020 (kj).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for an oral argument on January 21, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., which argument will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749, Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in ( other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the argument. Finally, no later than January 14, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/17/20) (yv)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . . Document filed by Zoe Brock..(Clune, John)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . . Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #365 MOTION for Joinder in Zoe Brock's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (ECF #363)., #363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . . Document filed by Mark Gill..(Serpe, Silvia)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicolas Martin Kabat on behalf of Marc Lasry..(Kabat, Nicolas)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #367 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/4/20) (yv)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #365 MOTION for Joinder in Zoe Brock's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (ECF #363)., #363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Responses due by 9/25/2020. Replies due by 10/9/2020. (yv)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time by Outside Directors addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lawrence S. Spiegel, John J. Rosenberg, James V. Masella, III, Marvin S. Putman and Roberto Finzi dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Marc Lasry, Tim Sarnoff, Dirk Ziff..(Spiegel, Lawrence)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 8/28/2020, ( Status Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #365 MOTION for Joinder in Zoe Brock's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (ECF #363). . Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION for Joinder in Zoe Brock's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (ECF #363). Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . . Document filed by Zoe Brock..(Williams, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Document filed by Zoe Brock..(Williams, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, that Aidala, Bertuna and Kamins PC shall be substituted in the place and stead of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP as counsel of record for defendant Harvey Weinstein in the above-captioned matter. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Elior Daniel Shiloh; Simi Bhutani and Brian Pete terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/24/20) (yv)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS, The status conference previously scheduled for August 21, 2020 is adjourned to August 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749, Access code: 7518680.To ensure that the conference proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Not later than August 26, 2020 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear at the conference. In that correspondence, counsel shall specify the phone numbers from which they expect to call in to the conference. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/20/20) (yv)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION DENYING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. The Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice, ECF No. 333, is denied. If Plaintiffs still intend to move to certify the class, they should do so promptly. In any event, the parties shall swiftly complete discovery and be ready for trials. The parties shall appear for a status conference, to be virtually held by telephone, on August 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. So ordered., ( Telephone Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/20) (yv)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. Refiled Pursuant to Docket No. 354. Document filed by Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff..(Wigdor, Douglas)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Douglas Holden Wigdor to RE-FILE Document #355 Response in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): wrong filer selected. (ldi)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Settlement Approval Hearing held on 7/15/2020. The Court declined to approve the settlement. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (Jones, Brigitte)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. Refiled Pursuant to Docket No. 354. Document filed by Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Dirk Ziff..(Wigdor, Douglas) Modified on 7/15/2020 (ldi).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT....The parties' settlement communications during the course of mediation are privileged and inadmissible. See Fed. R. Evid. 408; In re Teligent, Inc., 640 F.3d 53, 57-58 (2d Cir. 2011); Bernard v. Galen Grp., Inc., 901 F. Supp. 778, 782-84 (S.D.N.Y. 1995). They may not be the subject of argument. The section in the objections of Chiu, et al., treating the "History of Negotiations," pages 21-24, shall be stricken. The Clerk is instructed to strike the document, ECF No. 339, from the docket. Counsel for Chiu, et al., shall refile the Objections without the offending paragraphs or other discussion of the substance of negotiations. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/14/20) (yv)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL denying #333 Motion for Settlement; denying as moot #334 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying as moot #344 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement (ECF No. 333) is denied. A memorandum decision will follow setting out reasons. Furthermore, the motions regarding the regulation of the preliminary approval process (ECF Nos. 334, 344) are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the open motions (ECF Nos. 333, 334, 344). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/14/20) (yv)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Howard Zumbro on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC..(Zumbro, Paul)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. . Document filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Merson, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS. The order and time limits for speakers at tomorrow's hearing will be as follows: 1. Elizabeth A. Fegan and Steve W. Berman, on behalf of Plaintiffs Louisette Geiss, Sarah Ann Thomas (a/k/a Sarah Ann Masse), Melissa Thompson, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Katherine Kendall, Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, and Jill Doe: 15 minutes 2. Elior Shiloh, on behalf of Defendant Harvey Weinstein: 5 minutes 3. Paul Zumbro, on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC: 5 minutes 4. Sandra Pullman and Louisa Irving, on behalf of the New York State Office of the Attorney General: 5 minutes 5. Douglas Wigdor, on behalf of Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, and Tarale Wulff: 5 minutes 6. John Clune, on behalf of Plaintiff Zoe Brock: 2 minutes 7. Thomas P. Giuffra, on behalf of Alexandra Canosa: 2 minutes 8. John R. Cuti, on behalf of Miriam Haley: 2 minutes The above being all who filed papers supporting or objecting to the settlement, there will be no other speakers. Parties and non-parties are reminded to mute their telephones unless invited to speak on the record. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/13/20) (yv)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos on behalf of Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Mabile Ferreira dos Santos, Giovanna)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Merson, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. . Document filed by Alexandra Canosa..(Giuffra, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Louis Arbeit on behalf of Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff..(Arbeit, Bryan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Todd Mintzer on behalf of Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff..(Mintzer, Kevin)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John R. Cuti dated 07/13/2020. Document filed by Miriam Haley..(Cuti, John)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariann Meier Wang on behalf of Miriam Haley..(Wang, Mariann)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gloria Rachel Allred on behalf of Miriam Haley..(Allred, Gloria)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John R. Cuti on behalf of Miriam Haley..(Cuti, John)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Peter Giuffra on behalf of Alexandra Canosa..(Giuffra, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #339 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #354 Order Striking Document from Record, . RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. . Document filed by Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Opposition to Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit A - December 19, 2018 Email Correspondence Regarding Proposed Class Settlement).(Wigdor, Douglas) Modified on 7/14/2020 (yv).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Holden Wigdor on behalf of Rowena Chiu, Wedil David, Dominique Huett, Zelda Perkins, Kaja Sokola, Tarale Wulff..(Wigdor, Douglas)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. and Response to The Request of Non-Settlement Class Members to Appear at the Preliminary Approval Hearing. Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #333 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. . Document filed by Zoe Brock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Williams, Daniel)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: The preliminary approval hearing scheduled for July 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. will be held telephonically via the following call in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749. Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the hearing proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in, when not invited to speak on the record, to mute their telephones. Not later than July 13, 2020 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record at the telephonic hearing. In that correspondence, counsel shall specify the phone numbers from which they expect to call in to the hearing. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/10/2020) (rjm)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION for Leave to File Document In Camera . Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson..(Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY) - MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Classes, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Permission to Disseminate Class Notice. Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion For Preliminary Approval, #2 Ex. 2 Declaration of Class Counsel, #3 Ex. 2A Fegan Scott Resume, #4 Ex. 2B Hagens Berman Resume, #5 Ex. 2C The Weinstein Company Global Settlement Agreement, #6 Ex. 2D Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation, #7 Ex. 2E Individual Plaintiffs' Settlement Agreement and Release, #8 Ex. 2F Excerpt of TWC Operating Agreement, #9 Ex. 3 Declaration of the New York State Office of the Attorney General, #10 Ex. 4 Declaration of Jon Shub, Subclass Counsel, #11 Ex. 5 Declaration of Daniel Girard, Subclass Counsel, #12 Ex. 6 Declaration of Mediator Jed Melnick, #13 Ex. 7 Declaration of Kyle Bingham on Settlement Notice Plan, #14 Ex. 8 Declaration of Plaintiff Louisette Geiss, #15 Ex. 9 Declaration of Plaintiff Sarah Ann Thomas, #16 Ex. 10 Declaration of Plaintiff Melissa Thompson, #17 Ex. 11 Declaration of Plaintiff Melissa Sagemiller, #18 Ex. 12 Declaration of Plaintiff Nannette Klatt, #19 Ex. 13 Declaration of Plaintiff Katherine Kendall, #20 Ex. 14 Declaration of Plaintiff Caitlin Dulany, #21 Ex. 15 Declaration of Plaintiff Larissa Gomes, #22 Ex. 16 Declaration of Jill Doe, #23 Ex. 1 Class Settlement Agreement, #24 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Approval Order).(Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/23/2020 (lb).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Shub on behalf of Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller. New Address: Shub Law Firm LLC, 134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor, Haddonfield, NJ, US 08033, (856) 772-7200..(Shub, Jonathan)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 6/26/2020, ( Motions due by 6/30/2020., Oral Argument set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a telephone conference on Friday, June 26, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., which status will be held via the following call-in-number: Call-in number 888-363-4749 Access code 7518680 To ensure that the conference proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs all those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Finally, no later than Thursday, June 25, 2020 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the Court (via email address: HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record at the telephone conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (ks) Modified on 6/24/2020 (ks). Modified on 6/30/2020 (ks).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER: The status conf. previously set for April 3, 2020 is hereby adjourned. You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for a status conf. Date : June 26, 2020 Time: 10:00 am Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2020) ( Status Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (ks) Modified on 4/1/2020 (ks).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #328 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Motion is granted. (Attorney Daniel Y. Simkin terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/9/2020) (rro)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Daniel Y. Simkin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss..(Simkin, Daniel)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated 2/24/20 re: request an adjournment of February 28, 2020 conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conf is adjourned to April 3, 2020, 10:00 am., (Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/20) (yv)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #325 Motion for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that said motion be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant be and hereby is admitted to practice in the Southern District of New York in this matter. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this court, including the rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/7/20) (yv)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 AMENDED MOTION for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Manohar, Aarthi)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #325 AMENDED MOTION for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jonathan Shub dated 2/4/20 re: request to amend Ms. Manohar's motion and remove Ms. Brock's name. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/4/20) (yv)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #322 Motion for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that said motion be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant be and hereby is admitted to practice in the Southern District of New York in this matter. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this court, including the rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/3/20) (yv)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18650731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Manohar, Aarthi)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #322 MOTION for Aarthi Manohar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18650731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #319 Motion for Daniel D. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Daniel D. Williams, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/14/20) (yv)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #318 Motion for John C. Clune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of John C. Clune, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action, is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/14/20) (yv)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #319 MOTION for Daniel D. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #318 MOTION for John C. Clune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION for Daniel D. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Williams, Daniel)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION for John C. Clune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Clune, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #316 MOTION for John C. Clune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18455907. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #317 MOTION for Daniel D. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18455982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Colorado;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel D. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18455982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Williams, Daniel) Modified on 1/9/2020 (wb).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John C. Clune to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18455907. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Clune, John) Modified on 1/9/2020 (wb).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated 1/06/2020 re: request a 45-day adjournment of the conference. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The Conference previously scheduled for January 10, 2020 is adjourned to February 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.., ( Status Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/07/2020) (ama)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #313 Motion for Lynn A. Ellenberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that said motion be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant be and hereby is admitted to practice in the Southern District of New York in this matter. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this court, including the rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/18/19) (yv)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Lynn A. Ellenberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ellenberger, Lynn)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #313 MOTION for Lynn A. Ellenberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Shub on behalf of Zoe Brock, Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller. (Shub, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAW AL OF COUNSEL, PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Daniel M. Stone, and subject to the approval of the Court, Daniel M. Stone hereby withdraws as counsel for Marc Lasry and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Brad S. Karp and Roberto Finzi of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent Marc Lasry in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Daniel Martin Stone terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/4/19) (yv)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Marc Lasry. (Stone, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 10/25/2019, ( Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/16/19) (yv)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #306 Motion for Protective Order. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. Protective Order signed. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/16/19) (yv) Modified on 10/16/2019 (yv).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of re: #306 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Siehl, Whitney)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order)(Siehl, Whitney)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #304 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conf. is adjourned to Oct. 25, 2019, 10:00a.m. (Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/4/19) (yv)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior Shiloh dated October 3, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #302 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conf is adjourned to Oct. 18, 2019 10:00 a.m. Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/3/2019) (cf)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 4, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated October 2, 2019. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simi Bhutani on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Bhutani, Simi)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATED PROTOCOL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/12/2019) (jca)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Motion re: #298 JOINT MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protocol for the Production of Electronically Stored Information.. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(Siehl, Whitney)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 JOINT MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protocol for the Production of Electronically Stored Information. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ESI Protocol)(Siehl, Whitney)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of James Dolan. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, 10019, (646) 494-5000. (Rosenberg, John)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of James Dolan. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, 10019, 6464945000. (Perala, Brett)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 7/23/2019, ( Status Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #294 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to July 23, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/3/2019) (ne)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for July 19, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated July 2, 2019. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY denying #281 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying #281 Motion to Stay: Defendant Harvey Weinstein's motion to certify the Court's April 18, 2019 Order and Opinion for interlocutory appeal is denied. There is not a substantial ground for difference of opinion as to whether the Trafficking Victims Protection Act, 18 U.S.C. 1591, prohibits enticement of victims by means of fraudulent promises of professional advancement, for the purpose of engaging in sex acts with them. This Court's holding on that issue is consistent with the holdings of three other district courts, including two in this district. Additionally, any future appeal will benefit from the development of a full record. The Clerk shall terminate the open motion (ECF No. 281). The parties shall appear for a status conference on July 19, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/2019) (jwh)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (jwh)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #281 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the April 18, 2019 Opinion and Order. MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of the Interlocutory Appeal. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, attorney Scott R. Rabe, an attorney with the law firm of Seyfarth Shaw LLP, is hereby withdrawn as counsel for defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings, LLC. Seyfarth Shaw LLP still remains as counsel for defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings, LLC. The clerk is hereby directed to remove Mr. Scott R. Rabe from the Court docket and designate his status as terminated. SO ORDERED. Attorney Scott Roblan Rabe terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/2019) (ne)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #286 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. (Replies due by 6/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/18/2019) (anc)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Rabe, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated June 18, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #281 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the April 18, 2019 Opinion and Order. MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of the Interlocutory Appeal. . Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Siehl, Whitney)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Plaintiff shall oppose Defendant Harvey Weinstein's motion for a certificate of appealability (ECF No. 281) by noon on June 17, 2019. Defendant shall reply by 4 p.m. on June 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 6/17/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/4/2019) (anc)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 6/4/2019, ( Replies due by 6/20/2019., Responses due by 6/17/2019). (Court Reporter Sonya Moore) (Jones, Brigitte)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elizabeth A. Fegan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fegan Scott LLC, 150 S. Wacker Dr., 24th Floor, Chicago, IL, USA 60606, 312-741-1019. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #281 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the April 18, 2019 Opinion and Order. MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of the Interlocutory Appeal. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the April 18, 2019 Opinion and Order., MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of the Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #279 Motion for Whitney K. Siehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/19/2019) (ks)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #279 MOTION for Whitney K. Siehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16725676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION for Whitney K. Siehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16725676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Siehl, Whitney)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Nancy Ashbrooke, #241 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Harvey Weinstein, #254 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tarak Ben Ammar, #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Barbara Schneeweiss, #272 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Motion to Dismiss to either March 18 or 19, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert M. Barta dated March 5, 2019 filed by Barbara Schneeweiss, #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Marc Lasry, Richard Koenigsberg, Lance Maerov, Tim Sarnoff, Michael Eisner, Jeff Sackman, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Buena Vista International, Inc, Robert Weinstein, The Walt Disney Company, Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, James Dolan. For the reasons discussed in this decision: (i) Harvey Weinstein's motion to dismiss the TWC Subclass's TVPA claim (Count I) is denied, and (ii) all other claims against all other defendants (Counts II-XVIII) are dismissed. Accordingly, the Miramax Subclass has no remaining claims, there are no remaining claims against any of the Corporate Defendants, and no remaining claims against any of the Individual Defendants, except Count I against Harvey Weinstein. Jane Doe's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. All other dismissals are with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate the open motions (ECF Nos. 199,239,241,246,254, and 272). The remaining parties shall appear for a status conference on June 4, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/17/2019) (ne)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/13/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/13/2019 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #274 Letter filed by Robert Weinstein. ENDORSEMENT: Oral argument will remain on March 13, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. No further adjournments. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/7/2019) (ne)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gary Stein dated March 6, 2019 re: oral argument on motions to dismiss. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Stockwell on behalf of Tarak Ben Ammar. (Stockwell, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Motion to Dismiss to either March 18 or 19, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert M. Barta dated March 5, 2019. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss.(Barta, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. . Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Barta, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Jorrie, Kathleen)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Because of the continuation of the trial pending before the Court, United States v. Cammarano, 18 Cr. 15, the oral argument previously scheduled for 3/7/2019 is adjourned to 3/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Opposition re: #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss., #254 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss ., #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. (CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS TARAK BEN AMMAR AND BARBARA SCHNEEWEISS). Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #266 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2019) (ne)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Tarak Ben Ammar and Barbara Schneeweiss and Corrected Fegan Declaration . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Corrected Memorandum), #2 Exhibit B (Corrected Declaration))(Fegan, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alejandro Hari Cruz on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Cruz, Alejandro)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nancy Ashbrooke, Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., James Dolan, Michael Eisner, Mark Gill, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Walt Disney Company, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #241 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Opposition re: #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss., #254 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss ., #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. (MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS TARAK BEN AMMAR AND BARBARA SCHNEEWEISS). Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #258 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. So ordered. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/20/2019) (ne)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #257 Motion for Alan M. Dershowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/20/2019) (ne)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated February 19, 2019. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #257 MOTION for Alan M. Dershowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16358593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Alan M. Dershowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16358593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan M. Dershowitz in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiloh, Elior)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 DECLARATION of Tarak Ben Ammar in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Jorrie, Kathleen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #254 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Jorrie, Kathleen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(Jorrie, Kathleen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #249 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Emily R Brown terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/13/2019) (ne)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #248 Motion for Jeffrey D. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/13/2019) (ne)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #250 Motion for Kathleen A. Jorrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/13/2019) (ne)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION for Kathleen A. Jorrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16334837. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kathleen A. Jorrie, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Jorrie, Kathleen)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION for Emily Brown to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #250 MOTION for Kathleen A. Jorrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16334837. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #248 MOTION for Jeffrey D. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16328349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Jeffrey D. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16328349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tarak Ben Ammar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey D. Wexler, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Barta, Robert)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss.(Barta, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/22/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/22/2019 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss ., #241 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. (Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss). Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #241 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Nancy Ashbrooke. (Hechtkopf, Helene)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Nancy Ashbrooke. Responses due by 1/31/2018(Hechtkopf, Helene)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #236 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/24/2019) (ne)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Nancy Ashbrooke answer due 1/28/2019. (ne)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Noel Angel on behalf of Nancy Ashbrooke. (Angel, Allison)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Helene R. Hechtkopf dated January 23, 2019. Document filed by Nancy Ashbrooke.(Hechtkopf, Helene)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helene Rachel Hechtkopf on behalf of Nancy Ashbrooke. (Hechtkopf, Helene)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DEFENDANT WEINSTEIN'S MOTION TO STAY denying #227 Motion for Protective Order. For the reasons discussed at oral argument on January 22, 2019, Defendant Harvey Weinstein's motion to stay (ECF No. 161) and Plaintiffs' motion to extend this Court's December 20, 2018 Protective Order (ECF No. 227) are denied. This Court's November 30, 2018 Order (ECF No. 169) is withdrawn, and Defendant Weinstein's motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before January 28, 2019. Plaintiffs' January 31, 2019 opposition deadline and Defendants' February 28, 2019 reply date shall remain in place. Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will take place on March 7, 2019 at 4:00 P.M. The Clerk shall terminate the following open motions: ECF No. 161, ECF No. 183, and ECF No. 227. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/22/2019) (ne)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/28/2019. Responses due by 1/31/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (ne)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 3/7/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (ne)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #227 MOTION for Protective Order [Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Protective Order to Absent Class Members]. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin S. Putnam dated January 11, 2019 re: the Court's orders of September 13, 2018 and December 17, 2018 (Dkt. Nos. 126 and 197, respectively). Document filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC, Tim Sarnoff.(Putnam, Marvin)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for January 22, 2019 at 12:00 P.M. shall include argument on Plaintiffs' motion to extend this court's December 20, 2018 Protective Order to absent class members (ECF No. 227). Any additional briefing on that motion shall be filed on or before January 17, 2019. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/11/2019) (rjm)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Motion to Stay (ECF Nos. 161, 163) shall be held on January 22, 2019 at 12:00 P.M. Oral Argument set for 1/22/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/10/2019) (ne)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Support re: #227 MOTION for Protective Order [Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Protective Order to Absent Class Members].. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #227 MOTION for Protective Order [Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Protective Order to Absent Class Members]. . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MOTION for Protective Order [Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Protective Order to Absent Class Members]. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Extend Protective Order-TOC)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Martin Stone on behalf of Marc Lasry. (Stone, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 DECLARATION of Benjamin Brafman in Support re: #161 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 BRIEF re: #161 Notice (Other) Reply in Support of Motion to Stay. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a confernece proceeding held on 12/20/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/20/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #215 Motion for Robert Marc Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/2019) (ne)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #216 Motion for Daniel Yitzhak Simkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/2019) (ne)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #211 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #140 Amended Complaint. The request is granted. It will not affect the schedule of motion papers to be filed, and any arguments on the pending motions. Barbara Schneeweiss answer due 2/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/2019) (ne)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #217 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. Replies due by 1/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/4/2019) (ne)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Stay addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION for Daniel Yitzhak Simkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Daniel Y. Simkin, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Simkin, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Robert Marc Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Robert M. Barta, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Barta, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the annexed declaration of Sara Nichols, and subject to the approval of the Court, Sara Nichols hereby withdraws as counsel for Marc Lasry and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Brad S. Karp and Roberto Finzi of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP will continue to represent Marc Lasry in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. Attorney Sara Francis Nichols terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/3/2019) (ne)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. Gill Supplemental Brief. Document filed by Mark Gill. (Serpe, Silvia)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #215 MOTION for Robert Marc Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #216 MOTION for Daniel Yitzhak Simkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Marc Lasry. (Nichols, Sara)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #140 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert M. Barta dated 12/28/2018. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss.(Barta, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel Yitzhak Simkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16116521. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Y. Simkin, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Daniel Y. Simkin, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Simkin, Daniel) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jc).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert Marc Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16116419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Schneeweiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert M. Barta, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Robert M. Barta, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Barta, Robert) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jc).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. As to Him. Document filed by David Glasser. (Dolan, Richard)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #210 MOTION for Daniel Yitzhak Simkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16116521. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #209 MOTION for Robert Marc Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16116419. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (our court does not accept state bar certificates for California). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/2018) (ne)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Motions terminated: #206 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 19, 2018. Filed by Harvey Weinstein. The hearing scheduled for December 21, 2018 is canceled.
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #189 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. Replies due by 1/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/2018) (ne)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall appear on December 21, 2018, at 10:15 A.M. for a conference regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order filed on December 13, 2018 (ECF Nos. 183, 184) and related issues. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 10:15 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/18/2018) (rj)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #198 Letter, filed by Louisette Geiss, Jane Doe, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Larissa Gomes, Zoe Brock, Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Melissa Thompson, Caitlin Dulany, Sara Ann Thomas. ENDORSEMENT: Rejected. I do not accept letters not authorized by FRCP, Local Rules, or my Individual Rules. Proceed by motion under FRCP. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/18/2018) (ne)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration, and Memorandum of Law (Dkt. Nos. 199-201) served on all counsel of record or unrepresented party for whom an affidavit of service has been filed on December 17, 2018. Service was made by CM/ECF and/or U.S. mail. Document filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC, Tim Sarnoff. (Bengels, Jessica)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., James Dolan, Michael Eisner, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Walt Disney Company, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff. (Putnam, Marvin)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 DECLARATION of Marvin S. Putnam in Support re: #199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., James Dolan, Michael Eisner, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Walt Disney Company, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Class Action Complaint With Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - September 12, 2018 Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Sundance Film Festival Press Release)(Putnam, Marvin)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., James Dolan, Michael Eisner, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Walt Disney Company, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(Putnam, Marvin)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated December 17, 2018 re: Response to the Letters Dated December 14, 2018, from Harvey Weinstein Counsel Filed in Geiss (Geiss Dkt. 192). Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER denying as moot #181 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #191 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. ECF 181 is denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/17/2018) (ne)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joe Wesley Earnhardt on behalf of Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Michael Eisner, The Walt Disney Company. (Earnhardt, Joe)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company for Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc.. Document filed by Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., The Walt Disney Company.(Chesler, Evan)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan R Chesler on behalf of Buena Vista International, Inc, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Michael Eisner, The Walt Disney Company. (Chesler, Evan)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/11/2019. Responses due by 2/25/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (ne)
