IN RE MEXICAN GOVERNMENT BONDS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System and Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Banco Santander S.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, HSBC Holdings PLC, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Barclays PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Bank Of America Corporation, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, CitiGroup Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, BBVA Securities, Inc., Bank of America N.A., BARCLAYS BANK PLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., ING Financial Markets LLC, John Does 1-10, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Ing Groep N.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., Credit Suisse AG, J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., ING Bank, N.V. and UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero
Consolidated Plaintiff: Boston Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan and Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv02830
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #222 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, #284 Order,,, #278 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #285 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,,,,,, #158 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26683838. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #288 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #288 Notice of Appeal, filed by Boston Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(tp)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: The letter motion at Docket Number 286 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Jeffrey B. Gittleman from this action. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/6/2022) (ate)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #286 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: THE MOTION IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN TERMINATED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (aa)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION for Jeffrey B. Gittleman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands..(Gittleman, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #284 Order in favor of BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Capital Plc, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., John Does 1-10, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc. against Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated August 17, 2022, the letter request at Docket Number 280 is granted. Final judgment is entered in this case pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. When a court "has dismissed all of the served defendants, and only unserved defendants 'remain,' there is no reason to preclude the immediate and automatic entry of a final judgment, as there is no basis for believing that there will be any further adjudications in the action." Cotton v. McCarthy, 383 F. App'x 26, 27 (2d Cir. 2010) (citing Leonhard v. United States, 633 F.2d 599, 608 (2d Cir. 1980)). That is the case here; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/17/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER: The letter request at Docket Number 280 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in this case pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. When a court "has dismissed all of the served defendants, and only unserved defendants 'remain,' there is no reason to preclude the immediate and automatic entry of a final judgment, as there is no basis for believing that there will be any further adjudications in the action." Cotton v. McCarthy, 383 F. App'x 26, 27 (2d Cir. 2010) (citing Leonhard v. United States, 633 F.2d 599, 608 (2d Cir. 1980)). That is the case here. The Clerk shall close this case. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/17/2022) (ate) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #282 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The letter motion at Docket Number 282 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Adam G. Mehes, Esq., from this action. Attorney Adam Gabor Mehes terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/17/2022) (ate)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for Adam G. Mehes, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer..(Mishkin, Paul)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam S. Hakki dated June 15, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' letter to the Court dated June 13, 2022 (ECF No. 280). Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America..(Hakki, Adam)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated June 13, 2022 re: Request for Entry of Final Judgment. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Todd Seaver on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. New Address: Berman Tabacco, 425 California Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA, United States 94104, 4154333200..(Seaver, Todd)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 OPINION AND ORDER re: #228 MOTION for Reconsideration Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(B). filed by Boston Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 228. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/30/2022) (ate)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER: The Court ordered these cases consolidated under case number 18-CV-2830. (See Dkt. No. 49.) All filings in the member cases shall be in the lead case. Despite such consolidation, the consolidated cases "retain their separate identities." Hall v. Hall, 138 S. Ct. 1118, 1128-31 (2018). For administrative purposes, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the other five actions listed above. This order does not affect the rights of the parties in any of the consolidated cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/29/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (tg)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #234 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw as counsel at Docket Number 234 is granted. The Clerk ofCourt is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 234. So Ordered. Attorney Leonardo Villalobos terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/24/2022) (js)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #158 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., JP MORGAN BROKER-DEALER HOLDINGS INC., J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BANCO J.P. MORGAN, S.A. INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTIPLE, J.P. MORGAN GRUPO FINANCIERO, AND J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: This Final Judgment hereby incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with the Settling Defendants entered into on March 27, 2020 (the "Settlement Agreement"), and all terms used herein, except as otherwise expressly defined herein, shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement. The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1331 to enter this Final Judgment and that it has personal jurisdiction over the Plaintiffs, the Settling Defendants (in this Action only and for purposes of this Settlement only), and all members of the Settlement Class. This Action, including each claim in this Action, is hereby dismissed with prejudice on the merits as to the Settling Defendants and without fees or costs. Upon the Settlement Agreement becoming final in accordance with its terms, all of the following claims shall be released. Specifically: as further set forth in this order. The Court, finding no just reason for delay, directs pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that the judgment of dismissal as to the Settling Defendants shall be final and entered forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/29/2021) (js) Modified on 10/29/2021 (js).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MEXICO, S.A., GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MEXICO, AND GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MEXICO, S.A. DE C.V. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: This Final Judgment hereby incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with the Settling Defendants entered into on March 27, 2020 (the "Settlement Agreement"), and all terms used herein, except as otherwise expressly defined herein, shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement. The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1331 to enter this Final Judgment and that it has personal jurisdiction over the Plaintiffs, the Settling Defendants (in this Action only and for purposes of this Settlement only), and all members of the Settlement Class. This Action, including each claim in this Action, is hereby dismissed with prejudice on the merits as to the Settling Defendants and without fees or costs. Upon the Settlement Agreement becoming final in accordance with its terms, all of the following claims shall be released. Specifically: as further set forth in this Order. The Court, finding no just reason for delay, directs pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that the judgment of dismissal as to the Settling Defendants shall be final and entered forthwith. So Ordered (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/29/2021) (js) Modified on 10/29/2021 (js).