Sportvision, Inc et al v. MLB Advanced Media L.P. Featured Case

Plaintiff Sportvision, Inc. and SportsMEDIA Technology Corp. alleged that Defendant MLB Advanced Media, LP (1) replaced core Sportvision components in the PITCHf/x system, breached its exclusivity obligations and infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,341,530 entitled Virtual Strike Zone, (2) failed to perform under its contract with Sportvision, and (3) willfully misappropriated Sportvision's trade secrets.

Plaintiff: Sportvision, Inc and SportsMedia Technology Corporation
Defendant: MLB Advanced Media L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03025
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from H.Peter Haveles,Jr. dated June 22,2018 re: Response To June 19,2018 Letter. Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation, Sportvision, Inc.(Haveles, H.)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Alan E. Littmann dated 06/19/2018 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P..(Littmann, Alan)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: a. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to First Amended Complaint: June 27, 2018. (This request represents an extension of 16 days beyond the current deadline.) b. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file an opposition to any motion filed in response to First Amended Complaint: July 25, 2018. (This request represents an extension of 14 days beyond the time to respond provided in the S.D.N.Y. Local Rules.) c. Deadline for Defendant to file a reply in support of any motion filed in response to First Amended Complaint: August 8, 2018. (This request represents an extension of 7 days beyond the time to respond provided in the S.D.N.Y. Local Rules.) (As further set forth in this Order.) Counsel are reminded of their obligation to comply with this Court's pre-motion conference requirements, as set forth in this Court's Individual Rules. MLB Advanced Media L.P. answer due 6/27/2018. Motions due by 6/27/2018., Responses due by 7/25/2018, Replies due by 8/8/2018.), Motions terminated: 27 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Related to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (STIPULATION). filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/9/2018) (cf)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 4/30/18 re: Counsel requests that the Court seal certain limited portions of Exhibits B, C, D, E and F to the First Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2018) (mro)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 25 Motion for Benjamin J. Eichel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2018) (mro)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 24 Motion for Matthew H. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2018) (mro)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 30 Endorsed Letter,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (mro)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Related to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (STIPULATION). Document filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P..(Littmann, Alan) Modified on 5/16/2018 (db).
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 8 Complaint against MLB Advanced Media L.P. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sportvision, Inc, SportsMedia Technology Corporation. Related document: 8 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '530 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Endeavor Contract, # 3 Exhibit C - Amendment to Endeavor Contract, # 4 Exhibit D - Second Amendment to Endeavor Contract, # 5 Exhibit E - Third Amendment to Endeavor Contract, # 6 Exhibit F - Fourth Amendment to Endeavor Contract, # 7 Exhibit G - January 24, 2017 Letter, # 8 Exhibit H - February 24, 2017 E-mail)(Haveles, H.)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Benjamin J. Eichel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14990184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation, Sportvision, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A)(Eichel, Benjamin)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Matthew H. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14990157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation, Sportvision, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A)(Adler, Matthew)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 24 MOTION for Matthew H. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14990157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 25 MOTION for Benjamin J. Eichel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14990184. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Alan E. Littmann, Brian P. O'Donoghue, and Laura Sexton dated 4/24/2018 re: Request that the Court seal limited portions of the exhibits to the Complaint, specifically the Endeavor Contract (Compl., Ex. B), and its amendments (Campi., Exs. C-F). ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted for the reasons set forth in this letter. Redacted versions of the documents that are the subject of the letter are to be posted on the public docket by April 27, 2018. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/25/2018) (cf)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 17 Motion for Alan E. Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018) (cf)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 19 Motion for Laura Sexton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018) (rjm)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 18 Motion for Brian P. O'Donoghue to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018) (cf)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Laura A. Sexton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968943. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Laura Sexton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sexton, Laura)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Brian P. O'Donoghue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brian P. O'Donoghue, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donoghue, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Alan E. Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968623. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan E. Littmann, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Littmann, Alan)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Alan E. Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968623. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Brian P. O'Donoghue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Laura A. Sexton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14968943. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 4/16/2018 re: For the reasons set forth above, plaintiffs respectfully request that the applicaton for leave to file under seal be granted. ENDORSEMENT: The Application Is Denied. Under lugosch and its progeny, parties seeking sealing must demonstrate that disclosure would subject them to competitive harm or otherwise violate their legitimate privacy interest. Conclusory assertions in this regard--or parties agreements to maintain materials as confidential--are unsufficient. The materials that are the subject at this application will be ordered unsealed on April 25, 2018 absent a proper sealing application explaining how the lugosch standard is met. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/18/2018) (ama) Modified on 6/13/2018 (ama).
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND TO EXTEND DEFENDANT MLB ADVANCED MEDIA LPT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 11, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) MLB Advanced Media L.P. answer due 6/11/2018. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/13/2018) (cf)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/12/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/11/2018) (ap)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (jgo)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MLB Advanced Media, LP, re: 8 Complaint. Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation, Sportvision, Inc. (Haveles, H.)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney H. Peter Haveles, J to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT against MLB Advanced Media L.P.. Document filed by Sportvision, Inc, SportsMedia Technology Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A thru H)(Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation.(Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SportsMedia Technology Corporation for Sportvision, Inc. Document filed by Sportvision, Inc.(Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by H. Peter Haveles, Jr on behalf of Sportvision, Inc. New Address: Pepper Hamilton LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, 37th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10018, 212-808-2700. (Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney H. Peter Haveles to RE-FILE Document 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple nature of suits selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located athttp://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners SportsMedia Technology Corporation added. Party added pursuant to 1 Complaint.Document filed by SportsMedia Technology Corporation. Related document: 1 Complaint.(Haveles, H.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 35:275; Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 18:1836; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sportvision, Inc; SportsMedia Technology Corporation; MLB Advanced Media L.P.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MLB Advanced Media, LP, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sportvision, Inc. (Haveles, H.) Modified on 4/9/2018 (jgo).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sportvision, Inc.(Haveles, H.) Modified on 4/6/2018 (lb).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haveles, H.) Modified on 4/6/2018 (jgo).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against MLB Advanced Media L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14906409)Document filed by Sportvision, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru H)(Haveles, H.) Modified on 4/6/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sportvision, Inc et al v. MLB Advanced Media L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sportvision, Inc
Represented By: Matthew H. Adler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Eichel
Represented By: H. Peter Haveles, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SportsMedia Technology Corporation
Represented By: Matthew H. Adler
Represented By: Benjamin J. Eichel
Represented By: H. Peter Haveles, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLB Advanced Media L.P.
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Brian P. O'Donoghue
Represented By: Laura Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?