November 10, 2021 |
Filing
133
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: The Court therefore concludes that Hartford has not established a prima facie case, and that even if it had, the evidence adduced at trial demonstrates by a preponderance of the evidence that the cargo was dam aged by the insufficiency of package, and Hartford has not demonstrated a concurrent cause of loss in the fault and neglect of Maersk. The Court finds by a preponderance of evidence in favor of Maersk. Sapsan LLC and Albatrans, Inc. having been previously dismissed by the Court, the Clerk shall enter final judgment for all defendants and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/10/2021) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
September 27, 2021 |
Filing
132
ORDER: Bench trial is scheduled for October 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Bench Trial set for 10/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/27/2021) (ama)
|
July 22, 2021 |
Filing
131
ORDER: In the exercise of discretion, the Court allowed plaintiff to belatedly call Bruno and submit his direct testimony of Bruno by June 22, which was less than a month before the then-scheduled date of trial. Plaintiff did not. Letter application (Doc. 129) which seeks to compel the defendant to produce Bruno for cross-examination on his deposition testimony is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/22/2021) (ama)
|
June 11, 2021 |
Filing
124
ORDER: The final pretrial conference will take place as scheduled on Tuesday, June 15, 2021 at 12 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. To facilitate access to the courthouse on the day of the conference, follow the instructions attached to this Order.Members of the public may access an audio feed of the proceeding through the following numbers: Call-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/11/2021) (js)
|
March 23, 2021 |
Filing
108
ORDER: By May 3, 2021, plaintiff shall file its direct testimony by affidavit and trial brief, and shall serve defendants its portion of the Joint Pretrial Order. By May 17, 2021, defendants shall file their direct testimony by affidavit and trial b riefs, and shall serve plaintiff their portion of the Joint Pretrial Order. The Joint Pretrial Order shall be filed by May 24, 2021. The final pretrial conference shall be on June 15, 2021 at 12 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. SO ORDERED., ( Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/23/2021) (ama)
|
March 11, 2021 |
Filing
107
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons explained, Maersk's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. (Docket #83.) Albatrans's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. (Docket #97.) The Clerk is directed to terminate the motions and the related let ter-motion. (Docket #92.) SO ORDERED. re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Albatrans, Inc. 92 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Albatrans Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew R. Spector, Es q. dated September 30, 2020. Document filed by Albatrans, Inc. 83 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56 F.R.C.P. filed by Maersk Line. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/11/2021) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
70
OPINION AND ORDER re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss: Sapsan's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) is GRANTED. Because the Court does not have personal jurisdiction over Sapsan, it does not reach its motion to dismiss Maersk's cross-claims pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Docket # 49.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/17/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|