Grajales Rincon et al v. Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Salvador Rojas, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Salvador Dircio Nava, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Mario Valdez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Noel Monroy Alonso, David Conde, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Freddy Anzures, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Saul Dircio, Javier Velasquez, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Esteban Morales, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Alejandro Garcia, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar and Carlos Nava
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, CT Corporation System, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure, Chop't WFC LLC doing business as Chop't WFC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC doing business as Chop't Creative Salad, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC doing business as Chop't Union Square, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 52nd Street, Chop't 100 Park LLC doing business as Chop't 100 Park, Chop't Soho LLC doing business as Chop't Soho, Chop't 23rd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 23rd Street, Chop't 80 Pine LLC doing business as Chop't 80 Pine, Chop't NYP LLC doing business as Chop't NYP, Chop't Astor LLC doing business as Chop't Astor and Chop't 42nd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 42 Street
Case Number: 1:2017cv10128
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: This Court having been advised that the parties have reached agreement on all issues in this matter, the Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to close the above-captioned action, without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if an application to restore is made within forty-five (45) days. All conferences previously scheduled are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/2/2019) (rj)
April 1, 2019 Filing 65 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Case Deadlines Due to Settlement addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Amy J. Traub dated April 1, 2019. Document filed by CT Corporation System, Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure.(Traub, Amy)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Sara Jacqueline Isaacson terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/19/2019) (jwh)
February 18, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Sara Jacqueline Isaacson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan.(Isaacson, Sara)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference was adjourned to April 11, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/5/2019) (kv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 61 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gennadiy Naydenskiy dated February 4, 2019. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan.(Faillace, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to February 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/4/2018) (jwh)
December 4, 2018 Filing 59 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Amy J. Traub dated December 4, 2018 re: Request for an Adjournment of Initial Conference and Case Deadlines. Document filed by CT Corporation System, Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure.(Traub, Amy)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Conference is adjourned until December 6, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/17/2018) (rj)
October 16, 2018 Filing 57 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 18, 2018 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Amy J. Traub dated October 16, 2018. Document filed by Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure.(Traub, Amy)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2018) (jca)
September 20, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
August 28, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gennadiy Naydenskiy on behalf of Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The telephonic status conference currently scheduled for Friday, September 7, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. (see ECF No. 53) is hereby rescheduled to Friday, October 19, 2018, at 10 a.m. The parties shall provide Chambers with a call-in number ahead of the conference, unless the Court orders otherwise. With one exception, all deadlines set forth in the Court's May 14 Order (ECF No. 53) remain unchanged. The one exception is that the trial date, incorrectly set to commence on May 20, 2018, is rescheduled to commence on May 20, 2019. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/15/2018) (js)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Close of fact discovery: 2/28/19. Opening: 3/4/19. Opp'n: 3/25/19. Reply: 4/5/19. Trial will be before a jury. The next status conference is set for Sept. 7th at 9:00a.m. (telephonic). Trial in this matter shall commence on 5/20/18. Trial is anticipated to take one week. (As further set forth in this Order.) Motions due by 3/4/2019. Responses due by 3/25/2019 Replies due by 4/5/2019. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/14/2018) (cf)
May 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/14/2018. (jp)
May 8, 2018 Filing 52 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan.(Barton, Jesse)
March 15, 2018 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chop't Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. for Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC. Document filed by Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC.(Traub, Amy)
March 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Amy Joy Traub to RE-FILE Document #49 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 14, 2018 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chop't Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Chop't Creative Salad Company, LLC for Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC. Document filed by Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC.(Traub, Amy)
March 14, 2018 Filing 49 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chop't Holdings, LLC for Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC. Document filed by Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC.(Traub, Amy) Modified on 3/15/2018 (lb).
March 14, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure.(Traub, Amy)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #46 Letter, filed by Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Based upon the representations herein, the initial conference is adjourned to 5/14/2018 at 1pm. (Initial Conference set for 5/14/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/12/2018) (mml)
February 9, 2018 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Amy J. Traub dated February 9, 2018 re: Requesting Reconsideration of the Court's February 8, 2018 Order. Document filed by Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure.(Traub, Amy)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part #44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered. Denial for the duration requested. The Court will adjourn the time to move/answer to 3/14/18; the IPTC shall be rescheduled to 3/19/18 at 1:30 pm (telephonic). Initial conference set for 3/19/2018, at 1:30 P.M. Answer due by 3/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/8/2018) (ap)
February 8, 2018 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and to Adjourn the March 2, 2018 Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Amy J. Traub dated February 8, 2018. Document filed by Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Traub, Amy)
February 8, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saima Zuberi Sheikh on behalf of Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure. (Sheikh, Saima)
February 8, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure. (Traub, Amy)
February 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: CT Corporation System answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't 100 Park LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't 23rd Street LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't 42nd Street LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't 80 Pine LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't Astor LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't NYP LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't Soho LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Chop't WFC LLC answer due 3/14/2018; Tony Shure answer due 3/14/2018. Set/Reset Hearings: (Initial Conference set for 3/19/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (ap) Modified on 2/9/2018 (ap).
