In the Matter of Miller's Launch, Inc. et al
Petitioner: |
Miller's Tug & Barge, Inc. and Miller's Launch, Inc. |
Claimant: |
Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC, D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. and D7 Construction Pier A, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv03582 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Richmond |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie E. Caproni |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1333 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 26, 2021 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting 49 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kristin E. Poling dated April 26, 2021. Document filed by Miller's Launch, Inc., Miller's Tug & Barge, Inc. This request is granted. The conferen ce scheduled for April 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is adjourned to May 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/26/2021) (rjm)
|
April 21, 2021 |
Filing
46
ORDER. On November 6, 2020, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter updating the Court on the status of the state court proceedings by March 30, 2021. (Dkt. 45.) The parties failed to do so. Within one week of the filing of this order, the parties shall file the joint status letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/21/2021) (rjm)
|
November 2, 2020 |
Filing
43
ORDER: Within one week of the filing of this Order, it is hereby ORDERED that either (1) the parties must file on ECF the joint letter described in Dkt. 42 or (2) each party must submit a letter, of no more than five pages, showing cause why sanction s should not be imposed in light of the parties' failure to comply with the Court's Orders of September 16, 2019 and October 15, 2020, particularly in light of Judge Caproni's September 23, 2019 Order declining at that time to sanction counsel for Claimants, but reminding counsel to be observant of the Court's orders. (Dkt. 41.). And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/02/2020) (ama)
|
October 15, 2020 |
Filing
42
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Cou rt orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before this Court is adjourned pending further order of this Court. A dditionally, within two weeks of the filing of this Order, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information, to the extent it is relevant, in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2020) (ama)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?