National Fair Housing Alliance et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

The National Fair Housing Alliance filed a lawsuit against Facebook for allegedly allowing landlords and real estate brokers to discriminate against families with children, women and others in housing advertisement on the social networking platform. According to the complaint, the way Facebook allows housing advertisers to target (and avoid) certain groups of users is tantamount to facilitating illegal housing discrimination. Among the groups allegedly affected are women, disabled veterans, and single mothers.

Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc. and Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02689
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2018 45 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 44 Motion for Morgan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/8/2018) (jwh)
August 7, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 44 SECOND MOTION for Morgan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 7, 2018 44 SECOND MOTION for Morgan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit LA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Morgan Williams in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Williams, Morgan)
July 30, 2018 43 DECLARATION of Michael Duffey in Support re: 39 MOTION to Transfer Case , or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ring, Rose)
July 30, 2018 42 DECLARATION of Rosemarie T. Ring in Support re: 39 MOTION to Transfer Case , or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ring, Rose)
July 30, 2018 41 BRIEF re: 39 MOTION to Transfer Case , or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
July 30, 2018 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 39 MOTION to Transfer Case , or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Ring, Rose)
July 30, 2018 39 MOTION to Transfer Case , or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
July 2, 2018 38 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Letter Proposing Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss, filed by National Fair Housing Alliance, Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered., (Motions due by 7/30/2018., Responses due by 8/24/2018, Replies due by 9/14/2018.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/2/18) (yv)
July 2, 2018 37 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Transfer Case. As stated at the conference held today, the defendant's motion to dismiss and/or transfer is denied without prejudice because it is moot. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at docket number 27. The parties should provide a new briefing schedule for any new motion against the plaintiffs' amended complaint by July 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/29/18) (yv)
June 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument held on 6/29/2018 re: 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Facebook, Inc. Status Conference held. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 29, 2018 36 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David B. Berman dated June 29, 2018 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., National Fair Housing Alliance.(Berman, David)
June 28, 2018 35 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
June 27, 2018 34 Featured Case ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a conference in this matter on June 29, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/29/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/26/2018) (rro)
June 25, 2018 33 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Facebook, Inc..Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance, Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc.. Related document: 1 Complaint,.(Berman, David)
June 20, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 32 MOTION for Morgan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15225362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Louisiana;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 20, 2018 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Morgan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15225362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Morgan Williams in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Williams, Morgan) Modified on 6/20/2018 (wb).
June 4, 2018 31 DECLARATION of Michael Duffey in Support re: 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ring, Rose)
June 4, 2018 30 DECLARATION of Rosemarie T. Ring in Support re: 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ring, Rose)
June 4, 2018 29 BRIEF re: 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
June 4, 2018 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. . Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Ring, Rose)
June 4, 2018 27 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
May 29, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rosemarie Ring dated 05-25-2018. Document filed by Facebook, Inc. The Court reluctantly grants the application even though it is difficult to understand why the stated arguments could not be made within the original limits. Length detracts from persuasiveness. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/29/2018) (rjm)
May 25, 2018 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rosemarie Ring dated 05-25-2018. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
May 8, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER: As stated at the conference held today, the defendant shall file any motion to transfer and/or any motion to dismiss by June 4, 2018. No pre-motion conference is necessary. The plaintiffs shall respond by July 11, 2018. The defendant shall reply by August 3, 2018. Discovery is stayed until such motions are resolved because the defendant has made a sufficient showing that the proposed motions may be dispositive of the case proceeding in this Court. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 6/4/2018. Responses due by 7/11/2018. Replies due by 8/3/2018.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/7/2018) (mml)
May 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/7/2018. (Fletcher, Donnie)
May 7, 2018 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
May 4, 2018 22 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Ring, Rose)
May 1, 2018 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/3/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance; Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio; Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc.; Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc.. (Berman, David)
April 17, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 19 Motion for ROSEMARIE T. RING to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2018) (mml)
April 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Rosemarie T. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14933432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 12, 2018 19 MOTION for Rosemarie T. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14933432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Rose Ring ISO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ring, Rose)
April 12, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 14 Motion for JOSHUA PATASHNIK to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/12/2018) (mml)
April 12, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 15 Motion for JONATHAN H. BLAVIN to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/12/2018) (mml)
April 12, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 13 Motion for ELIZABETH A. KIM to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/11/2018) (mml)
April 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 15 MOTION for Jonathan H. Blavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 14 MOTION for Joshua Patashnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 11, 2018 15 MOTION for Jonathan H. Blavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Blavin, Jonathan)
April 11, 2018 14 MOTION for Joshua Patashnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930584. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit of Joshua Patashnik, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Patashnik, Joshua)
April 10, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 13 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14923949. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 10, 2018 13 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14923949. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2018 12 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/7/2018 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl, and as further set forth in this order. (ap)
March 29, 2018 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Facebook, Inc.. (jgo)
March 28, 2018 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Facebook, Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., National Fair Housing Alliance. (Houk, Diane)
March 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Diane Lee Houk to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the second party name in the 'To' field must include care of (C/O). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
March 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
March 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
March 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Diane Lee Houk. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
March 27, 2018 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Benjamin Berman on behalf of Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., National Fair Housing Alliance. (Berman, David)
March 27, 2018 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine R. Rosenfeld on behalf of Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., National Fair Housing Alliance. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
March 27, 2018 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Facebook, Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc., Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., National Fair Housing Alliance. (Houk, Diane) Modified on 3/28/2018 (pne).
March 27, 2018 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio.(Houk, Diane)
March 27, 2018 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc..(Houk, Diane)
March 27, 2018 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc..(Houk, Diane)
March 27, 2018 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance.(Houk, Diane)
March 27, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Houk, Diane)
March 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14859428)Document filed by National Fair Housing Alliance, Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc., Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc..(Houk, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fair Housing Alliance et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance
Represented By: David Benjamin Berman
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Justice Center, Inc.
Represented By: David Benjamin Berman
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Project For Excellence, Inc.
Represented By: David Benjamin Berman
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio
Represented By: David Benjamin Berman
Represented By: Diane Lee Houk
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Blavin
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kim
Represented By: Joshua Patashnik
Represented By: Rose Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?