February 5, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse S Barton on behalf of Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan. (Barton, Jesse)
February 2, 2018 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tony Shure served on 1/24/2018, answer due 2/14/2018. Service was accepted by Ms. Alexandra, Co-Worker. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't WFC LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't Astor LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't 100 Park LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't 80 Pine LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't 42nd Street LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Chop't 23rd Street LLC served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche; Pablo Rivera Lorenzo; Joaquin Luna-Gomez; Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon; David Conde; Eduardo Velasquez Candia; Javier Chanez-Ruiz; Alejandro Grajales Rincon; Ricardo Robles Ramirez; Mario Valdez; Margarito Basurto de Jesus; Brigido Mejia Aldana; Rafael Rojas Ramos; Juan Victor Martinez Mendez; Guillermo Fernandez Galindo; Teofilo Barrera Leon; Noel Monroy Alonso; Reginaldo Anibal Rojas; Fausto Mendez-Camano; Freddy Orlando Jacinto; Alejandro Garcia; Luis Angel Ramos Ponce; Freddy Anzures; Misael Leon Sanchez; Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera; Andres Fuentes-Tapia; Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan; Esteban Morales; Salvador Dircio Nava; Saul Dircio; Ismael Matias Valdez; Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin; Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar; Salvador Rojas; Javier Velasquez; Damian Reyes-Munoz. (Faillace, Michael)
January 2, 2018 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Judge Katherine B. Forrests Order dated December 28, 2017 (Dkt. No. 17) and a copy of her Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Chopt Creative Salad Company LLC (d/b/a Chopt Creative Salad), Chopt Soho LLC. (d/b/a Chopt Soho), Chop't 100 Park LLC (d/b/a Chopt 100 Park), Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC (d/b/a Chopt Union Square), Chop't Astor LLC (d/b/a Chopt Astor), Chop't 42nd Street LLC (d/b/a Chopt 42 Street), Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street, LLC (d/b/a Chopt 52nd Street), Chop't 80 Pine LLC (d/b/a Chopt 80 Pine), Chop't 23rd Street LLC (d/b/a Chopt 23rd Street), Chop't WFC LLC (d/b/a Chopt WFC), Chop't Nyp LLC (d/b/a Chopt NYP), CT Corporation System and Tony Shure on 12/28/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan. (Faillace, Michael)
December 29, 2017 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tony Shure. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't WFC LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't Soho LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't NYP LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't Astor LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't 100 Park LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't 80 Pine LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't 42nd Street LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chop't 23rd Street LLC. (pne)
December 29, 2017 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CT Corporation System. (pne)
December 28, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Freddy Anzures, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, David Conde, Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin, Saul Dircio, Salvador Dircio Nava, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Alejandro Garcia, Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, Ismael Matias Valdez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Noel Monroy Alonso, Esteban Morales, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Salvador Rojas, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Mario Valdez, Javier Velasquez, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan. (Isaacson, Sara)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for a telephonic initial pretrial conference (IPTC) on Friday, March 2, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call Chambers (212-805-0276) from one line at that time. All counsel in receipt of this order shall notify all other parties (or, if known, their attorneys) of the IPTC by serving each of them with a copy of this order and with a copy of the Courts Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Counsel shall file proof of such service with the Court. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) Initial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/28/2017) (ama)
December 28, 2017 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
December 28, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 28, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Alejandro Grajales Rincon, Andres Fuentes-Tapia, Damian Reyes-Munoz, Eduardo Velasquez Candia, Esteban Morales, Fausto Mendez-Camano, Alejandro Garcia, Ismael Matias Valdez, Javier Chanez-Ruiz, Javier Velasquez, Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon, Luis Angel Ramos Ponce, Margarito Basurto de Jesus, Mario Valdez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Noel Monroy Alonso, Pablo Rivera Lorenzo, Reginaldo Anibal Rojas, Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar, Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera, Salvador Dircio Nava (a.k.a. Carlos Nava), Salvador Rojas, Saul Dircio, Teofilo Barrera Leon, Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan, Freddy Orlando Jacinto, Ricardo Robles Ramirez, Brigido Mejia Aldana, Guillermo Fernandez Galindo, Rafael Rojas Ramos, Joaquin Luna-Gomez, Freddy Anzures, Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche, Juan Victor Martinez Mendez, David Conde and Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reason: party text contained a typographical error. (pne)
December 28, 2017 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 28, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: No Courthouse Assignment was selected on civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
December 28, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 27, 2017 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt Creative Salad Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt Soho LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt 100 Park LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt Astor LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt 42nd street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt 80 Pine LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt 23rd Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt WFC LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chopt NYP LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CT Corporation System, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tony Shure, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), David Conde(individually), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Saul Dircio(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(individually), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Valdez(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 12/28/2017
