August 13, 2020 |
Filing
68
ORDER for 67 Report and Recommendations, 58 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution filed by C. Lopez, Elvis King, City of New York. Accordingly, Defendants' motion to dismiss under Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, E CF No. 58, is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 58, and close the case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff pro se. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/13/2020) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing
67
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, this action should be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. The Clerk is requested to mail a copy of this Report and Recommendation to Floyd McGarrell at the address below. And as set forth herein. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2020 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/15/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
April 29, 2020 |
Filing
64
ORDER: Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute. In an order dated March 3, 2020, plaintiff was directed to respond by April 3, 2020 (Docket # 63). He was also warned that his case may be dismissed for failing to respond. Pl aintiff has not responded, but the Court will extend the deadline for plaintiff to oppose defendants' motion to dismiss to May 22, 2020. Defendants may file any reply by June 5, 2020. Plaintiff is again is warned that if he fails to comply with this order, his case may be dismissed. Plaintiff may file his response by email by sending it in pdf form to Temporary_Pro_Se_Filing@nysd.uscourts.gov. In the alternative, the response may be mailed to Pro Se Docketing, 500 Pearl Street, New Yor k, NY 10007. The Court also notes that the Pro Se Intake Unit at the United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, Room 105, New York, New York ((212) 805-0175) may be of assistance to plaintiff in connection with court procedures. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail this Order to Floyd McGarrell. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 5/22/2020, Replies due by 6/5/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/29/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
March 4, 2020 |
Filing
63
ORDER: Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to this motion by April 3, 2020. Defendants may file any reply by April 17, 2020. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to comply with this order, his case may be dismissed. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 4/3/2020, Replies due by 4/17/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/03/2020) (ama) Modified on 3/4/2020 (ama). Copy sent by Chambers. Modified on 3/4/2020 (ama).
|
February 26, 2020 |
Filing
57
ORDER: Nearly two months have passed since Defendants' letter, without any additional filings. It is ORDERED that by March 9, 2020, Defendants shall file a joint letter informing the Court as to the status of this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff pro se. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/26/2020) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
|
November 20, 2019 |
Filing
54
ORDER: terminating 53 Letter Motion to Compel. The Court will give plaintiff one final opportunity to comply with the Court's order. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: ( 1) on or before December 13, 2019, plaintiff shall respond, i n writing, to the interrogatories and request for documents by sending his response to defendants' attorney; and (2) on the date he mails or delivers that response, plaintiff shall telephone defendants' attorney, Ms. Bonillas at (212) 356-5 035, to inform her that he mailed or delivered the materials. If she does not answer, he shall leave a voicemail. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended without date. The defendants shall propose a new date once the discovery issue is resolved. Plaintiff is warned that ifhe fails to comply with this order, his case may be dismissed for violating court orders or for failure to prosecute. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/20/2019) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama)
|