EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P. et al v. Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD.,
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P. and EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P.
Defendant: Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01047
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: The telephone conference currently scheduled for July 29, 2021 is adjourned to August 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/27/2021) (jca)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: After consultation with the parties, the February 11, 2021 Amended Case Management Plan (Dkt. No. 66) is modified as follows: the parties must complete fact discovery by July 23, 2021. There will be a status conference in this matter on Ju ly 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. By July 22, 2021, any party seeking to file a motion for summary judgment following the close of fact discovery will submit a pre-motion letter in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/6/2020) ( Fact Discovery due by 7/23/2021., Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for February 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. will now take place on February 11, 2021 at 10:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/10/2021) (jca)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that there shall be a conference in this matter on Thursday, February 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the a ccess code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the s cheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. Seven days before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and GardepheNYSDChambers @nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/13/2020) (jca)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for November 12, 2020 will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, t he Court will un-mute the parties' lines. Seven days before the conference, the parties must email Michael_Ruocco@nysd.uscourts.gov and GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2020) (ama)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the telephone conference currently scheduled for July 23, 2020 is adjourned to August 6, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/22/2020) (jca)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/17/2020) (jca)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for July 24, 2020 now will take place on July 23, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. by telephone. The parties' joint letter and proposed case management plan are due on July 16, 2020. The parties are directed to di al 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. No later than July 20, 2020, the parties must email GardepheNYSDChamber s@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/26/2020) (jca)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 37 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Rachel G. Skaistis dated April 12, 2019. filed by Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD.,, 41 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel B. Goldman dated April 22, 2019. filed by EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG En ergy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., 35 MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice Of Renewed Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint"). filed by Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD., For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The parties' motions for oral argument are denied as moo t. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 35, 37, 41). The initial pretrial conference in this matter will take place on June 25, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square , New York, New York. Seven days before the conference, the parties will submit a joint letter addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claims and defenses; (2) any contemplated motions; and (3) the prospect for settlement. For the Courts convenience, the parties must set forth the conference's date and time in the joint letter's opening paragraph. In preparing their joint letter and prop osed case management plan, the parties will consult the Court's Individual Practices and model Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order both of which are available on this District's website. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/9/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P. et al v. Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Goldman
Represented By: Kerriann Law
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keppel Offshore & Marine LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?