December 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CT Corporation System, Chop't 100 Park LLC, Chop't 23rd Street LLC, Chop't 42nd Street LLC, Chop't 80 Pine LLC, Chop't Astor LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC, Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC, Chop't NYP LLC, Chop't Soho LLC, Chop't WFC LLC, Tony Shure. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14518396)Document filed by Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(individually), Noel Monroy Alonso(on behalf of others similarly situated), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(individually), David Conde(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(individually), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ismael Matias Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(individually), Mario Valdez(individually), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(on behalf of others similarly situated), Brigido Mejia Aldana(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(individually), Javier Velasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Esteban Morales(on behalf of others similarly situated), Noel Monroy Alonso(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(individually), Fausto Mendez-Camano(individually), Saul Dircio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Anzures(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(individually), Teofilo Barrera Leon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(individually), Joaquin Luna-Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fausto Mendez-Camano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Brigido Mejia Aldana(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Dircio Nava(individually), Ismael Matias Valdez(individually), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Robles Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(individually), Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin(individually), Freddy Anzures(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Velasquez(individually), Rafael Rojas Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche(on behalf of others similarly situated), Javier Chanez-Ruiz(individually), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Grajales Rincon(individually), Misael Leon Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Margarito Basurto de Jesus(individually), Mario Valdez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Fernandez Galindo(individually), Juan Victor Martinez Mendez(individually), Teofilo Barrera Leon(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(on behalf of others similarly situated), Freddy Orlando Jacinto(individually), Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Garcia(individually), Luis Angel Ramos Ponce(individually), Damian Reyes-Munoz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(individually), Reginaldo Anibal Rojas(on behalf of others similarly situated), Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan(individually), Esteban Morales(individually), Saul Dircio(individually), Eduardo Velasquez Candia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(on behalf of others similarly situated), Andres Fuentes-Tapia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Pablo Rivera Lorenzo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar(individually), Salvador Dircio Nava(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Reyes-Munoz(individually).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grajales Rincon et al v. Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Francisco Sapon Ajche
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulalio Alecxander Ventura Tuluxan
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Victor Martinez Mendez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Rojas
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofilo Barrera Leon
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginaldo Anibal Rojas
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Sebastian Rivera
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Angel Ramos Ponce
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Dircio Nava
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Robles Ramirez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Matias Valdez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Valdez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misael Leon Sanchez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigido Mejia Aldana
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Chanez-Ruiz
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Luna-Gomez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Grajales Rincon
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Monroy Alonso
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conde
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Reyes-Munoz
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Orlando Jacinto
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Velasquez Candia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Anzures
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Rojas Ramos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Dircio
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Velasquez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito Basurto de Jesus
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Morales
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Cuanalo Chapulin
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Garcia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Fuentes-Tapia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Mendez-Camano
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Fernandez Galindo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Rivera Lorenzo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Catarino Mondragon
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Martinez Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Nava
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 23rd Street LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 100 Park LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 80 Pine LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't NYP LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Soho LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 42nd Street LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Corporation System
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Astor LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't WFC LLC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Shure
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't WFC LLC doing business as Chop't WFC
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Company LLC doing business as Chop't Creative Salad
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Co. Union Square LLC doing business as Chop't Union Square
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Creative Salad Company 52nd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 52nd Street
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 100 Park LLC doing business as Chop't 100 Park
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Soho LLC doing business as Chop't Soho
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 23rd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 23rd Street
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 80 Pine LLC doing business as Chop't 80 Pine
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't NYP LLC doing business as Chop't NYP
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't Astor LLC doing business as Chop't Astor
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chop't 42nd Street LLC doing business as Chop't 42 Street
Represented By: Saima Zuberi Sheikh
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?