Powell et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson, Brian Jordan, Ronald E. Powell and Robert O'Toole
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, HomeSure Services, Inc., American Security Insurance Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Assurant, Inc., Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Cross Country Home Holdings, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Altisource Asset Management Corporation, HomeSure of Virginia, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Altisource Solutions, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc. and REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01951
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #159 Brief filed by William R. Seehafer, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Brian Jordan, Robert Wilson, Donald G Schaper. ENDORSEMENT: The applicable deadlines for discovery and summary judgment briefing with respect to both threshold merits issues are as follows: discovery shall conclude on or before September 14, 2019; opening briefs shall be submitted on or before October 12, 2019; opposition briefs shall be submitted on or before November 16, 2019; and reply briefs shall be submitted on or before December 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 9/14/2019., Motions due by 10/12/2019., Responses due by 11/16/2019, Replies due by 12/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/17/2019) (rro)
April 17, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Bradley Miller on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Miller, R.)
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/14/2019. Motions due by 10/12/2019. Responses due by 11/16/2019 Replies due by 12/7/2019. (kv)
April 16, 2019 Filing 159 BRIEF re: #158 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,, Letter Motion for Clarification. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson.(Brooks, Justin)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #157 Notice (Other) filed by William R. Seehafer, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Brian Jordan, Robert Wilson, Donald G Schaper. ENDORSEMENT: I have reviewed the parties' positions and agree with Plaintiffs that discovery should be conducted simultaneously as to both of the threshold merits issues identified in my March 15, 2019 Opinion & Order, (Doc. 150). Plaintiffs' proposed discovery and briefing schedule is therefore approved. Without weighing in on any pleading issues or who may have the burden, I note that the question of "significant participation" is part and parcel of the plan assets issue and discovery should also be conducted on that question at this time. As stated in the endorsement dated March 22, 2019, (Doc. 152), Defendants need not submit an answer to Plaintiffs' complaint at this time. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 7/12/2019., Motions due by 7/26/2019., Responses due by 8/16/2019, Replies due by 8/30/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/16/2019) (kv)
April 12, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of of Case Management Proposal (Joint Filing) re: #150 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Brooks, Justin)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF MICHAEL J. KLEIN, ESQ. granting #154 Motion to Withdraw. Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw the appearance of Michael J. Klein, Esq., this Court orders that Michael J. Klein, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Mr. Klein be removed from the Court's electronic service list. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/28/2019) (rro)
March 27, 2019 Filing 155 AFFIRMATION of Michael J. Klein in Support re: #154 MOTION to Withdraw Michael J. Klein as co-counsel.. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Klein, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION to Withdraw Michael J. Klein as co-counsel. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Letter to Hon. Vernon Broderick re: #152 Memo Endorsement,, #151 Letter,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Justin)
March 22, 2019 Filing 152 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #151 Letter, filed by Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: I have reviewed the parties' positions and have concluded that Defendants shall not be obligated to serve responsive pleadings until after the disposition of Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions for summary judgment, and then, if necessary, until after the resolution of any renewed motions to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/22/2019) (rro)
March 21, 2019 Filing 151 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard A. Jacobsen dated March 21, 2019 re: Confirmation that Defendants need not serve responsive pleadings until after Court's decision on Summary Judgment Motions. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION & ORDER re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Interfinancial, Inc., American Security Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. filed by Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim. filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. filed by Southwest Business Corporation, #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). filed by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Altisource Asset Management Corporation, HomeSure Services, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., Altisource Residential Corporation, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Southwest Business Corporation, Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Interfinancial, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., American Security Insurance Company, #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, Assurant's motion to dismiss the FAC, (Doc. 88), is GRANTED IN PART, to the extent that Plaintiffs may not seek prospective relief against Assurant. The Altisource Defendants' motions to dismiss, (Docs. 93, 98), are DENIED IN PART, to the extent that they challenge Plaintiffs' standing and personal jurisdiction over Front Yard and AAMC. Defendants Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions to dismiss, (Docs. 90, 105), are also DENIED IN PART, to the extent that they challenge Plaintiffs' failure to allege that the securities at issue were not "publicly-offered" or that benefit plan investor participation in the securities was "significant." Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss is further DENIED IN PART, to the extent it alleges that the Trust Indentures' "no action" clauses bar Plaintiffs' lawsuit. Defendants Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions to dismiss the FAC, (Docs. 90, 105), are hereby converted to motions for summary judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 with respect to the following two issues: (1) whether the underlying mortgages in the AHMI Trusts qualify as "plan assets" of the UFCW Plan; and, if so, (2) whether Ocwen qualifies as a fiduciary of the UFCW Plan. Plaintiffs, Ocwen, and Wells Fargo are directed to meet and confer regarding the scope of and schedule for limited discovery on these two threshold issues. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion & Order, they shall submit a proposed Case Management Plan outlining their proposed schedule for limited discovery and supplemental briefing relating to Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions for summary judgment. Because resolution in Defendants' favor of either of the threshold merits issues raised by Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions would dispose of this action in its entirety, the remaining portions of Defendants' motions to dismiss the FAC, (Docs. 88, 90, 93, 94, 98, 99, 103, 105), are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with leave to re-file following the disposition of Ocwen's and Wells Fargo's motions for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Docs. 88, 90, 93, 94, 98, 99, 103, and 105. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/15/2019) (rro)
March 12, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Lee Brody on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Brody, Aaron)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/6/2019) Attorney Nora Anne Valenza-Frost terminated (ks) Modified on 3/7/2019 (ks).
