Myeress v. Buzzfeed, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02365
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Buzzfeed, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joe Myeress. Related document: 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Dunne, Joseph)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. Buzzfeed, Inc. answer due 5/9/2018. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/10/2018) (ap)
April 7, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Eleanor M. Lackman dated April 7, 2018. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
April 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eleanor Martine Lackman on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor)
March 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc. (pne)
March 19, 2018 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
March 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
March 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
March 16, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buzzfeed, Inc., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Myeress. (Dunne, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14821775)Document filed by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Represented By: Eleanor Martine Lackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?