Qanouni et al v. D & H Ladies Apparel LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rabia Qanouni, Marcos Fiallos, Ana Maria Valencia, Arnold Doble, Silius Bazard and Juan Elias Santiago Paez
Defendant: D & H Ladies Apparel LLC, AB & Sons Group, LLC, IAJ Apparel LLC, 396 B'Way Realty Corp., Salva Realty Corp., Isaac Chetrit and Isak Perez
Case Number: 1:2018cv02763
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. The parties are directed to submit a joint update by December 5, 2022. The Clerk of Court directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 127. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 11/18/2022) (va)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 125 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 11/2/2022) (rro)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: granting 123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. The deadline for submission of the motion for settlement approval is Friday, November 4, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 123. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 9/20/2022) (ama)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: On April 27, 2022, this case was reassigned to me for general pretrial supervision and to report and recommend on any dispositive motions. The parties are ordered to file a joint letter no later than May 4, 2022, providing the Court an u pdate on the status of the case, including a brief statement of claims and defenses, the current pre-trial schedule, the status of discovery and whether the parties have had settlement talks or wish to schedule a settlement conference at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 4/27/2022) (vfr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qanouni et al v. D & H Ladies Apparel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabia Qanouni
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Fiallos
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Valencia
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Doble
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silius Bazard
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Represented By: Jon Louis Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Elias Santiago Paez
Represented By: Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & H Ladies Apparel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB & Sons Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAJ Apparel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 396 B'Way Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salva Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Chetrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isak Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?