March 5, 2019 Filing 147 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Nora A. Valenza-Frost to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Nora A. Valenza-Frost)(Valenza-Frost, Nora) Modified on 4/3/2019 (db).
March 4, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Leigh Villanueva on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Villanueva, Katherine)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert Wagner Diubaldo terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/4/2019) (kv)
March 1, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc.. New Address: Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP, 1500 K Street, NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC, 20005, (202) 842-8465. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc.. New Address: Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP, 1500 K Street, NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC, 20005, (202) 842-8465. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc.. New Address: Drinker Biddle & Reath, LLP, 1500 K Street, NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC, 20005, (202) 842-8465. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 141 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert W. DiUbaldo to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Robert W. DiUbaldo)(Diubaldo, Robert) Modified on 3/26/2019 (db).
February 22, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Response to Assurant Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re: #139 Notice (Other),. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hart, Barbara)
February 8, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority re: #89 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #126 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depot Decision)(Diubaldo, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Motion for Paul W. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
October 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #137 MOTION for Paul W. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15779211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
October 19, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION for Paul W. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15779211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul)
October 18, 2018 Filing 136 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Sidman, Howard)
October 18, 2018 Filing 135 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. . Document filed by Southwest Business Corporation. (Russo, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 134 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Residential Corporation, Altisource Solutions, Inc., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jacobsen, Richard)
October 18, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Isabel Polly Sukholitsky on behalf of Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Sukholitsky, Isabel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 132 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
October 18, 2018 Filing 131 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. (De Simone, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 130 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim. . Document filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc.. (Jacob, Charles)
October 18, 2018 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Thomas N. Kidera in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss.. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N)(Jacobsen, Richard)
October 18, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. . Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Jacobsen, Richard)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Traci L. Buschner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Diubaldo, Robert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 125 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Howard F. Sidman dated October 16, 2018 re: Exhibit E to Declaration of Howard F. Sidman in Support re: #105 MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 107-7). Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to Declaration of Howard Sidman (Dkt. No. 107-7))(Sidman, Howard)
October 10, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #124 MOTION for Traci L. Buschner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15711912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for Traci L. Buschner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15711912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Papp, Scott)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for R. Bradley Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
September 28, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #122 MOTION for R. Bradley Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15630853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 28, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #122 MOTION for R. Bradley Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15630853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION for R. Bradley Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15630853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Papp, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Justin Brooks, Esq. dated September 24, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' Request for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson.(Brooks, Justin)
September 20, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jason Klein on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Klein, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Justin Brooks in Opposition re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss ., #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint., #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim., #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Brooks, Justin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Justin Brooks in Opposition re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss ., #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim., #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)., #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Brooks, Justin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss ., #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim., #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss., #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint., #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)., #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Brooks, Justin)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF FRANCESCA G. COCUZZA, ESQ. granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw the appearance of Francesca G. Cocuzza, Esq., this Court orders that Francesca G. Cocuzza, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Ms. Cocuzza be removed from the Court's electronic service list. Attorney Francesca G Cocuzza terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/14/2018) (mro)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #114 Letter granting #112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 9/18/2018. Replies due by 10/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/10/2018) (mml)
September 11, 2018 Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott V. Papp, Esq. dated September 11, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' Application for Extension of Time (Dkt. No. 112). Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson.(Papp, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Vincent Papp on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Papp, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Filing 112 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Justin S. Brooks dated September 6, 2018. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson.(Brooks, Justin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 111 DECLARATION of David J. Fioccola in Support re: #110 MOTION for Francesca G. Cocuzza to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION for Francesca G. Cocuzza to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fioccola, David)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Rebekah B. Kcehowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Evan Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
