Schirripa v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Schirripa
Defendant: Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. and The J.M. Smucker Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02345
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 4:18-cv-02662, filed on 05/07/2018. (sjo)
May 4, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE: NOW, THEREFORE, in consideration of the foregoing, the Parties agree and hereby stipulate to: Transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division, and request that this action be transferred accordingly. All pretrial deadlines shall be stayed pending the Transfer of this action. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/4/2018) (jwh)
May 4, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California (jwh)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The stipulation transferring the action to the NDCA shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 4, 2018. All conferences are canceled. All deadlines are adjourned sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 30, 2018 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: May 3, 2018 pre-motion conference, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 30, 2018., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 30, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on May 3, 2018 at 12:00 pm. Plaintiff is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm Thursday, April 26, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 18, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Conference , re: request for pre-motion conference in anticipation of motion to transfer action to the Northern District of California, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 18, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald)
April 11, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald)
April 11, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The J.M. Smucker Company for Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc..(Rothstein, Ronald)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. answer due 5/16/2018; The J.M. Smucker Company answer due 5/16/2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
April 8, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 8, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald)
March 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Thomas Foglia on behalf of The J.M. Smucker Company. (Foglia, Andrew)
March 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Y. Rothstein on behalf of The J.M. Smucker Company. (Rothstein, Ronald)
March 29, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14871296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14871296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The J.M. Smucker Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
March 19, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The J.M. Smucker Company. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Brian Maslo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Dutchess; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
March 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore Charles Badala on behalf of Rosemarie Schirripa. (Badala, Salvatore)
March 16, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The J.M. Smucker Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa. (Maslo, Paul)
March 16, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa. (Maslo, Paul)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Maslo, Paul)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14820411)Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchases of dog food)(Maslo, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schirripa v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Schirripa
Represented By: Paul Brian Maslo
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.M. Smucker Company
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Foglia
Represented By: Jeanifer Parsigian
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?