December 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 14, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Motion for a protective order (Corrected). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #193 Letter) - LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 14, 2018 re: Plaintiff's Motion for a protective order. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior) Modified on 12/17/2018 (db).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Their Opening Brief by January 11, 2019, Plaintiffs' Response to be Filed by February 25, 2019, and Defendants' Replies to be Filed by March 25, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated December 14, 2018. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Tarak Ben Ammar waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 2/13/2019. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 14. 2018. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #182 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nancy Ashbrooke, dated 12/12/18 re: Defendant Nancy Ashbrooke requests that the Court grant her an extension of 60 days in which to respond to the summons, because she does not have representation yet etc. Document filed by Nancy Ashbrooke.(sc)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #183 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Victims' Communications Produced By The Weinstein Company To Harvey Weinstein. [CORRECTED]. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #161 Notice (Other) In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Harvey Weinstein's Motion to Stay. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Fegan in Support re: #183 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Victims' Communications Produced By The Weinstein Company To Harvey Weinstein.. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #183 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Victims' Communications Produced By The Weinstein Company To Harvey Weinstein. . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Victims' Communications Produced By The Weinstein Company To Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Protective Order-TOC)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Irwin Reiter. Document filed by Larissa Gomes, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Katherine Kendall, Louisette Geiss, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Thompson, Zoe Brock, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Sagemiller. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Silvia L. Serpe dated 12/12/12. Document filed by Mark Gill.(Ryan, Paul)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Silvia L. Serpe on behalf of Mark Gill. (Serpe, Silvia)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul W. Ryan on behalf of Mark Gill. (Ryan, Paul)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #176 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2018) (ne)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #167 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #140 Amended Complaint. So ordered. Mark Gill answer due 12/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2018) (ne)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/31/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (ne)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: David Glasser answer due 12/18/2018. (ne)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard H. Dolan dated December 7, 2018. Document filed by David Glasser.(Dolan, Richard)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jolene Frederique Lavigne-Albert on behalf of David Glasser. (Lavigne-Albert, Jolene)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Eilender on behalf of David Glasser. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Eric Grover on behalf of David Glasser. (Grover, Douglas)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Henry Dolan on behalf of David Glasser. (Dolan, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Barbara Schneeweiss served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Nicole Sedita. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Pete on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Pete, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #165 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/30/2018) (jca)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. David Glasser served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by David Glasser. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from Defendant Mark Gill to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated November 30, 2018. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: granting #160 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Frank Gil answer due 12/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) (ama)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elior Shiloh dated November 29, 2018. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 DECLARATION of Benjamin Brafman in Support re: #161 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #161 Notice (Other) . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 DECLARATION of Elior D. Shiloh in Support re: #161 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Motion to Stay Action. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Stay Motion TOC)(Shiloh, Elior)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from Defendant, Frank Gil, to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated November 28, 2018. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #140 Amended Complaint. So ordered. Irwin Reiter answer due 12/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/26/2018) (ne)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from Defendant Irwin Reiter to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated November 21, 2018. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Mark Gill served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. Service was accepted by Hannah Weg. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Lawrence Steve Spiegel; Abigail Elizabeth Davis and Ashly Nikkole Davis terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/20/2018) (ne)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered as to amended briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/20/2018) (ne)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Buena Vista International, Inc answer due 12/17/2018; Disney Enterprises, Inc. answer due 12/17/2018; James Dolan answer due 12/17/2018; Michael Eisner answer due 12/17/2018; Paul Tudor Jones answer due 12/17/2018; Richard Koenigsberg answer due 12/17/2018; Marc Lasry answer due 12/17/2018; Lance Maerov answer due 12/17/2018; Miramax Film NY, LLC answer due 12/17/2018; Jeff Sackman answer due 12/17/2018; Tim Sarnoff answer due 12/17/2018; The Walt Disney Company answer due 12/17/2018; The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC answer due 12/17/2018; Harvey Weinstein answer due 12/17/2018; Robert Weinstein answer due 12/17/2018; Dirk Ziff answer due 12/17/2018. Responses due by 1/31/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (ne)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Served Defendants and Plaintiffs dated November 19, 2018. Document filed by Dirk Ziff.(Spiegel, Lawrence)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 DECLARATION of Lawrence S. Spiegel in Support re: #152 MOTION for Lawrence S. Spiegel; Abigail E. Davis; Ashly N. Davis to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant James Dolan.. Document filed by James Dolan. (Spiegel, Lawrence)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for Lawrence S. Spiegel; Abigail E. Davis; Ashly N. Davis to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant James Dolan. Document filed by James Dolan.(Spiegel, Lawrence)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of James Dolan. (Perala, Brett)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of James Dolan. (Rosenberg, John)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Nancy Ashbrooke served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Ashbrooke. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Frank Gil served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Service was accepted by Frank Gil. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Irwin Reiter served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by Irwin Reiter. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Buena Vista International, Inc waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Disney Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Walt Disney Company waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Eisner waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. Document filed by Larissa Gomes; Jane Doe; Caitlin Dulany; Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt); Melissa Thompson; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buena Vista International Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company, The Walt Disney Company c/o Corporation Service, Michael Eisner, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Irwin Reiter, David Glasser, Frank Gil, Rick Schwartz,Fabrizio Lombardo, Mark Gill, Nancy Ashbrooke, Barbara Schneeweiss, re: #140 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan to RE-FILE Document No. #141 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buena Vista International Inc. , The Walt Disney Company, Michael Eisner, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Irwin Reiter, David Glasser, Frank Gil, Rick Schwartz,Fabrizio Lombardo, Mark Gill, Nancy Ashbrooke, Barbara Schneeweiss, re: #140 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Jane Doe, Caitlin Dulany, Louisette Geiss, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Tarak Ben Ammar, James Dolan, John Does 1-50, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Does 1-10, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff, The Walt Disney Company, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Buena Vista International, Inc, Michael Eisner, Irwin Reiter, David Glasser, Frank Gil, Mark Gill, Fabrizio Lombardo, Nancy Ashbrooke, Rick Schwartz, Barbara Schneeweiss, Talent Agency Does 1-100 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Katherine Kendall, Louisette Geiss, Zoe Brock, Sara Ann Thomas, Melissa Sagemiller, Jane Doe, Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt), Melissa Thompson, Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Mary E. Flynn and Aaron Michael Schue terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/11/2018) (ne)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elior Daniel Shiloh on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DECLARATION of Mary E. Flynn in Support re: #136 MOTION for Mary E. Flynn and Aaron M. Schue to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Harvey Weinstein.. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Flynn, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Mary E. Flynn and Aaron M. Schue to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Mary)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #133 Motion to Withdraw. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/3/2018) (ne)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Steve W. Berman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, 1301 2nd Avenue, Suite 2000, Seattle, WA, United States 98101, 2066237292. (Berman, Steve)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Appearances of Attorneys Cris Armenta and Credence Sol. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER TERMINATING MOTION terminating #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The motion having been resolved, the Clerk shall terminate Dkt. No. 19. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/28/2018) (ne)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 9/12/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CORRECTED ARGUMENT proceeding held on 9/12/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CORRECTED ARGUMENT held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TERMINATING MOTIONS: #73 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin Putnam dated February 20, 2018. filed by Tim Sarnoff, #72 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin Putnam dated February 20, 2018. filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax Film Corp., Miramax, LLC. The Clerk shall terminate Dkt. Nos. 72,73. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/2018) (jca)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO AMEND granting #47 Motion to Dismiss; granting #53 Motion to Dismiss; granting #55 Motion to Dismiss; granting #57 Motion to Dismiss; granting #65 Motion to Dismiss; granting #69 Motion to Dismiss; granting #86 Motion to Dismiss; granting #89 Motion to Dismiss; granting #101 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated at oral argument, the motions to dismiss are granted without prejudice to amending the complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by October 31, 2018, and defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by November 30, 2018. The opposition to any motions by defendants is due December 24, 2018; defendants' replies are due by January 7, 2019. The parties shall also brief the question of subject matter jurisdiction, specifically whether jurisdiction under the Class Action Fairness Act, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d), is appropriate. Defendants shall file their opening brief on this issue by November 30, 2018, and parties shall follow the briefing schedule described above. The Clerk shall terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 47, 53, 55, 57, 65, 69, 86, 89, 101). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/12/2018) (ne)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Responses due by 12/24/2018 Replies due by 1/7/2019. (ne)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Oral Argument held on 9/12/2018 re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax Film Corp., Miramax, LLC, #89 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Jeff Sackman, #55 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Richard Koenigsberg, #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. filed by Tim Sarnoff, #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint. filed by Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, James Dolan, #101 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Robert Weinstein, #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations. filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, #86 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Lance Maerov, #57 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Harvey Weinstein, ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018., Motions due by 11/30/2018., Replies due by 1/7/2019., Responses due by 12/21/2018). (Court Reporter Sam Mauro) (Jones, Brigitte)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax Film Corp., Miramax, LLC, #89 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Jeff Sackman, #55 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Richard Koenigsberg, #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. filed by Tim Sarnoff, #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint. filed by Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, James Dolan, #101 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Robert Weinstein, #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations. filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, #86 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Lance Maerov, #57 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Harvey Weinstein, ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018., Motions due by 11/30/2018., Replies due by 1/7/2019., Responses due by 12/24/2018). (Jones, Brigitte)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #124 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Oral argument is adjourned to September 12, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. The responsive pleadings in Dulany, for all defendants, are due October 3, 2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/6/2018) (mro)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 9/12/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (mro)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elizabeth A. Fegan dated August 3, 2018. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for an oral argument. Date: September 5, 2018 Time: 12:00 p.m. Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007 It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. So Ordered. (Oral Argument set for 9/5/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/2018) (ne)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gerald Maatman, Jr. Esq. dated July 17, 2018 re: Retention of Special Counsel. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #116 Motion for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/2/2018) (ne)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #116 MOTION for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15270305. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC. (Putnam, Marvin)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #89 MOTION to Dismiss ., #86 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman. (David, Israel)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin S. Putnam, Phyllis Kupferstein, Gary Stein, Lawrence S. Spiegel, James V. Masella, III, Roberto Finzi, Israel David, and John C. Scalzo dated June 29, 2018 re: Defendants' Letter to Judge Hellerstein Regarding Coordination of Briefing. Document filed by James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff.(Putnam, Marvin)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15270305. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua G. Hamilton, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Joshua)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Kupferstein, Phyllis)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Roberto Finzi dated June 29, 2018 re: Defendants Jones and Lasry's motions to dismiss. Document filed by Marc Lasry.(Finzi, Roberto)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint. . Document filed by James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff. (Masella, James)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. dated June 26, 2018 re: Status of Retention Application for Seyfarth Shaw LLP in Bankruptcy Court and TWCs Deadline for Reply Brief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 108(c)(2). Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Order Lifting Stay in Bankruptcy Proceeding re: #85 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, #105 Notice (Other), #99 Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,,. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Lifting Bankruptcy Stay)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS MIRAMAX FILM CORP. AND MIRAMAX, LLC: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A), Plaintiffs Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Zoe Brock, Sarah Ann Thomas, Melissa Sagemiller, and Nannette Klatt voluntarily dismiss their claims against Miramax Film Corp. and Miramax, LLC without prejudice. Voluntary dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims is appropriate given that no party has served an answer or motion for summary judgment. This notice does not affect Plaintiffs' claims against any other defendant, including Miramax Film NY, LLC and Miramax Does 1-10. (Miramax Film Corp. and Miramax, LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/2018) (ras)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Elizabeth Fegan for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #107 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with a handwritten signature of the attorney to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #89 MOTION to Dismiss ., #55 MOTION to Dismiss ., #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint., #101 MOTION to Dismiss ., #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations., #86 MOTION to Dismiss ., #57 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' Combined Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Miramax Film Corp., Miramax, LLC. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/4/2018 (km).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #108 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #89 MOTION to Dismiss ., #55 MOTION to Dismiss ., #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint., #101 MOTION to Dismiss ., #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations., #86 MOTION to Dismiss ., #57 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' Combined Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/6/2018 (db).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Filing in Bankruptcy Proceedings. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/13/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/13/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Theodore Kohn on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Kohn, Brian)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDING: As stated on the record: Plaintiff shall oppose all pending motions to dismiss by June 1, 2018. Defendants shall reply by June 29, 2018. Defendant Robert Weinstein shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 20, 2018...Within 20 days, Plaintiffs shall move in the Bankruptcy Court, pursuant to 3 62(d), for relief from the stay to allow proceedings to continue against Defendant Weinstein Company, and shall advise the Court of the filing of said motion and the ensuing proceedings. Plaintiffs' failure to make said motion within 20 days will be grounds for dismissal of Defendant Weinstein Company from this case. (Robert Weinstein answer due 4/20/2018. Responses due by 6/1/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/17/2018) (ras)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 4/13/2018, ( Replies for all pending motions to dismiss due by 6/29/2018; Responses due by 6/1/2018). (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (Jones, Brigitte)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashly Nikkole Davis on behalf of Dirk Ziff. (Davis, Ashly)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashly Nikkole Davis on behalf of James Dolan. (Davis, Ashly)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER terminating #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties shall appear on April 13, 2018, at 10:30 A.M. for a status conference to regulate the proceedings of this case to follow. All requests for adjournments shall be made at such time. The Clerk shall terminate Dkt. No. 94. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/5/2018) (ras)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (ras)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jeff Sackman served on 3/5/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. Service was accepted by Jeff Sackman. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Flynn Coster on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Coster, Abigail)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Stein on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry A. Bohrer on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Bohrer, Barry)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #89 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jeff Sackman. (David, Israel)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Jeff Sackman.(David, Israel)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of Anne S. Aufhauser in Support re: #86 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Lance Maerov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(David, Israel)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #86 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Lance Maerov. (David, Israel)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Lance Maerov.(David, Israel)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC . Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Maatman, Gerald)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So ordered. (The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC answer due 3/9/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/2018) (ras)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, Defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings, LLC request for an extension to respond to Plaintiffs complaint as a courtesy request for Bob Weinstein and Lance Maerov addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr., Esq. dated March 20, 2018. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #81 Motion for M. Cris Armenta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/9/2018) (ras)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for M. Cris Armenta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Supplement Certificate of Standing)(Armenta, Maria)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for M. Cris Armenta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lance Maerov served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, WPP Messenger Center Security. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 4/6/2018. Replies due by 5/7/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/28/2018) (ras)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for M. Cris Armenta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14752697. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Armenta, Maria) Modified on 2/28/2018 (ma).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #78 MOTION for M. Cris Armenta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14752697. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING MUST BE ISSUED BY THE SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Weinstein served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. Service was accepted by Robert Peck, Controller. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #55 MOTION to Dismiss ., #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint., #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint., #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations., #57 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Peter Gordon on behalf of Richard Koenigsberg. New Address: Reed Smith LLP (NYC), 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY, 10022, (212)-521-5400. (Gordon, Jonathan)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #60 Motion for Laura R. Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/21/2018) (ras)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Laura R. Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14721844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin Putnam dated February 20, 2018. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff.(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin Putnam dated February 20, 2018. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC.(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of Marvin S. Putnam in Support re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Marvin S. Putnam in Support re: #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Miramax Film Corp.'s Entity Information, #3 Exhibit C -- Miramax Film NY, LLC's Entity Information, #4 Exhibit D -- Miramax, LLC's Entity Information, #5 Exhibit E -- Miramax Film NY, LLC's Articles of Organization)(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marvin S. Putnam on behalf of Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent beIN MEDIA GROUP for Miramax, LLC. Document filed by Miramax, LLC.(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FilmYard Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Miramax Guaranty Services, LLC for Miramax Film NY, LLC. Document filed by Miramax Film NY, LLC.(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FilmYard Holdings LLC for Miramax Film Corp.. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp..(Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Laura R. Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14721844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC, Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Laura)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marvin S. Putnam on behalf of Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Putnam, Marvin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #57 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Kupferstein, Phyllis)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. Return Date set for 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM.(Kupferstein, Phyllis)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg.(Scalzo, John)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint. . Document filed by James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff. (Masella, James)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, IV and XIV of the Complaint. Document filed by James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Marc Lasry, Dirk Ziff.(Masella, James) Modified on 8/2/2018 (db). (Attorney/Client representation error(s) corrected as per ecf_error email correspondence received on 8/1/18 @ 4:19pm.)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Peter Gordon on behalf of Richard Koenigsberg. (Gordon, Jonathan)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Christian Scalzo on behalf of Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Michael Schue on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Schue, Aaron)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary E. Flynn on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Flynn, Mary)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations. . Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Maatman, Gerald)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike the Class Allegations. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Yasmine Bitar on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Bitar, Karen)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lynn A. Kappelman on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Kappelman, Lynn)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Roblan Rabe on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Rabe, Scott)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lorie Elizabeth Almon on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Almon, Lorie)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. (Maatman, Gerald)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tim Sarnoff served on 1/23/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. Service was accepted by Tracy "DOE". Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. James Dolan served on 1/19/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. Service was accepted by Areti Papazoglou, Director, Legal Business Affairs. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Elizabeth Davis on behalf of James Dolan. (Davis, Abigail)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Steve Spiegel on behalf of James Dolan. (Spiegel, Lawrence)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Francis Nichols on behalf of Marc Lasry. (Nichols, Sara)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roberto Finzi on behalf of Marc Lasry. (Finzi, Roberto)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Marc Lasry. (Karp, Brad)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #32 Motion for Shelby Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/9/2018) (ras)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Shelby Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14560202. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Shelby)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Shelby Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14560202. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Vincent Masella, III on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Masella, James)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rae Ginsberg on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Ginsberg, Melissa)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Seth Ruzumna on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Ruzumna, Daniel)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Phyllis Kupferstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/8/2018) (ras) (Main Document 28 replaced on 1/8/2018) (ras).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Phyllis Kupferstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Phyllis Kupferstein, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kupferstein, Phyllis)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/2018) (ras)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Phyllis Kupferstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14534385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (WA))(Berman, Steve)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14534385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for Phyllis Kupferstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14523094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Phyllis Kupferstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14523094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Phyllis Kupferstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kupferstein, Phyllis) Modified on 12/29/2017 (wb).
