Clark et al v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Turning Point for Women and Families, Arwa Aziz and Jamilla Clark
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Case Number: 1:2018cv02334
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 cc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2020. (ca)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the discovery schedule in and to provide the Court with a Joint Status Letter by 4/23/2020 addressing: 1) what discovery reasonably can be accomplished over the next 60 days and 2) whether any additional extensions of discovery are needed. The parties shall email the Court to NYSD_ParkerChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the status of their settlement discussions as to injunctive relief by 4/23/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONVERTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE : The Settlement Conference in this matter scheduled for Monday, March 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby converted to a telephonic conference. The Parties should call into the court conference line at (866) 434-5269 Code: 4858267. The Court will review procedures and then talk separately with each side by phone. The parties and their counsel must be available by phone from 2:00 p.m. to 5:00 p.m. so that the court can have more than one ex parte conversation with each side as needed. Each side shall establish its own conference call line to remain open during the settlement conference so that the court can join and re-join as needed. To ensure confidentiality, each side shall provide the court with the dial-in number and passcode for its conference line via an ex parte email to Parker_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks) Modified on 3/16/2020 (ks).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (111 in 1:18-cv-02334-AT-KHP) Letter, filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. APPLICATION GRANTED: The settlement conference in this matter currently scheduled for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. is rescheduled to Monday, March 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/11/2020) (ks) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ca). (Main Document 112 replaced on 3/11/2020) (ca).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated March 10, 2020 re: - REQUEST TO ADJOURN SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families..(Freeman, Emma)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Defendants' request for extension of time to respond to most recent settlement proposal extended 1 week. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiffs most recent proposal addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Bilal Haider dated March 5, 2020., CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Bilal Haider dated March 5, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Haider, Bilal)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A telephone conference in this matter will be held on Tuesday, March 10, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/21/2020) Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ks).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 2/21/2020. (ca)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A counsel only settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for Friday, February 21, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Updated pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than February 19, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/21/2020) Settlement Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2020. (ca)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The status conference in this matter currently scheduled for January 23, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. is hereby adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/22/2020) (ks)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A telephone conference in this matter will be held on Thursday, February 6, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/21/2020) (rro)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jonathan C. Moore and Tahanie A. Aboushi dated January 17, 2020 re: letter requesting a telephone conference. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED: The telephone conference call previously scheduled for Tuesday, January 21, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. is rescheduled to Tuesday, January 21, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/21/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.)(ks)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 1/21/2020. (ca)
January 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated January 19, 2020 re: RESPONSE TO ADJOURN JOINT COURT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A telephone conference in this matter will be held on January 21, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parkers Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/13/2020) Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 1/13/2020. (ca)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #100 Letter filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The case management conference scheduled for January 7, 2020 is ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/2/2020) (cf)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Emma L. Freeman dated January 2, 2020 re: REQUEST TO ADJOURN. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, A telephone conference in this matter will be held on Monday, January 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/17/19) (yv)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 12/16/2019. (ca)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #97 Letter, filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED: The Status Conference scheduled for Monday, December 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, January 23, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/4/2019) ( Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated December 3, 2019 re: REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNMENT. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Discovery and Settlement Conference in this matter is scheduled for Monday, December 16, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Parties must attend in-person with their counsel. Corporate parties must send the person with decision making authority to settle the matter to the conference. Updated ex-parte submissions must be received by the Court no later than Friday, December 13, 2019 by 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/19/2019) Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 11/19/2019. (ca)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated October 29, 2019 re: REQUEST COURT TO ADDRESS DISCOVERY SCHEDULING AT THE NEXT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #92 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery (Partial) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted: Discovery Stayed through date of Settlement Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/16/2019) (ks)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 UNSEALING ORDER granting #92 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the City of New York, including the Office of the Corporation Counsel and the New York City Police Department, shall not be bound by the statutory sealing requirements of N.Y.C.P.L. 160.50 and 160.55 for the limited purpose of allowing the City to search for and provide certain information to plaintiffs' counsel regarding those individuals who were arrested while wearing religious head coverings between March 1, 2014 and March 31, 2018, including but not limited to the number of such arrestees who were arrested wearing head coverings during the above timeframe; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the City of New York shall produce non-party information subject to N.Y.C.P.L. 160.50 and 160.55 to plaintiffs; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the use of the above-referenced records is restricted to use in the above-entitled civil rights action and shall be protected by plaintiffs' counsel as "Attorneys' Eyes Only," such that plaintiffs' counsel may not disclose the non-party information contained in the arrest data to anyone other than employees of their firms, relevant deponents (and any court reporter/ videographer at the deposition), and the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/16/2019) (ks)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery (Partial) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haider, Bilal)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Computer Vision Discovery. Plaintiffs' request that the Court compel the City to utilize computer vision technology to identify members of the putative class is denied without prejudice to renew. Settlement Conference. A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for November 19, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Parties must attend in-person with their counsel. Corporate parties must send the person with decision making authority to settle the matter to the conference. The parties are instructed to complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with the Judge Parker' s Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than November 12, 2019 by 5:00 p.m. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/02/2019) (ama)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Status Conference held on 10/2/2019 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Kay Depoian on behalf of City of New York. (Depoian, Carolyn)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: In light of Judge Parker's order extending the fact discovery deadline to November 26, 2019, ECF No. 85, the case management conference scheduled for October 2, 2019 is ADJOURNED to January 7, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. (Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/26/2019) (cf)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #86 Letter filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. MEMO ENDORSEMENT: As a reminder to the parties, this action has been referred to the undersigned for pre-trial supervision, including discovery matters. A status conference to discuss the above issue will be held on October 2, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/12/2019) ( Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Emma L. Freeman dated September 10, 2019 re: REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #84 Letter filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: This action has been assigned to the undersigned for general pre-trial. (Doc. No. 66.) Fact discovery is hereby extended to November 26, 2019, expert discovery is extended to January 14, 2020, and dispositive motions are due by December 10, 2019. So long as the parties agree, interim deadlines may be changed without leave of Court. A status conference is hereby scheduled for December 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/14/2019) ( Deposition due by 12/10/2019., Expert Discovery due by 1/14/2020., Fact Discovery due by 11/26/2019., Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.)(ks)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Emma L. Freeman dated August 13,2019 re: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Samantha R. Millar dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Millar, Samantha)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying as moot #57 Letter Motion for Discovery; denying as moot #26 Letter Motion to Stay. The Court has already entered a Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order for this case, ECF No. 78, and shall not stay discovery pending a decision on any motions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (Pasculli, Victoria)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma Freeman dated May 23, 2019 re: LETTER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND DISCOVERY UPDATE. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #77 Letter, filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request for oral argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2019) (cf)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All Parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than September 13, 2019. Depositions to be completed by August 30, 2019. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than October 31, 2019. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 7 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for 10/2/19 at 11:20 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 8/30/2019. Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2019) (cf)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Emma Freeman dated May 16, 2019 re: JOINT LETTER REGARDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN COMPLETED BY PARTIES)(Freeman, Emma)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #75 Letter adjourning conference, filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby adjourns the conference scheduled May 7, 2019 until Monday, July 8, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint letter, updating the Court as to the status of discovery and settlement no later than May 23, 2019. So Ordered., (Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/29/19) (yv)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated April 25, 2019 re: REQUEST FOR ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE ON MAY 7, 2019. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #73 Letter filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: Having reviewed the parties' joint letter, it is hereby ORDERED that by May 16, 2019, the parties shall filea joint status report regarding settlement. If the parties have not reached a settlement in principle by that time, the Court will direct the patties to submit a proposed case management plan in accordance with its Individual Practices in Civil Cases. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/15/2019) (cf)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Emma L. Freeman dated April 15, 2019 re: Letter Regarding Case Status. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by April 16, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court of the history, posture, and status of the case. The letter shall explain the status of all outstanding motions and shall explain any motions the parties currently foresee filing in the future. The letter shall contain citations to the docket and shall not exceed five single-spaced pages in length. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/9/2019) (ks)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Robert W. Sweet is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated April 4, 2019 re: Letter Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: The parties are requested to confer regarding consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. To the extent the parties agree to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), they should complete a Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/28/2019) (jwh)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #68 Letter Request for Adjournment of Oral Argument, filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED: The Oral Argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss - presently scheduled for April 3, 2019 (ECF #64) will now be addressed at the Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, May 7, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. in courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/1/19) (yv)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emma L. Freeman dated April 1, 2019 re: Joint Request for Adjournment of Oral Argument. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, A case management conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for May 7, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/28/19) (yv)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DIRECTION TO THE BAR AND INTERIM ORDER OF REFERENCE: The Hon. Robert W. Sweet of this court having died on March 24, 2019; and Time being needed in order to effect the reassignment of the cases on his docket: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, pending the reassignment of Judge Sweet's civil cases, all urgent matters should be taken either to the Magistrate Judge who is assigned to the case or to the District Judge sitting in Part I. In cases in which Judge Sweet did not sign an order of reference, this order operates as an interim order of reference to the Magistrate Judge for interim pre-trial supervision. Routine case management requests (such as, for extension of time) should be directed to the Magistrate Judge, not to the Part I Judge. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/27/2019) (cf)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Albert Fox Cahn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Surveillance Technology Oversight Project, 40 Rector Street, 9th Floor, New York, NY, US 10006, 646-665-7599 ext. 503. (Cahn, Albert)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (ks)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #62 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Oral Argument scheduled for 2/27/19 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Bilal Haider. filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Motion adjourned to April 3, 2019. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/25/2019) (ks)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/21/2019) (ks)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Oral Argument scheduled for 2/27/19 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Bilal Haider. Document filed by City of New York.(Haider, Bilal)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Letter Motion for Discovery. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/30/2019) (js)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. (js)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Albert Fox Cahn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Surveillance Technology Oversight Project, 80 Dekalb Avenue, #15C, Brooklyn, NY, USA 11201, 571-766-6273. (Cahn, Albert)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery Proposed Discovery Plan addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma L. Freeman dated January 29, 2019. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Bilal Haider dated January 10, 2019 re: #57 LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Proceed addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma Freeman dated January 7, 2019. . Document filed by City of New York. (Haider, Bilal)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Proceed addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma Freeman dated January 7, 2019. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/12/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma L. Freeman dated December 11, 2018 re: #54 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Oral Argument on December 12, 2018 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Rachel Seligman Weiss dated December 11, 2018. . Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Oral Argument on December 12, 2018 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Rachel Seligman Weiss dated December 11, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Seligman, Rachel)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Rena Millar on behalf of City of New York. (Millar, Samantha)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION OF SUZANNA PUBLICKER METTHAM TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY granting #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Suzanna Publicker Mettham terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/29/2018) (jca)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/28/2018) (js)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Suzanna Publicker Mettham in Support re: #49 MOTION for Suzanna Publicker Mettham to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mettham, Suzanna)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Suzanna Publicker Mettham to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Oral argument on November 28, 2018 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Rachel Seligman Weiss dated November 27, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Seligman, Rachel)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #46 Status Report filed by Arwa Aziz, Turning Point for Women and Families, Jamilla Clark. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Oral Argument set for 11/28/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/26/2018) (js)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STATUS REPORT. Regarding Request for Leave to File Opposition to Supplemental Standing Points Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #44 Status Report filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: the motion will be heard on October 31 at noon or on each of the Wednesday agreed upon by counsel. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/16/2018) (js)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS REPORT. Regarding Settlement and Request for Leave to File Additional Motion Points Document filed by City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/14/2018) (jwh)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion to Stay. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/7/2018) (anc)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Stayed. (anc)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated September 7, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 UNSEALING ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion for Discovery. NOW, THEREFORE, WITH THE AGREEMENT OF ALL PARTIES, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the statutory sealing requirements of New York Criminal Procedure Law 160.50, 160.55, 160.58, 720.15, and/or 720.35 shall be held not to apply for the limited purpose of allowing the New York City Police Department to be permitted to search for and provide arrest records regarding all individuals who were (1) arrested by or in the custody of the NYPD; (2) required to take a post-arrest Booking Photograph while in any NYPD facility; and (3) required to remove any religious head covering for that Booking Photograph to Corporation Counsel of the City of New York for use in the above-captioned case only; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE NEW YORK CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT shall provide to the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York the following information, if retained by the New York City Police Department: their most recent addresses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ZACHARY W. CARTER, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, or his authorized representative, may transmit any records or identifying information pertaining to members of the putative Settlement Class contained in the sealed records (including their first and last names, dates of birth, arrest numbers, NYSID numbers, and most recent addresses) to class counsel in the above-captioned case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the use of the sealed records is restricted to use in the above-captioned action for the limited purpose defined above and in accordance with a Stipulation and Order of Confidentiality to be filed before the records and information discussed herein are transmitted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/4/2018) (ne) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery and Proposed Unsealing Order addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma Freeman dated August 30, 2018. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Unsealing Order)(Freeman, Emma)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #38 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/15/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/15/2018 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City of New York. (Mettham, Suzanna)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION of Suzanna Publicker Mettham in Support re: #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Clark Certificate of Disposition, #2 Exhibit E - Aziz Certificate of Disposition)(Mettham, Suzanna)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bilal Husain Haider on behalf of City of New York. (Haider, Bilal)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Conference. So ordered. Initial Conference set for 8/15/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/23/2018) (cf)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma L. Freeman dated July 23, 2018 re: #26 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated July 16, 2018. . Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #27 Order,,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Requesting Initial Conference to be Adjourned to August 15, 2018 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Emma Freeman dated July 20, 2018. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families.(Freeman, Emma)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER: Defendant's motion to stay discovery, dated July 16, 2018, shall be heard concurrently with its motion to dismiss, at 12:00PM on Wednesday, August 15, 2018, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. IT IS SO ORDERED., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)., #26 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated July 16, 2018. :( Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/18/2018) (ama) Modified on 7/18/2018 (ama).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated July 16, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that: 1. Plaintiffs' time to file papers in opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be extended to July 27, 2018. 2. Defendant's time to file reply papers in further support of the motion to dismiss shall be extended to August l0, 2018. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/18/2018) (ne) Modified on 8/30/2018 (ne).