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER AWARDING REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: This Court has personal jurisdiction over all Parties and all Class Members, as well as subject matter jurisdiction over the Action to approve the Settlement Agreements and all exhibits attached thereto. Notice of the Fee and Expense Application was provided to potential Class Members in a reasonable manner, such notice complies with Rule 23(h)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and due process requirements. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel is hereby awarded $328,126.23 in payment of Litigation Expenses, plus interest at the same rate as earned by the Settlement Fund, which shall be paid out of the Settlement Fund. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/28/2021) (ama)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER OF SETTLEMENT WITH JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., JP MORGAN BROKER-DEALER HOLDINGS INC., J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BANCO J.P. MORGAN, S.A. INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTIPLE, J.P. MORGAN GRUPO FINANCIERO, AND J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: This Final Approval Order hereby incorporates by reference the definitions in the Settlement Agreement and all terms used herein, except as otherwise expressly defined herein, shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/28/2021) (ama)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on FINAL APPROVAL ORDER OF SETTLEMENT WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MEXICO, S.A., INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTULTIPLE, GRUPO BARCLAYS MEXICO, AND GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MEXICO, S.A. DE C.V.: granting #245 Motion for Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/28/2021) (ama)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES: granting #246 Motion for Attorney Fees. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/28/2021) (ama)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Fairness Hearing held on 10/28/2021. Fairness Hearing held. No objections. Settlement approved. Order to follow. (See transcript) (bh)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated September 30, 2021 re: Requests for Exclusion. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Straub, #2 Declaration of Jason Rabe).(Briganti, Vincent)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sitso W. Bediako on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System..(Bediako, Sitso)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #265 Proposed Order, #261 Proposed Order, #266 Proposed Order, #262 Proposed Order,, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #264 Proposed Judgment, #263 Proposed Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #246 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #246 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #245 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #245 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Gittleman in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 DECLARATION of John D. Radice in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 DECLARATION of Regina Calcaterra in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 DECLARATION of Lesley E. Weaver in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 DECLARATION of Scott Martin in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 DECLARATION of Daryl F. Scott in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 DECLARATION of Todd A. Seaver in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 DECLARATION of Vincent Briganti in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 DECLARATION of Jason Rabe in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES., #245 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIP. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 DECLARATION of Steven Straub in Support re: #245 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIP, #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H).(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 DECLARATION of Vincent Briganti in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES., #245 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIP. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES. . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #245 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIP . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION for Attorney Fees LEAD COUNSELS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND PAYMENT OF EXPENSES. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MXICO, AND GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MXICO, S.A. DE C.V. AND WITH JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., J.P. MORGAN BROKER-DEALER HOLDINGS INC., J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BANCO J.P. MORGAN, S.A. INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, J.P. MORGAN GRUPO FINANCIERO, AND J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated August 9, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' Letter Submitting In re SSA Bonds Antitrust Litigation as Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam S. Hakki dated August 5, 2021 re: Supplemental Authority Supporting Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Hakki, Adam)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1715 BY BARCLAYS DEFENDANTS. Document filed by Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V...(Scott, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1715. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association..(Liu, Henry)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: granting #237 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So ordered. The fairness hearing is adjourned to October 28, 2021, at 4:30 p.m. Fairness Hearing set for 10/28/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/26/2021) (ama)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER ADJOURNING FAIRNESS HEARING: NOW, THEREFORE, the Court having read and considered the submission, upon all prior proceedings in this action, and after all due consideration; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Fairness Hearing scheduled for September 13, 2021 is adjourned to October 28, 2021, at 4:30 p.m. The Court's Preliminary Approval Orders otherwise remain in force, and any deadlines based in reference to the Fairness Hearing date shall be adjusted accordingly based on the new hearing date. The Settlement Administrator shall update the Settlement website with the new applicable deadlines and advise any potential Class Members receiving Class Notice after this date of the new deadlines. IT IS SO ORDERED., ( Fairness Hearing set for 10/28/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/26/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (ama)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/9/2021. (ama)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #237 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Fairness Hearing and related deadlines to allow direct notice to be provided to recently identified potential Class Members addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated 7/23/2021. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #238 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION for Reconsideration Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(B). . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #228 MOTION for Reconsideration Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(B). . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Bershteyn, Boris)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION for Leonardo Villalobos to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Villalobos, Leonardo)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting (232) Letter Motion for Extension of Time: GRANTED. MOVING DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON OR BEFORE JUNE 10, 2021, AND PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE ANY REPLY THERETO BY JUNE 24, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(kye)(Text Only Order)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Plaintiffs and Moving Defendants dated May 28, 2021. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order).(Bershteyn, Boris)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #230 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., ING Bank, N.V. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/26/2021) (vfr)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V...(O'Loughlin, Robert)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION for Reconsideration Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(B). . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION for Reconsideration Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(B). Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association..(Liu, Henry)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays US Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc...(Scott, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #224 Order, Set Hearings. (sjo)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MXICO, AND GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MXICO, S.A. DE C.V., SCHEDULING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL THEREOF, AND APPROVING THE FORM AND PROGRAM OF NOTICE TO THE CLASS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Except for the terms expressly defined herein, the Court adopts and incorporates the definitions in the Settlement Agreement for the purposes of this Order. The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction to preliminarily approve the Settlement Agreement, including all exhibits thereto, and the Settlement contained therein under 28 U.S.C. 1331, and that it has personal jurisdiction over Plaintiffs, Settling Defendants (in this Action only and for purposes of this Settlement only), and all members of the Settlement Class. As further set forth in this Order. The Court appoints A.B. Data, Ltd. as Settlement Administrator for purposes of the Settlement. Plaintiffs are hereby appointed as representatives of the Settlement Class. A hearing will be held on a date of the Court's convenience on or after September 13, 2020 at 3:00 p.m.] (approximately 270 days after entry of this Order) in Courtroom 706 of this Courthouse before the undersigned, to consider the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the Settlement (the "Fairness Hearing"). The foregoing date, time, and place of the Fairness Hearing shall be set forth in the Class Notice, which is ordered herein, but shall be subject to adjournment or change by the Court without further notice to the members of the Settlement Class, other than that which may be posted at the Court or on the Settlements website at www.MGBAntitrustSettlement.com. The Court reserves the right to approve the Settlement at or after the Fairness Hearing with such modifications as may be consented to by the Parties and without further notice to the Settlement Class. As further set forth in this Order. The Court's preliminary certification of the Settlement Class and appointment of Plaintiffs as class representatives, as provided herein are without prejudice to, or waiver of, the rights of any non-settling Defendant to contest any other request by Plaintiffs to certify a class. The Court's findings in this Preliminary Approval Order shall have no effect on the Court's ruling on any motion to certify any class in the Action, or appoint class representatives, and no Person may cite or refer to the Court's approval of the Settlement Class as binding or persuasive authority with respect to any motion to certify such class or appoint class representatives. Unless otherwise specified, the word "days," as used herein, means calendar days. In the event that any date or deadline set forth herein falls on a weekend or federal or state legal holiday, such date or deadline shall be deemed moved to the first business day thereafter. As further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/16/2020) ( Fairness Hearing set for 9/13/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (ks) Modified on 1/12/2021 (ks).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.,JP MORGAN BROKER-DEALER HOLDINGS INC., J.P MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BANCO J.P. MORGAN, S.A. INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTIPLE, J.P. MORGAN GRUPO FINANCIERO, AND J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES PLC, SCHEDULING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL THEREOF, AND APPROVING THE PROPOSED FORM AND PROGRAM OF NOTICE TO THE CLASS granting (209) Motion for Settlement in case 1:18-cv-02830-JPO: It is hereby ordered that 1. Except for the terms expressly defined herein, the Court adopts and incorporates the definitions in the Settlement Agreement for the purposes of this Order. 2. The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction to preliminarily approve the Settlement Agreement, including all exhibits thereto, and the Settlement contained therein under 28 U.S.C. 1331, and that it has personal jurisdiction over Plaintiffs, Settling Defendants (in this Action only and for purposes of this Settlement only), and all members of the Settlement Class. 3. Solely for purposes of the Settlement, the Settlement Class is hereby preliminarily certified and maintained as a class action, pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court finds that the applicable provisions of Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure have been satisfied and that the Court will likely be able to approve the Settlement and certify the Settlement Class for purposes of judgment. The Settlement Class is defined as: further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/16/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (js)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al.(js)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 OPINION AND ORDER: re: #202 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated 04/22/2020. filed by Boston Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, #177 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Moving Defendants dated February 21, 2020. filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' request for jurisdictional discovery is denied. For the foregoing reasons, Moving Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED.Plaintiffs' motions to file certain materials under seal are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Numbers 165, 176, 177, and 202. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/30/2020) (js) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #165 Motion to Seal Document (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Ashby Shores terminated. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #218 Letter, filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/21/2020) Attorney Claire Catalano Dean terminated. (ks)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Claire Catalano Dean dated September 18, 2020 re: Withdrawal as Attorney. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association..(Dean, Claire)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam S. Hakki dated August 3, 2020 re: Response to Plaintiffs Letter to the Court of July 30, 2020 (ECF No. 216). Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America..(Hakki, Adam)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated July 30, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 In re European Government Bonds Antitrust Litigation).(Briganti, Vincent)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Paul S. Mishkin dated June 19, 2020 re: Defendants' Letter Response to Plaintiffs' letter submitting supplemental authority in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Allianz Second Amended Complaint).(Mishkin, Paul)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated June 17, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Allianz Opinion).(Briganti, Vincent)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #213 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #212 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #209 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #209 ..(Briganti, Vincent) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DECLARATION of Vincent Briganti in Support re: #209 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8).(Briganti, Vincent)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #209 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 DECLARATION of Dennis D. Kitt in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kitt, Dennis)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Hakki, Adam)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Bershteyn, Boris)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting (204) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-02830-JPO. GRANTED. MOVING DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A COMBINED REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION. THE COMBINED BRIEF SHALL NOT EXCEED FORTY-FIVE (45) PAGES. NEITHER BRIEF CONTAINED THEREIN SHALL EXCEED TWENTY-FIVE (25) PAGES. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (el)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam S. Hakki dated 05/18/2020. Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America..(Hakki, Adam)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unredacted Appendix A to Merits MOL, #2 Merits MOL with Proposed Redactions Highlighted, #3 Appendix Appendix A to Merits MOL with Proposed Redactions Highlighted, #4 Unredacted PJ MOL, #5 Appendix Unredacted Appendix A to PJ MOL, #6 PJ MOL with Proposed Redactions Highlighted, #7 Appendix Appendix A to PJ MOL with Proposed Redactions Highlighted)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #202 .(Briganti, Vincent)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated 04/22/2020. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Briganti, Vincent)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . Corrected. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A).(Briganti, Vincent)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #201) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A).(Briganti, Vincent) Modified on 4/23/2020 (ldi).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (176 in 1:18-cv-02830-JPO) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al..(Briganti, Vincent)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Aliaga on behalf of Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust..(Aliaga, James)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 and subject to the Courts approval, the undersigned hereby stipulate and consent to the substitution of the law firm CALCATERRA LAW GROUP LLP, by and through its attorney Regina M. Calcaterra, as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan and Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust (collectively the Plaintiffs), in the above-captioned action in place of and instead of the law firm of WOLF HALDENSTEIN ADLER FREEMAN & HERZ LLP. The undersigned hereby request this Court to so-order the substitution. All notices required to be given and all papers filed or served in this action should henceforth be served upon counsel at the address set for the below for incoming counsel. A supporting declaration pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 is filed herewith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/10/2020) Attorney Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr terminated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (ks)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 and subject to the Courts approval, the undersigned hereby stipulate and consent to the substitution of the law firm CALCATERRA LAW GROUP LLP, by and through its attorney Regina M. Calcaterra, as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan and Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust (collectively the Plaintiffs), in the above-captioned action in place of and instead of the law firm of WOLF HALDENSTEIN ADLER FREEMAN & HERZ LLP. The undersigned hereby request this Court to so-order the substitution. All notices required to be given and all papers filed or served in this action should henceforth be served upon counsel at the address set for the below for incoming counsel. A supporting declaration pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 is filed herewith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/10/2020) Attorney Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr terminated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (ks)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Boston Retirement System..(Calcaterra, Regina)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan..(Calcaterra, Regina)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001, (Effective March 2, 2020)..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Anthony Barile, III on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Barile, Peter)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Herbert Perez in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Boston Retirement System, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jose Alejandro De Iturbide Gutierrez in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Boston Retirement System, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Adolfo Hegewisch in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Boston Retirement System, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Raymundo Carrillo De Albornoz De La Mora in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Boston Retirement System, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Sebastian Jimeno in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Boston Retirement System, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 DECLARATION of K. Mallory Brennan in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Hakki, Adam)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . / Moving Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Hakki, Adam)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 DECLARATION of Herbert Perez in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 DECLARATION of Jose Alejandro De Iturbide Gutierrez in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 DECLARATION of Adolfo Hegewisch in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DECLARATION of Raymundo Carrillo De Albornoz De La Mora in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 DECLARATION of Sebastian Jimeno in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 DECLARATION of Fernando Borja Mujica in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Moving Defendants dated February 21, 2020. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Bershteyn, Boris)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC..(Hakki, Adam)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: The Moving Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the SAC by no later than February 21, 2020; Plaintiffs shall serve and file their opposition to any motion(s) to dismiss by no later than April 21, 2020; Moving Defendants shall serve and file any replies in support of any motion(s) to dismiss by no later than May 21, 2020; Moving Defendants' memoranda of law in support of their motion(s) to dismiss the SAC shall contain no more than a collective total of eighty (80) pages; Discovery shall be stayed pending resolution of any motion(s) to dismiss the SAC, except Plaintiffs reserve the right to request jurisdictional discovery from any Moving Defendant that moves to dismiss the SAC on personal jurisdiction, and each Moving Defendant reserves the right to oppose any such request; Except as to the defense of insufficiency of service of process in this Action, no defenses, arguments or rights under the Federal Rules, Local Rules or any other laws or regulations, including, without limitation, defenses based upon lack of personal jurisdiction, is prejudiced or waived or curtailed by Moving Defendants' executing, agreeing to, or filing this Stipulation. This Stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed in facsimile form, each of which shall be an original. So Ordered BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer answer due 2/21/2020; Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex answer due 2/21/2020; Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico answer due 2/21/2020; Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America answer due 2/21/2020; Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple answer due 2/21/2020; HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC answer due 2/21/2020.(Motions due by 2/21/2020., Responses due by 4/21/2020, Replies due by 5/21/2020.), Motions terminated: #173 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Letter Motion to Endorse the Proposed Second Amended Case Management Order addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated February 7, 2020. filed by Boston Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/19/2020) (js)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Letter Motion to Endorse the Proposed Second Amended Case Management Order addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated February 7, 2020. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Second Amended Case Management Order).(Briganti, Vincent)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #173 Letter Motion) - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Stipulation and Proposed Second Amended Case Management Order addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Vincent Briganti dated February 7, 2020. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Second Amended Case Management Order).(Briganti, Vincent) Modified on 2/11/2020 (db).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Danai Kitt on behalf of Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America..(Kitt, Dennis)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Leonardo Villalobos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18535186. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leonardo Villalobos, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Villalobos, Leonardo)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kamali Pettiford Willett on behalf of HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Willett, Kamali)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #170 MOTION for Leonardo Villalobos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18535186. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Z Kopel on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Kopel, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero. (pne)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero, re: #163 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Briganti, Vincent)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #163 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated December 10, 2019. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Briganti, Vincent)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated December 9, 2019 re: Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Briganti, Vincent)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #75 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, against BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Related document: #75 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C, #4 Appendix Appendix D)(Briganti, Vincent)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #161 Response to Motion,, filed by Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. We write on behalf, and with the consent, of all defendants in the above-referenced action in response to plaintiffs' letter to the Court of October 21, 2019 (Dkt No. 159). Counsel for defendants have conferred with counsel for plaintiffs and have agreed to the following next steps, subject to the Court's approval: Defendants do not object to plaintiffs' request to file their motion for leave to amend in approximately 45 days (December 9, 2019); ENDORSEMENT: The letter motion at Docket Number 159 is granted. The parties shall adhere to the deadlines provided herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 159. So ordered. (Motions due by 12/9/2019.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2019) (js)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam S. Hakki dated October 23, 2019 re: #159 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File a Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated October 21, 2019. . Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Hakki, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for Ryan A. Shores to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.(Shores, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File a Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated October 21, 2019. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(Briganti, Vincent)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. Foreign Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is DENIED as moot. Within twenty-one days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Plaintiffs shall file a letter informing the Court whether they intend to move for leave to file a Second Consolidated Amended Complaint and, if so, explaining why leave should be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 113. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/30/2019) (jca)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Henry B. Liu dated September 17, 2019 re: Defendants' Letter Response to Plaintiffs' letter submitting supplemental authority in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Liu, Henry)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated 09/13/2019 re: Informing the Court of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Briganti, Vincent)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America N.A.; Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America Corporation; Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bankamerica International Financial Corporation. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.(Hakki, Adam)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Vincent Briganti dated April 23, 2019 re: Response to Defendants' March 29, 2019 Letter Submitting CDOR as Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund.(Briganti, Vincent)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from all Defendants dated March 29, 2019 re: informing the court of supplemental authority. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Januszewski, David)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Leah Brannon on behalf of Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. New Address: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, 2112 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, United States 20037, (202) 974-1500. (Brannon, Leah)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U.. (Januszewski, David)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Liu, Henry)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE TWO JOINT REPLIES, ONE ON RULE 12(B)(6) ISSUES OF UP TO 25 PAGES AND ONE ON RULE 12(B)(2) ISSUES OF UP TO 20 PAGES, IN LIEU OF SEPARATE REPLIES FROM INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Henry B. Liu dated December 12, 2018. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Liu, Henry)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DECLARATION of Roland R. St. Louis, III in Opposition re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(St. Louis, Roland)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Briganti, Vincent)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Briganti, Vincent)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. . Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 DECLARATION of Karla Vaquero in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DECLARATION of Karla Vaquero in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DECLARATION of Daniel Klay in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DECLARATION of Allison Cambria in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DECLARATION of Alejandro de Iturbide in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DECLARATION of Alejandro de Iturbide in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DECLARATION of Hannah Ellwood in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Barclays PLC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 DECLARATION of Judith Elise Simone Wansink in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 DECLARATION of Jason Wright in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Securities Limited. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DECLARATION of Jason Wright in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DECLARATION of Judith Elise Simone Wansink in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of Raymundo Carrillo de Albornoz de la Mora in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Jose Antonio Ords Porras in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Raymundo Carrillo de Albornoz de la Mora in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Brian R. Herrick in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Gary Prince in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by ING Bank, N.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DECLARATION of C. Blokbergen And B.M. Stoelinga in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Ing Groep N.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECLARATION of Salvador del Valle in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 DECLARATION of Jorge E. Rodriguez Arellano in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DECLARATION of Rebecca K. Smith in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities PLC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECLARATION of Karen Pisarczyk in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECLARATION of Herbert Perez in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Karen Pisarczyk in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Holdings PLC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECLARATION of Loren Wulfsohn in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DECLARATION of Monica Anaya Tapia in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Fernando Borja Mujica in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DECLARATION of Jaime Calvo Alfonsin in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco Santander S.A.. (Januszewski, David)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECLARATION of Claire C. Dean in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appendix D Analysis Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Chart)(Wick, Robert)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Wick, Robert)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc..(Wick, Robert)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke on behalf of Barclays Capital Securities Limited. (Clarke, Stephen)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Capital Securities Limited. Document filed by Barclays Capital Securities Limited.(Porpora, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of Barclays Capital Securities Limited. (Porpora, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Barclays Capital Securities Limited. (Scott, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 3 below and the reservation of rights contained in paragraph 4 below, J.P. Morgan Securities plc agrees to accept service of the Summons and Complaint. 2. The time for the J.P. Morgan Securities plc to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and includes September 17, 2018. If J.P. Morgan Securities plc moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall respond on or before November 16, 2018. Defendants may file replies on their motion(s) on or before December 20, 2018. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of J.P. Morgan Securities plc's forthcoming motion(s) to dismiss; except that if J.P. Morgan Securities plc moves to dismiss the Complaint on the ground that this Court lacks personal jurisdiction as to it pursuant to Rule12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs may seek leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery with respect to that J.P. Morgan Securities plc and additional time to file their opposition(s) to the Rule 12(b)(2) motion(s) to dismiss in order to conduct such discovery. J.P. Morgan Securities plc reserves the right to oppose any motion by Plaintiffs seeking leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 11/16/2018, Replies due by 12/20/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/12/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al.(ama)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Liu, Henry)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: J.P. Morgan Securities PLC answer due 9/17/2018; JP Morgan Securities LLC answer due 9/17/2018. (ama)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Saltzstein, Susan)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for HSBC Holdings PLC. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc..(Bershteyn, Boris)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (Bershteyn, Boris)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Briganti, Vincent)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting (94) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-02830-JPO; granting (12) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-03985-JPO; granting (11) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-04294-JPO; granting (8) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-04400-JPO; granting (9) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-04402-JPO; granting (17) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:18-cv-04673-JPO. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE TWO JOINT MEMORANDA, ONE ON RULE 12(B)(6) ISSUES OF UP TO 50 PAGES AND ONE ON RULE 12(B)(2) ISSUES OF UP TO 35 PAGES, IN LIEU OF SEPARATE BRIEFS FROM INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (Oetken, J.)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ing Groep N.V..(Rosen, Richard)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ING Groep, N.V. for ING Bank, N.V.. Document filed by ING Bank, N.V..