July 13, 2018 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Howard F. Sidman in Support re: #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Sidman, Howard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Sidman, Howard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Sidman, Howard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Residential Corporation, Altisource Solutions, Inc., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jacobsen, Richard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Residential Corporation, Altisource Solutions, Inc., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Jacobsen, Richard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim. . Document filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Jacob, Charles)
July 13, 2018 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Charles R. Jacob III in Support re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim.. Document filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Jacob, Charles)
July 13, 2018 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
July 13, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc..(Fioccola, David)
July 13, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State Claim. Document filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2018(Jacob, Charles)
July 13, 2018 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. . Document filed by Southwest Business Corporation. (Russo, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Christopher Russo in Support re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss.. Document filed by Southwest Business Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Class Action Complaint filed on or about May 17, 2018)(Russo, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. (De Simone, Joseph)
July 13, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Southwest Business Corporation.(Russo, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation.(De Simone, Joseph)
July 13, 2018 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Richard A. Jacobsen in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss.. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Specimen Class VI-A-1 Note Dated December 21, 2004, #2 Exhibit B) Specimen Class III-A-3 Note Dated September 20, 2005, #3 Exhibit C) Indenture Dated December 21, 2004, #4 Exhibit D) Indenture Dated September 20, 2005, #5 Exhibit E) Closing Tax Opinion Letter Dated December 21, 2004, #6 Exhibit F) Closing Tax Opinion Letter Dated September 20, 2005, #7 Exhibit G) Certificate of Ownership Dated December 21, 2004, #8 Exhibit H) Certificate of Ownership Dated September 20, 2005, #9 Exhibit I) Servicing Agreement Dated December 21, 2004, #10 Exhibit J) Servicing Agreement Dated September 20, 2005)(Jacobsen, Richard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. . Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Jacobsen, Richard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
July 13, 2018 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Diubaldo, Robert)
July 13, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company.(Diubaldo, Robert)
July 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #87 MOTION for Rebekah B. Kcehowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15315163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 12, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION for Rebekah B. Kcehowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15315163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Rebekah B. Kcehowski, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kcehowski, Rebekah)
July 11, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #86 MOTION for Evan Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15305463. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION for Evan Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15305463. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Evan Miller, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Evan)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Claudia Wilson Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #82 Letter, filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/19/2018) (rro)
June 18, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Miller on behalf of Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Miller, Joel)
June 18, 2018 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Charles R. Jacob III dated June 18, 2018 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc..(Jacob, Charles)
June 18, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Richard Jacob, III on behalf of Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Jacob, Charles)
June 14, 2018 Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altisource Residential Corporation.(De Simone, Joseph)
June 14, 2018 Filing 79 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altisource Asset Management Corporation.(De Simone, Joseph)
June 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/13/2018. Responses due by 9/11/2018 Replies due by 10/11/2018. (rro)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #76 Letter Motion to Stay. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/12/2018) (rro)
June 11, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Patrick Herzinger on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Herzinger, Kenneth)
June 11, 2018 Filing 76 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay discovery, apply motion to dismiss briefing schedule to SWBC and Wells Fargo, and approve stipulation regarding coordination of Defendants motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard A. Jacobsen dated June 11, 2018. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
June 11, 2018 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Southwest Business Corporation.(Russo, Christopher)
June 6, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Russo on behalf of Southwest Business Corporation. (Russo, Christopher)
June 6, 2018 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc. for American Security Insurance Company; Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent American Security Insurance Company for Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company.(Diubaldo, Robert)
June 6, 2018 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc. served on 5/31/2018, answer due 6/21/2018. Service was accepted by A. Smith, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
June 6, 2018 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Altisource Online Auctions, Inc. served on 5/31/2018, answer due 6/21/2018. Service was accepted by A. Smith, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
June 6, 2018 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Altisource Solutions, Inc. served on 5/31/2018, answer due 6/21/2018. Service was accepted by A. Smith, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
June 5, 2018 Filing 69 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.; Corporate Parent Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
June 4, 2018 Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Sidman, Howard)
June 4, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Fredrick Sidman on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Sidman, Howard)
May 31, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for Claudia Wilson Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 30, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Claudia Wilson Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Wilson Frost in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
May 30, 2018 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
May 30, 2018 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Southwest Business Corporation served on 5/25/2018, answer due 6/15/2018. Service was accepted by Ed Kershner, General Counsel. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
May 30, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #63 MOTION for Claudia Wilson Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15131496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas (our court does not accept state bar certificates). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 63 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Claudia Wilson Frost to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15131496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Wilson Frost in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia) Modified on 5/30/2018 (jc).
