Asencio v. The City Of New York , et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Asencio
Defendant: The City Of New York, The New York City Department of Probation, The New York City Department Of Correction and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv00097
Filed: January 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sidney H. Stein
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: The Court is presiding over a criminal trial which will continue this week. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the final pretrial conference scheduled for June 21, 2021, is adjourned to July 9, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/16/2021) (cf)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: The Court has been advised that the Ad Hoc Committee on the Resumption of Jury Trials has scheduled the trial of this matter to commence on Wednesday, July 14, 2021. This matter is the third trial scheduled for that date and will commence if the first two trials scheduled for July 14 resolve themselves prior to July 14. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The last day for the parties to file the joint pretrial order, any motions in limine, proposed jury charges, and proposed voir dire, remains June 7, 2021; 2. The last day to file responses to any motions in limine remains June 14, 2021; and 3. The final pretrial conference remains scheduled for June 21, 2021, at 12:30 p.m., (Motions due by 6/7/2021., Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2021., Responses due by 6/14/2021, Ready for Trial by 7/14/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/4/2021) (nb)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for June 21, 2021, and Response to Court's Order Dated April 29, 2021 addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Hannah V. Faddis dated May 5, 2021. Document filed by Garrett Hall, Jose Medina. The time of the conference on June 21, 2021, is moved to 12:30 p.m. So ordered. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/6/2021) (rjm)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. The trial of this matter is scheduled to begin on July 12, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. [Doc. No. 71]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are directed to notify this Court in writing on or before May 5, 2021, as to what the likelihood is of this trial proceeding to trial rather than being consensually resolved prior to trial. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/29/2021) (rjm)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: There will be a teleconference on January 28, 2021, at 2:15 p.m. All participants must identify themselves every time they speak, spell any proper names for the court reporter, and take care not to interrupt or speak over one another. Fina lly, all of those accessing the conference whether in listen-only mode or otherwise are reminded that recording or rebroadcasting of the proceeding is prohibited by law. Counsel should adhere to the following rules and guidelines during the telec onference: Each party should designate a single lawyer to speak on its behalf (including when noting the appearances of other counsel on the telephone). Counsel should use a landline whenever possible, should use a headset instead of a speakerphone , and must mute themselves whenever they are not speaking to eliminate background noise. In addition, counsel should not use voice-activated systems that do not allow the user to know when someone else is trying to speak at the same time. To facili tate an orderly teleconference and the creation of an accurate transcript, counsel are required to identify themselves every time they speak. Counsel should spell any proper names for the court reporter. Counsel should also take special care not to interrupt or speak over one another. If there is a beep or chime indicating that a new caller has joined while counsel is speaking, counsel should pause to allow the Court to ascertain the identity of the new participant and confirm that the court reporter has not been dropped from the call. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/27/2021) ( Telephone Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 02:15 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (ks)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the Southern District of New York has a limited number of specially designated courtrooms available for jury trials. The judges of the Southern District, working with the Clerk of Court, have worked to schedule trials in the first quarter of 2021, so that trials may proceed safely. Once a trial date is set for an action through this process, it cannot be changed, although it may be adjourned to another quarter of 2021 if extenuating circumstances arise. Ac cordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The trial of this matter remains at February 22, 2021, at 9:30 a.m.; 2. The last day to file the joint pretrial order, any motions in limine, proposed jury charges, and proposed voir dire, is February 1, 2021; 3. The last day to file responses to any motions in limine is February 8, 2021; and 4. There will be a final pretrial conference on February 12, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. (Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein., Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/9/2020) (nb)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requested dates in the parties' joint letter [Doc. No. 59] are granted as follows: The deadline to file the joint pretrial order, motions in limine, proposed jury charges, and proposed voir dire questions is September 7, 2020. The deadline to file responses to motions in limine is September 14, 2020. The trial remains scheduled to begin on September 29, 2020 at 9:30 AM. So ordered. (Motions due by 9/7/2020. Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2020. Responses due by 9/14/2020). (Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/1/2020) (rjm)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held today, with counsel for all parties present, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants shall notify the Court, in writing, whether they intend to move for partial summary judgment in favor of Probation Officer Medina; 2. If defendants move, they shall do so on or before February 28, 2020; 3. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due on or before March 13, 2020; 4. Defendants' reply is due on or before March 20, 2020; 5. The joint pret rial order, proposed jury charges, and, if the parties wish, proposed voir dire and any motions in limine, are due on or before April 27, 2020; and 4. The trial of this matter will begin on May 11, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/30/2020) Motions due by 4/27/2020., Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2020., Responses due by 3/13/2020, Replies due by 3/20/2020.) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asencio v. The City Of New York , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Asencio
Represented By: Paul V. Prestia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Department of Probation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Department Of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?