(Rosen, Richard)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel George Winter on behalf of ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V.. (Winter, Daniel)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III on behalf of ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V.. (O'Loughlin, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V.. (Rosen, Richard)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of ING Bank, N.V., Ing Groep N.V.. (Karp, Brad)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Defendants dated 9/7/2018. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al.(Dean, Claire)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Other Affiliate Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A. for Credit Suisse AG; Other Affiliate Credit Suisse AG for Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.; Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V. for Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A.. Document filed by Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V..(Januszewski, David)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.. (Januszewski, David)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Chithran Ramesh on behalf of Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.. (Ramesh, Sheila)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Shawn Mintz on behalf of Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.. (Mintz, Adam)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.. (Washer, Herbert)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Catalano Dean on behalf of Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al.(Dean, Claire)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Elizabeth Conston on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Conston, Michelle)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Kay Boardman on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Boardman, Thomas)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ING Groep, NV for ING Financial Markets LLC. Document filed by ING Financial Markets LLC.(Rosen, Richard)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel George Winter on behalf of ING Financial Markets LLC. (Winter, Daniel)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III on behalf of ING Financial Markets LLC. (O'Loughlin, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of ING Financial Markets LLC. (Rosen, Richard)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of ING Financial Markets LLC. (Karp, Brad)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Henry B. Liu)(Liu, Henry)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Robert D. Wick)(Wick, Robert)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #79 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #80 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15384670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, Ing Groep N.V., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities, plc, Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG, Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., ING Groep N.V., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC, re: #75 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Boston Retirement System, Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 COMPLAINT against BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG, Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A., Ing Groep N.V., ING Bank, N.V., ING Financial Markets LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15340539)Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund, Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C, #4 Appendix Appendix D)(Briganti, Vincent)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15314603. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric L. Young, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of ELY, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jayne)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #74 MOTION for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15314603. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey B. Gittleman on behalf of Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands. (Gittleman, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Dassin, Lev)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Ryan A. Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15286912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan A. Shores, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Shores, Ryan)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for Ryan A. Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15286912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #57 Letter filed by Barclays Capital Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, CitiGroup Inc., Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., HSBC Holdings PLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Barclays Bank PLC, BBVA Securities, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, Santander Investment Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Barclays PLC, Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Bank Of America Corporation, Banco Santander S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Bank of America N.A., BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, Deutsche Bank AG, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/03/2018) (ama)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Bank of America N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America N.A..(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Bankamerica International Financial Corporation. Document filed by Bankamerica International Financial Corporation.(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America. Document filed by Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America.(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation.(Hakki, Adam)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Tosch Brennan, Katherine)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Hakki, Adam)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from All Parties dated July 2, 2018 re: Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc..(Porpora, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. Document filed by Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V..(Porpora, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Groupo Financiero Barckays Mexico S.A. de C.V., Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A.. Document filed by Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A..(Porpora, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Porpora, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Porpora, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barclays PLC.(Porpora, Matthew)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Lesley Weaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15266528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #2 Affidavit of Lesley E. Weaver, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, Lesley)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Lesley Weaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15266528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #50 MOTION for Steven Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15238765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Steven Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15238765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven F. Cherry in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC Bar, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherry, Steven)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; granting (33) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:18-cv-02830-JPO. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS as follows: (the "Related Actions") are hereby consolidated for all purposes into one action. These actions shall be referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action." Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended complaint within 30 days of the Court's entry of an order appointing interim class counsel in the Consolidated Action. Interim class counsel in the Consolidated Action will meet-and-confer with Defendants regarding a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint. The deadlines in the Stipulation and Order Regarding Service and Time to Respond to the Complaint entered in the Oklahoma action are hereby vacated and adjourned sine die. See 18-cv-02830 (S.D.N.Y.), ECF No. 11. A Master Docket and Master File are hereby established for the Consolidated Action. The Master File number shall be 18-cv-02830 (JPO). A Master Docket will be maintained for the Related Actions with all entries to be docketed under the Master File number. If a document pertains to only one of the consolidated cases, it will be docketed on the Master Docket with the notation in the docket text as to the case number(s) to which it pertains. All papers previously filed and served to date in the Related Actions are deemed part of the record in 18-cv-02830 (JPO). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3), the Court designates LOWEY DANNENBERG, P.C. as interim class counsel ("Lead Counsel") on behalf of all Plaintiffs and the proposed class in the above-captioned action (the "Action"). The parties shall confer and propose a date for Defendants to respond to the Complaint, as well as a briefing schedule in the event Defendants file a motion to dismiss. The proposed schedule shall be filed within 14 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 21 and 33. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/18/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02830-JPO et al. (ama)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS ADJOURNED SINE DIE UNTIL AFTER THE COURT RESOLVES THE PENDING MOTIONS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Re: Current Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Matthew J. Porpora dated June 8, 2018. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc..(Porpora, Matthew)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke on behalf of Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Clarke, Stephen)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Porpora, Matthew)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC, Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Scott, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152442. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, Colleen)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammarskjold, Carl)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15152442. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Michael A. Toomey dated 6/1/2018 re: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, et al. v. Banco Santander S.A., et al., No: 18-cv-2830-JPO; and Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands v. Banco Santander S.A., No: 18-cv-04673. Document filed by Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands.(Toomey, Michael)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger Allen Cooper on behalf of Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Cooper, Roger)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lev Louis Dassin on behalf of Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Dassin, Lev)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Leave to File a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briganti, Vincent)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Leave to File a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briganti, Vincent)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Leah Brannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15109051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leah Brannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15109051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Brannon in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brannon, Leah)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation, Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp. for Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple; Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc..(Terzaken, John)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Terzaken to RE-FILE Document #30 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp.; Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp. for Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc..(Terzaken, John) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lb).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steven F. Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15094386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherry, Steven) Modified on 5/21/2018 (wb).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U.. Document filed by Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banco Santander, S.A. for Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico. Document filed by Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banco Santander S.A. for Santander Holdings USA, Inc.. Document filed by Santander Holdings USA, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. Document filed by Santander Investment Securities, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banco Santander S.A..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #29 MOTION for Steven F. Cherry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15094386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-02830, 18-cv-03985, 18-cv-04294 and Set Briefing Schedule for Motions to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Briganti, Vincent)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-02830, 18-cv-03985, 18-cv-04294 and Set Briefing Schedule for Motions to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briganti, Vincent)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Other Affiliate Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. for BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.; Corporate Parent Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V. for BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer; Corporate Parent Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Other Affiliate BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. for BBVA Securities, Inc.. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V..(Mishkin, Paul)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Paul Steel Mishkin to RE-FILE Document #19 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V..(Mishkin, Paul) Modified on 4/27/2018 (lb).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.. (Mishkin, Paul)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Gabor Mehes on behalf of BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.. (Mehes, Adam)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur J. Burke on behalf of BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.. (Burke, Arthur)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for John Francis Terzaken III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14989648. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Karen Michelle Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14989675. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Karen Michelle Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14989675. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Porter, Karen)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for John Francis Terzaken III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14989648. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Terzaken, John)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Myers on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Myers, Jonathan)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: Subject to the provisions set forth in paragraph 3 below and the reservation of rights contained in paragraph 4 below, the Stipulating Defendants agree to accept service of the Summons and Complaint. The time for the Stipulating Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and includes June 28, 2018. If one or more of the Stipulating Defendants moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall respond on or before September 7, 2018. The Stipulating Defendants may file replies on their motion(s) on or before October 5, 2018. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of the Stipulating Defendants' forthcoming motion(s) to dismiss; except that if any Stipulating Defendant moves to dismiss the Complaint on the ground that this Court lacks personal jurisdiction as to it pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs may seek leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery with respect to that Stipulating Defendant and additional time to file their opposition(s) to the Rule 12(b)(2) motion(s) to dismiss in order to conduct such discovery. The Stipulating Defendants reserve the right to oppose any motion by Plaintiffs seeking leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery, and as further set forth in this order. BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer answer due 6/28/2018; BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; BBVA Securities, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. answer due 6/28/2018; Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero answer due 6/28/2018; Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex answer due 6/28/2018; Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico answer due 6/28/2018; Banco Santander S.A. answer due 6/28/2018; Bank Of America Corporation answer due 6/28/2018; Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America answer due 6/28/2018; Bank of America N.A. answer due 6/28/2018; Bankamerica International Financial Corporation answer due 6/28/2018; Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A. answer due 6/28/2018; Barclays Bank PLC answer due 6/28/2018; Barclays Capital Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Barclays Capital Plc answer due 6/28/2018; Barclays PLC answer due 6/28/2018; CitiGroup Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Citigroup Financial Products Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Citigroup Global Markets Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Deutsche Bank AG answer due 6/28/2018; Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp. answer due 6/28/2018; Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple answer due 6/28/2018; Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V. answer due 6/28/2018; Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V. answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Bank PLC answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Holdings PLC answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Markets (USA) Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC North America Holdings Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; JP Morgan Securities LLC answer due 6/28/2018; JPMorgan Chase & Co. answer due 6/28/2018; JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association answer due 6/28/2018; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated answer due 6/28/2018; Santander Holdings USA, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018; Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U. answer due 6/28/2018; Santander Investment Securities, Inc. answer due 6/28/2018. (Motions due by 6/28/2018. Responses due by 9/7/2018, Replies due by 10/5/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/25/2018) (ap) Modified on 4/26/2018 (ap).