May 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/11/2018 Replies due by 10/11/2018. (rro)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #56 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 7/13/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/29/2018) (rro)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Frank G. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
May 23, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Nill Kidera on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Kidera, Thomas)
May 23, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Michael Rubin on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Rubin, Aaron)
May 23, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Shofner, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #57 MOTION for Frank G. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 23, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Frank G. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Frank)
May 23, 2018 Filing 56 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the brieifing schedule for the Original Defendants' motions to dismiss addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard A. Jacobsen, Justin Brooks, Robert W. DiUbaldo, David J. Fioccola, and Joseph De Simone dated May 23, 2018. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
May 21, 2018 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (dnh)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Brian P. Perryman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion for W. Glenn Merten to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon)
May 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #52 MOTION for Frank G. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING MUST BE ISSUED BY THE SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA. http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/certificate-of-good-standing-contact-list Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma) Modified on 5/18/2018 (ma).
May 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Brian P. Perryman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #50 MOTION for W. Glenn Merten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088245. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 18, 2018 Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Frank G. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Frank) Modified on 5/18/2018 (ma).
May 18, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Brian P. Perryman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perryman, Brian)
May 18, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for W. Glenn Merten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15088245. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of W. Glenn Merten, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Merten, William)
May 18, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francesca G Cocuzza on behalf of Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Cocuzza, Francesca)
May 18, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert James Baehr on behalf of Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Baehr, Robert)
May 18, 2018 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re: #44 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara)
May 18, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Kaufman on behalf of Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Kaufman, Jessica)
May 18, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David John Fioccola on behalf of Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.. (Fioccola, David)
May 17, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Altisource Residential Corporation, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson, Brian Jordan, Donald G Schaper. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hart, Barbara)
May 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Barbara Hart to RE-FILE Document No. #43 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): SUMMONS CANNOT BE ISSUED OR REQUESTED UNTIL AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS BEEN ACCEPTED. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
May 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Barbara hart to RE-FILE Document No. #42 Amended Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;parties listed in the caption must be reflected within the docket event. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (laq)
May 11, 2018 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Altisource Solutions, Inc., REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Altisource Online Auctions, Inc., Southwest Business Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re: #42 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara)
May 11, 2018 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Altisource Residential Corporation, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson, Brian Jordan, Donald G Schaper. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hart, Barbara)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Ocwen Financial Corporation answer due 6/20/2018; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 6/20/2018; Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. answer due 6/13/2018) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2018) (rro)
May 9, 2018 Filing 40 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard A. Jacobsen dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc..(Jacobsen, Richard)
May 9, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Jacobsen, Richard)
May 7, 2018 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson, Brian Jordan, Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
May 7, 2018 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Altisource Asset Management Corporation waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
May 2, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Charles Kelly on behalf of Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. (Kelly, Kevin)
May 2, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph De Simone on behalf of Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Residential Corporation. (De Simone, Joseph)
April 23, 2018 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Altisource Residential Corporation served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. Service was accepted by Erin Richardson, Service Associate, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Company. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocwen Financial Corporation waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HomeSure Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc. waiver sent on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HomeSure of America, Inc. waiver sent on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/26/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Standard Guaranty Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/26/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Assurant, Inc. waiver sent on 3/26/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. American Security Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/26/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida waiver sent on 3/26/2018, answer due 5/25/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
April 6, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cross Country Homes Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. Document filed by Robert O'Toole; Ronald E. Powell; William R. Seehafer; Robert Wilson; Brian Jordan; Donald G Schaper. (Hart, Barbara)
March 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nora Anne Valenza-Frost on behalf of Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
March 26, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nora Anne Valenza-Frost on behalf of Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
March 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nora Anne Valenza-Frost on behalf of Assurant, Inc.. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
March 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nora Anne Valenza-Frost on behalf of American Security Insurance Company. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
March 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nora Anne Valenza-Frost on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Valenza-Frost, Nora)
March 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of Assurant, Inc.. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of American Security Insurance Company. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wagner Diubaldo on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Diubaldo, Robert)
March 20, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Altisource Residential Corporation, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Homes Services, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC; OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC.; ALTISOURCE PORTFOLIO SOLUTIONS, S.A.; ALTISOURCE RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION; ALTISOURCE ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; ASSURANT, INC.; STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY; VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA; CROSS COUNTRY HOMES SERVICES, INC.; HOMESURE OF AMERICA, INC.; HOMESURE SERVICES, INC.; and HOMESURE PROTECTION OF VIRGINIA, INC.,, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara)
March 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Barbara J. Hart to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'as to' includes a party name Cross County Home Services Inc., whom is not a party listed on CM/ECF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 15, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC; OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC.; ALTISOURCE PORTFOLIO SOLUTIONS, S.A.; ALTISOURCE RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION; ALTISOURCE ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; ASSURANT, INC.; STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY; VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA; CROSS COUNTRY HOMES SERVICES, INC.; HOMESURE OF AMERICA, INC.; HOMESURE SERVICES, INC.; and HOMESURE PROTECTION OF VIRGINIA, INC.,, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 3/16/2018 (jgo).
