Wesco Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products Inc.
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc. and Electrolux North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02476
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ona T. Wang
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, that counsel shall conduct work remotely. This includes, but is not limited to, client meetings, work meetings, and hand deliveries of courtesy copies to the Court (courtesy copies can be sent via email or mail). It i s further ORDERED, that no in-person depositions shall take place on or before April 30, 2020, absent a showing of exceptionally good cause. For depositions planned on or after May 1, 2020, parties shall submit a joint status letter with depositio n plan(s) fourteen (14) days before the planned deposition(s). It is further ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4), that all unexpired discovery deadlines are hereby EXTENDED for a period of 60 days. Counsel shall file a joint proposed ord er with the new discovery deadlines within seven (7) days of this Order. Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from seeking to further modify the pretrial schedule in light of the COVID-19 pandemic (or for any other good cause). Before seekin g such relief, the parties must, as always, meet and confer (via remote means) in a good faith effort to reach agreement on how best to fulfill the goals of Rule 1 while avoiding unnecessary health risks. It is further ORDERED that if counsel has any private, personal, familial or medical concerns that they need to share with the Court that would necessitate further orders, counsel may email Wang_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov ex parte provided that they advise the other parties that they will be contacting the Court ex parte. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 4/30/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/18/2020) (jca)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The Court held a Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call on January 28, 2020. All expert discovery shall be completed by April 27, 2020. The parties shall meet and confer and by April 27, 2020, file a joint status letter including w hether the parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction for all purposes and whether a settlement conference with the Court would be helpful at that time. ( Expert Discovery due by 4/27/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/28/2020) (mro)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: On December 23, 2019, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint status letter by January 21, 2020, which shall include the parties' proposed new expert discovery deadline. (ECF 40). To date, no status letter has been filed. Accordingly, the parties shall file the joint status letter by close of business, Friday, January 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/23/2020) (rro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc.
Represented By: George Stephen Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux North America, Inc.
Represented By: George Stephen Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?