Informed Consent Action Network v. United States Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Informed Consent Action Network
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv03215
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 18 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties by and through their respective counsel: 1. That the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each side to bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses; and 2. That this stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and that electronic (PDF) signatures may be deemed originals for all purposes. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/6/2018) (ne)
June 10, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule and Adjourn Conference. The parties' proposed briefing schedule is hereby ADOPTED. The initial conference scheduled for June 13, 2018, is thus ADJOURNED sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
June 7, 2018 16 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Adjournment, Currently Scheduled for June 13, 2018, and to Enter a Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Aaron Siri dated June 7, 2018. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron)
June 1, 2018 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services.(Sun, Anthony)
May 9, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an initial conference on June 13, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. No later than the Thursday prior to the initial conference, each party shall file via ECF a letter, not to exceed five pages single spaced, outlining its position on the need for discovery and, if appropriate, proposing a production and/or briefing schedule. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
May 9, 2018 13 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Aaron Siri dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron)
May 2, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/2/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron)
April 29, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit a joint letter pursuant to the Court's April 13, 2018 Order is hereby EXTENDED to May 11, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 27, 2018 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Sun, Anthony)
April 27, 2018 9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Until May 11, 2018 to Submit Joint Letter Required by the Court's Order of April 13, 2018 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Aaron Siri dated 4/27/2018. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron)
April 26, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron)
April 18, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of April 13, 2018 Order of Hon. Jesse M. Furman (ECF Doc. No. 5) served on United States Department of Health and Human Services on 4/16/18. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron)
April 18, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/16/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron)
April 13, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/13/2018) (ras)
April 13, 2018 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (pc)
April 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
April 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
April 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aaron Siri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Informed Consent Action Network. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pc)
April 12, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron)
April 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron)
April 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14934331)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Informed Consent Action Network v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Informed Consent Action Network
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?