March 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Barbara J. Hart to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the caption entered on the Summons Request does not match the caption on the pleading; if all of the names do not fit in the space provided, you may entered the names of the first named plaintiff and defendant followed by "et al". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
March 14, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC; OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC.; ALTISOURCE PORTFOLIO SOLUTIONS, S.A.; ALTISOURCE RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION; ALTISOURCE ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; ASSURANT, INC.; STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY; VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA; CROSS COUNTRY HOMES SERVICES, INC.; HOMESURE OF AMERICA, INC.; HOMESURE SERVICES, INC.; and HOMESURE PROTECTION OF VIRGINIA, INC.,, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 3/15/2018 (pne).
March 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Silver Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Guttman, Buschner & Brooks PLLC, 4100 Powelton Avenue, Suite 570, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19104, (202) 800-3001. (Brooks, Justin)
March 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Silver Brooks on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Brooks, Justin)
March 6, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
March 6, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
March 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Barbara J. Hart to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; HomeSure of Virginia, Inc. is not a party listed on CM ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
March 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Barbara J. Hart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc)
March 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Barbara J. Hart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HomeSure of Virginia, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc)
March 5, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC; OCWEN MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC.; ALTISOURCE PORTFOLIO SOLUTIONS, S.A.; ALTISOURCE RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION; ALTISOURCE ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION; ASSURANT, INC.; STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY; VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY; AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA; CROSS COUNTRY HOMES SERVICES, INC.; HOMESURE OF AMERICA, INC.; HOMESURE SERVICES, INC.; and HOMESURE PROTECTION OF VIRGINIA, INC.,, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 3/6/2018 (pc).
March 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Harrison on behalf of Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson. (Harrison, David)
March 5, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brian Jordan, Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, Donald G Schaper, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson.(Hart, Barbara)
March 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hart, Barbara)
March 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altisource Asset Management Corporation, Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A., Altisource Residential Corporation, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Cross Country Home Holdings, Inc., HomeSure Services, Inc., HomeSure of America, Inc., HomeSure of Virginia, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14771651)Document filed by Robert O'Toole, Ronald E. Powell, William R. Seehafer, Robert Wilson, Brian Jordan, Donald G Schaper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hart, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Brian Patrick Perryman
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Represented By: Robert Wagner Diubaldo
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Villanueva
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Patrick Perryman
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Represented By: Robert Wagner Diubaldo
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Villanueva
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeSure Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: David John Fioccola
Represented By: Francesca G Cocuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Patrick Perryman
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Represented By: Robert Wagner Diubaldo
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Villanueva
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Nill Kidera
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Herzinger
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Perryman
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Represented By: Robert Wagner Diubaldo
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Villanueva
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Patrick Perryman
Represented By: William Glenn Merten
Represented By: Robert Wagner Diubaldo
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Villanueva
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Represented By: Nora Anne Valenza-Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Country Home Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeSure of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: David John Fioccola
Represented By: Francesca G Cocuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Nill Kidera
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Herzinger
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Residential Corporation
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Represented By: Kevin Charles Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Nill Kidera
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Herzinger
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Asset Management Corporation
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Represented By: Kevin Charles Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeSure of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Howard Fredrick Sidman
Represented By: Evan Miller
Represented By: Rebekah B. Kcehowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Country Homes Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: David John Fioccola
Represented By: Francesca G Cocuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Online Auctions, Inc.
Represented By: Isabel Polly Sukholitsky
Represented By: Joel M. Miller
Represented By: Charles Richard Jacob, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Business Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Isabel Polly Sukholitsky
Represented By: Joel M. Miller
Represented By: Charles Richard Jacob, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesure Protection of Virginia Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: David John Fioccola
Represented By: Francesca G Cocuzza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALHome Services and Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Isabel Polly Sukholitsky
Represented By: Joel M. Miller
Represented By: Charles Richard Jacob, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald G Schaper
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Seehafer
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wilson
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jordan
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Powell
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Toole
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: David Charles Harrison
Represented By: Scott Vincent Papp
Represented By: Aaron Lee Brody
Represented By: Elizabeth Hardeman Shofner
Represented By: R. Bradley Miller
Represented By: Justin Silver Brooks
Represented By: Michael Jason Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?