Wells Fargo Securities, LLC v. LJM Investment Fund, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Defendant: LJM Investment Fund, L.P. and LJM Partners, LTD
Case Number: 1:2018cv02020
Filed: March 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine B. Forrest
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/9/21) (yv)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held today, June 17, 2021, the Court orders as follows: 1. With respect to LJM's Request No. 18, Wells Fargo shall promptly ascertain whether it issued any termination notices on February 5, 2018 o r February 6, 2018 with respect to the VIX event to any clients other than LJM. Wells Fargo shall advise LJM of the answer to that question, and, if any such termination notices exist, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of any further, limited discovery that may be necessary; and 2. By July 1, 2021, LJM shall file a consent-motion for leave to amend their First Amended Answer and Counterclaims in order to withdraw their request for punitive damages. The Court will hold a status conference on Thursday, September 9, 2021 at 10:00 am on the Court's conference line. The Parties are directed to call: 866-390-1828; access code: 380- 9799, at the scheduled time. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/1/2021., Status Conference by telephone set for 9/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/17/2021) (vfr)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 73 AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct 69 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. filed by LJM Master Trading Fund, L.P., PFC-LJM Preservation and Growth Fund, L. P., LJM Investment Fund, L.P., LJM Offshore Fund, Ltd., LJM Partners, LTD. For the foregoing reasons, LJM's motion for leave to replead its amended counterclaim for breach of contract is granted. LJM must file its Amended Counterclaims, s ubstantially in the form annexed to its motion, within 14 days of the date hereof. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 73. SO ORDERED. LJM's Proposed First Amended Counterclaims "retains" its claims for brea ch of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, breach of fiduciary duty, and negligenceall of which were dismissed with prejudice in the September Opinion"so as not to waive any right to potential relief under Rule 54(c), and to pres erve LJM's right to appeal the dismissal of the claims." (docket entry no. 69 at ECF page 11.) WFS does not oppose LJM's continued inclusion of those dismissed claims in its pleading. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/30/2021) (kv)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: A discovery conference was held by telephone today, December 19, 2019. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant LJM's request for certain discovery is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/19/2019) (kv) Modified on 12/19/2019 (kv).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: re: 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 47 Memorandum & Opinion, Add and Terminate Parties, filed by LJM Master Trading Fund, L.P., LJM Investment Fund, L.P., LJM Offshore Fund, Ltd., LJM Partners, LTD. For the foreg oing reasons, LJM's motion for reconsideration is granted to the extent that it seeks vacatur of those portions of the September Opinion dismissing LJM's counterclaim for breach of contract. Specifically, the Court vacates the discussion se ction on pages 8-11 of the Opinion (docket entry no. 47). LJM's counterclaim for breach of contract remains dismissed for the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. LJM's counterclaims for breach of the implied covenant of goo d faith and fair dealing, breach offiduciary duty, and negligence remain dismissed for the reasons stated in the September Opinion. LJM may move for leave to replead its counterclaim for breach of contract by August 26, 2019. Any such motion must com ply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, and the Individual rules of practice of the undersigned, and must be accompanied by aproposed amended counterclaim, a blackline of that proposed counterclaim, and a memoran dum of law. If LJM does not file a timely motion for leave to amend, the dismissal of its counterclaims will be with prejudice. LJM's motion for reconsideration is denied in all other respects, and LJM's motion for entry of a partial final judgment or a stay is also denied. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 50. This action remains referred to Magistrate Judge Pitman for general pre-trial management. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 8/26/2019.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/05/2019) (ama)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss LJM'S Counterclaims filed by Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. For the reasons set forth above, LJM's counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 36. SO ORDERED. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/11/2018) (ne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC v. LJM Investment Fund, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Peter B. Baumhart
Represented By: Thomas Sam Kiriakos
Represented By: Howard James Roin
Represented By: Nina Naresh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJM Investment Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Jason Mark Koral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJM Partners, LTD
Represented By: Jason Mark Koral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?