Gayle v. Allee et al
Plaintiff: Itoffee R. Gayle
Defendant: David S. Allee and Morgan Lehman Gallery
Case Number: 1:2018cv03774
Filed: April 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER with respect to 56 Motion to Dismiss: Because pro bono counsel did not appear in this case to represent Gayle in connection with Defendants' motion to dismiss by the October 30, 2020 deadline, the Court deems the motion to dismiss fully briefed, and will issue an opinion based on the parties previously filed submissions in due course. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/12/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All parties must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, including those applicable to pro se cases, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov /hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, except that any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Co urt is adjourned pending further order of the Court. The Court will issue further guidance regarding the pending motion to dismiss in due course. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/13/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 10/13/2020 (ama).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Accordingly, Gayle shall have 60 days from counsel's filing of a notice of appearance to supplement his briefing in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants shall have 30 days from the filing of Gayle's suppleme ntal brief to submit a further reply. In the event that counsel has not filed a notice of appearance by October 30, 2020, the motion pending at Dkt. 56 will be deemed fully briefed.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Gayle. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/25/2020) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. Nonetheless, Plaintiff may amend his complaint to cure the deficiencies noted in the Court's ruling. If Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must d o so no later than June 10, 2020. Plaintiff's current counsel is directed to provide him with a copy of this Order and the transcript from today's conference. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/10/20) (yv)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference on April 10, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss the pending motion to dismiss in this case. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (88 8) 363-4749 Access Code: 1015508 If it is not feasible for the parties to appear telephonically at that time, they should jointly notify the Court by letter filed on ECF and include proposed alternative dates for this conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/3/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayle v. Allee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itoffee R. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Allee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Lehman Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?