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/27/2018 Replies due by 8/10/2018. (ne)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, dated June 14, 2018, shall be heard at 12:00PM on Wednesday, August 15, 2018, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6): (Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/15/2018) (tro)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, dated June 14, 2018, shall be heard at 12:00PM on Wednesday, August 8, 2018, in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Oral Argument set for 8/8/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/14/2018) (rjm)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City of New York. (Mettham, Suzanna)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Suzanna Publicker Mettham in Support re: #20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Aziz Notice of Claim, #3 Exhibit C - Turning Point Website)(Mettham, Suzanna)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Document filed by City of New York. Responses due by 6/27/2018 Return Date set for 8/7/2018 at 12:00 PM.(Mettham, Suzanna)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Given the apparent significance of the complaint, the thirty day extension of time to answer or move is granted. No further extensions will be granted without good cause having been shown. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/8/2018) (ap)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Attorney James Monroe Dervin terminated.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/8/2018) (anc)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Albert Fox Cahn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: CAIR-NY, 46-01 20th Avenue, Queens, New York, United States 11105, 646-665-7599. (Cahn, Albert)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/7/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/7/2018) (js)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 14 Pretrial Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (js)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: James Monroe Dervin, New Attorney: Suzanna Publicker Mettham, Address: NYC Law Department, 100 Church Street, Rm. 3-212, New York, NY, United States 10007, 2123562356. Document filed by City of New York. (Mettham, Suzanna)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from O. Andrew F. Wilson dated May 7, 2018 re: #12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated May 4, 2018. . Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Wilson, Ogilvie)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated May 4, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/10/2018) cc: Albert F. Cahn, Esq. Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP (js)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York answer due 5/9/2018. (js)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from James M. Dervin dated April 9, 2018. Document filed by City of New York.(Dervin, James)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Monroe Dervin on behalf of City of New York. (Dervin, James)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. Service was accepted by Betty Mazcyk, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Jamilla Clark; Turning Point for Women and Families; Arwa Aziz. (Wilson, Ogilvie)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wilson, Ogilvie)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin Code 2a must only be selected when Origin Code 2 is selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Robert W. Sweet. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Fox Cahn on behalf of Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Cahn, Albert)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emma Lerner Freeman on behalf of Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Freeman, Emma)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arwa Aziz, Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families. (Wilson, Ogilvie)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wilson, Ogilvie) Modified on 3/19/2018 (jgo).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14819179)Document filed by Jamilla Clark, Turning Point for Women and Families, Arwa Aziz.(Wilson, Ogilvie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turning Point for Women and Families
Represented By: Emma Lerner Freeman
Represented By: Albert Fox Cahn
Represented By: Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arwa Aziz
Represented By: Emma Lerner Freeman
Represented By: Albert Fox Cahn
Represented By: Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamilla Clark
Represented By: Emma Lerner Freeman
Represented By: Albert Fox Cahn
Represented By: Ogilvie Andrew Fraser Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: James Monroe Dervin
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Represented By: Suzanna Publicker Mettham
Represented By: Rachel Amy Seligman
Represented By: Carolyn Kay Depoian
Represented By: Samantha Rena Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?