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Robert Carey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/22/2017) (ras)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Elizabeth Davis on behalf of Dirk Ziff. (Davis, Abigail)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Steve Spiegel on behalf of Dirk Ziff. (Spiegel, Lawrence)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: The time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be extended to February 20, 2018, for all defendants in this case. There will be no further enlargements. (Tarak Ben Ammar answer due 2/20/2018; James Dolan answer due 2/20/2018; John Does 1-50 answer due 2/20/2018; Paul Tudor Jones answer due 2/20/2018; Richard Koenigsberg answer due 2/20/2018; Marc Lasry answer due 2/20/2018; Lance Maerov answer due 2/20/2018; Miramax Does 1-10 answer due 2/20/2018; Miramax Film Corp. answer due 2/20/2018; Miramax Film NY, LLC answer due 2/20/2018; Jeff Sackman answer due 2/20/2018; Tim Sarnoff answer due 2/20/2018; The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC answer due 2/20/2018; Harvey Weinstein answer due 2/20/2018; Robert Weinstein answer due 2/20/2018; Dirk Ziff answer due 2/20/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/2017) (ras)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Marvin S. Putnam dated December 21, 2017. Document filed by Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC.(Putnam, Marvin)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Richard Koenigsberg served on 12/9/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. Service was accepted by Richard Koenigsberg. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Miramax, LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2017, answer due 2/20/2018. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Miramax Film Corp. served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. Service was accepted by Kevin Vohnoutka. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Miramax Film NY, LLC served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. Service was accepted by Kevin Vohnoutka. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Robert Carey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14502137. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (AZ), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (CO), #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Robert Carey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14502137. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So ordered. (The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC answer due 1/30/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/2017) (ras)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, from January 2 to January 30, 2018 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr., dated December 19, 2017. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC.(Maatman, Gerald)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/14/2017) (ras)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Emily Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/14/2017) (ras)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Emily Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Emily)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fegan, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Emily Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14470885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Emily) Modified on 12/13/2017 (wb).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14470844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fegan, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/13/2017 (wb).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for Emily Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Emily Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14470885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #6 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14470844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to rule 1.3. please attach and affidavit or Declaration of the Attorney;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marc Lasry waiver sent on 12/8/2017, answer due 2/6/2018. Document filed by Katherine Kendall; Louisette Geiss; Nannette Klatt; Zoe Brock; Sara Ann Thomas; Melissa Sagemiller. (Zweig, Jason)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tarak Ben Ammar, James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Marc Lasry, Lance Maerov, Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff. (laq)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax Film Corp., Miramax Film NY, LLC, Marc Lasry, Tim Sarnoff, Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Lance Maerov, Richard Koenigsber, Paul Tudor Jones, James L. Dolan, Dirk Ziff, Miramax, LLC, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Tarak Ben Ammar, Jeff Sackman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Zoe Brock, Louisette Geiss, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Melissa Sagemiller, Sarah Ann Thomas (A/K/A Sarah Ann Masse). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Zweig, Jason)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zweig, Jason)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14441685)Document filed by Katherine Kendall, Louisette Geiss, Nannette Klatt, Zoe Brock, Sarah Ann Thomas (A/K/A Sarah Ann Masse), Melissa Sagemiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zweig, Jason) Modified on 12/6/2017 (laq).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Allen Zweig. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zoe Brock, Louisette Greiss, John Does 1-50, Katherine Kendall, Nannette Klatt, Miramax Does 1-10, Melissa Sagemiller, Sara Ann Thomas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (laq)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (laq)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (laq)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiss et al v. The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dolan
Represented By: Abigail Elizabeth Davis
Represented By: Brett Thomas Perala
Represented By: Ashly Nikkole Davis
Represented By: John Jacob Rosenberg
Represented By: Lawrence Steve Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Koenigsberg
Represented By: John Christian Scalzo
Represented By: Jonathan Peter Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Lasry
Represented By: Daniel Martin Stone
Represented By: Roberto Finzi
Represented By: Sara Francis Nichols
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Represented By: Nicolas Martin Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Ziff
Represented By: Abigail Elizabeth Davis
Represented By: Ashly Nikkole Davis
Represented By: Lawrence Steve Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarak Ben Ammar
Represented By: Matthew David Stockwell
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wexler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Jorrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sackman
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC
Represented By: Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr
Represented By: Scott Roblan Rabe
Represented By: Lorie Elizabeth Almon
Represented By: Karen Yasmine Bitar
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Paul Howard Zumbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Weinstein
Represented By: Barry A. Bohrer
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Represented By: Abigail Flynn Coster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sarnoff
Represented By: Joshua Garrett Hamilton
Represented By: Marvin S. Putnam
Represented By: Laura R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Film Corp.
Represented By: Marvin S. Putnam
Represented By: Laura R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Represented By: Mary E. Flynn
Represented By: Aaron Michael Schue
Represented By: Elior Daniel Shiloh
Represented By: Brian Pete
Represented By: Phyllis Kupferstein
Represented By: Simi Bhutani
Represented By: Imran H. Ansari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax, LLC
Represented By: Marvin S. Putnam
Represented By: Laura R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Maerov
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Film NY, LLC
Represented By: Marvin S. Putnam
Represented By: Laura R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tudor Jones
Represented By: James Vincent Masella, III
Represented By: Daniel Seth Ruzumna
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Represented By: Alejandro Hari Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miramax Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Glasser
Represented By: Richard Henry Dolan
Represented By: Jolene Frederique Lavigne-Albert
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: Douglas Eric Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan R Chesler
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan R Chesler
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Eisner
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan R Chesler
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talent Agency Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Schneeweiss
Represented By: Robert Marc Barta
Represented By: Daniel Y. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabrizio Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gill
Represented By: Silvia L. Serpe
Represented By: Paul W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ashbrooke
Represented By: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf
Represented By: Allison Noel Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista International, Inc
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan R Chesler
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sagemiller
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisette Geiss
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette Klatt
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Brock
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: John Clune
Represented By: Daniel D. Williams
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Kendall
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ann Thomas
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Gomes
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Dulany
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ann Masse
Represented By: Jason Allen Zweig
Represented By: Shelby Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Maria Cristina Armenta
Represented By: Emily R Brown
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette May (f/k/a Nannette Klatt)
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Whitney K. Siehl
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Lynn A. Ellenberger
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rowena Chiu
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Wedil David
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dominique Huett
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Zelda Perkins
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kaja Sokola
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Tarale Wulff
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alexandra Canosa
Represented By: Thomas Peter Giuffra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jane Doe III
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jane Doe IV
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Miriam Haley
Represented By: John R. Cuti
Represented By: Gloria Rachel Allred
Represented By: Mariann Meier Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?