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14959680. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14959680. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaver, Todd)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, John Does 1-10, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas Egan on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Egan, Patrick)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (St. Louis, Roland)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Peter Girnys on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Girnys, Raymond)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Levis, Christian)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Milbank Horn on behalf of Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Horn, Geoffrey)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vincent Briganti re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party John Does 1-10;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,.(Briganti, Vincent)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:15; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System; Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W.; Barclays Bank PLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANCO SANTANDER S.A., SANTANDER INVESTMENT SECURITIES, INC., SANTANDER HOLDINGS USA, INC. BANCO SANTANDER (MEXICO) S.A. INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO SANTANDER MEXICO, SANTANDER INVESTMENT BOLSA, SOCIEDAD DE VALORES, S.A.U., BANCO BILBAO VIZCAYA ARGENTARIA, S.A., BBVA SECURITIES, INC., BBVA COMPASS BANCSHARES, INC., BBVA BANCOMER S.A., INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO BBVA BANCOMER, GRUPO FINANCIERO BBVA BANCOMER, S.A. DE C.V., JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JP MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, J.P. MORGAN BROKER-DEALER HOLDINGS INC., BANCO J.P. MORGAN, S.A. INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, J.P. MORGAN GRUPO FINANCIERO, HSBC HOLDINGS PLC, HSBC BANK PLC, HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC., HSBC MARKETS (USA) INC., HSBC MXICO, S.A., INSTITUCION DE BANCA MLTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO HSBC, HSBC NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., HSBC LATIN AMERICA HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED, BARCLAYS PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., BARCLAYS BANK PLC, GRUPO FINANCIERO BARCLAYS MEXICO, S.A. DE C.V., BARCLAYS BANK MEXICO, S.A., CITIGROUP INC., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CITIGROUP FINANCIAL PRODUCTS INC., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS HOLDINGS INC., BANCO NACIONAL DE MEXICO, S.A., INSTITUCION DE BANCA MULTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO BANAMEX, BANK OF AMERICA N.A., BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANKAMERICA INTERNATIONAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA MEXICO, S.A., INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, GRUPO FINANCIERO BANK OF AMERICA, MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED, DEUTSCHE BANK AG, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC., DEUTSCHE BANK AMERICAS HOLDING CORP., DEUTSCHE BANK MXICO, S.A. INSTITUCIN DE BANCA MLTIPLE, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A)(Briganti, Vincent)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA Securities, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex, Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico, Banco Santander S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bankamerica International Financial Corporation, Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A., Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Plc, Barclays PLC, CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp., Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V., Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited, HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U., Santander Investment Securities, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14880291)Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W., Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C)(Briganti, Vincent) Modified on 4/2/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE MEXICAN GOVERNMENT BONDS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Represented By: Karen Michelle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Santander S.A.
Represented By: Steven Franklin Cherry
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco J.P. Morgan, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Nacional de Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multipe, Grupo Financiero Banamex
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Investment Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Franklin Cherry
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Financial Products Inc.
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Represented By: Karen Michelle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Mexico, S.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Santander (Mexico) S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Santander Mexico
Represented By: Steven Franklin Cherry
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Financiero Barclays Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Latin America Holdings (UK) Limited
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankamerica International Financial Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero HSBC
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Leonardo Villalobos
Represented By: Kamali Pettiford Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Markets (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Mexico, S.A. Institucion de Banca Multiple
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Represented By: Karen Michelle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Bancomer S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, Grupo Financiero Bank of America
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Represented By: Dennis Danai Kitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Financiero BBVA Bancomer, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corp.
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Jonathan Myers
Represented By: Karen Michelle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Inc.
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur J. Burke
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS BANK PLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan Ashby Shores
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Investment Bolsa, Sociedad De Valores, S.A.U.
Represented By: Steven Franklin Cherry
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Holdings USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Franklin Cherry
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Financial Markets LLC
Represented By: Daniel George Winter
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Financiero Banamex S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ing Groep N.V.
Represented By: Daniel George Winter
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Financiero Credit Suisse (Mexico), S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities PLC
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Claire Catalano Dean
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Securities Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Stephen Hendrix Oliver Clarke
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Credit Suisse (Mexico) S.A.
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Represented By: Adam Shawn Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Bank, N.V.
Represented By: Daniel George Winter
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Bank Mexico, S.A., Institucion de Banca Multiple, UBS Grupo Financiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Colleen Cleary
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension Fund Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Geoffrey Milbank Horn
Represented By: Raymond Peter Girnys
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Colleen Cleary
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Sitso W. Bediako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Boston Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Betsy C. Manifold
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Regina Marie Calcaterra
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Conston
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Barrack
Represented By: Michael Arthur Toomey
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Gittleman
Represented By: William J. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Betsy C. Manifold
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Regina Marie Calcaterra
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Represented By: James Aliaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Metropolitan Transportation Authority Defined Benefit Pension Plan Master Trust
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Betsy C. Manifold
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Regina Marie Calcaterra
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Represented By: James Aliaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?