Clifford v. Trump Featured Case

The adult film actress Stephanie Clifford, also known as Stormy Daniels, has filed a lawsuit against President Trump alleging that he made defamatory statements about her on Twitter. Daniels seeks damages in excess of $75,000.

Plaintiff: Stephanie Clifford
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2018cv03842
Filed: April 30, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Central District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:18-cv-06893, filed on 08/10/2018. (sjo)
August 8, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Central District of California (mro)
August 8, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Stephanie Clifford and Defendant Donald J. Trump's Stipulation to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, the Court's records and files of the case, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders as follows: 1. The Stipulation is GRANTED; 2. This action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. 3. Nothing in this Order, the parties' Stipulation, or the fact of the parties' consent to transfer, shall be construed as a waiver of any legal or factual argument or position relating to this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case forthwith, to terminate Docket No. 11 as moot, and to close the case in this Court. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/8/2018) (mro) Modified on 8/8/2018 (mro).
August 8, 2018 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re: Stipulation to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California) (Keenan, Catherine)
August 7, 2018 16 NOTICE of Errata re: 13 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff Stephanie Clifford's Opposition to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule)(Keenan, Catherine)
August 6, 2018 15 Objection to Declarations of Charles J. Harder in Support of Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Keenan, Catherine)
August 6, 2018 14 DECLARATION of Michael J. Avenatti in Opposition re: 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule.. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-9, # 2 Exhibits 10-15)(Keenan, Catherine)
August 6, 2018 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule. . Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Keenan, Catherine)
July 26, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER: On July 23, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to transfer this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), or, in the alternative, to dismiss or stay this case, pursuant to the "first-filed" rule. (Docket No. 11). The following schedule shall apply to Defendant's motion: Plaintiff shall file any opposition by August 6, 2018. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be due by August 13, 2018. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with one courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or by delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Finally, the Court concludes that it would be premature to hold a Rule 16 initial pretrial conference before Defendant's motion is resolved. Accordingly, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for August 15, 2018, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule. :(Responses due by 8/6/2018, Replies due by 8/13/2018.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/26/2018) (ne) Modified on 7/26/2018 (ne).
July 23, 2018 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to the "First-Filed" Rule. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Charles J. Harder in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibits A - C to Declaration of Charles J. Harder, #4 Exhibits D - F to Declaration of Charles J. Harder, #5 Exhibits G - K to Declaration of Charles J. Harder, #6 Exhibits L - S to Declaration of Charles J. Harder, #7 Exhibits T - AA to Declaration of Charles J. Harder, #8 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion)(Harder, Charles)
June 13, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Continue. The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for June 20, 2018, is hereby ADJOURNED to August 15, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
June 13, 2018 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Continue June 20, 2018 Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Defendant Donald J. Trump dated June 13, 2018. Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(Harder, Charles)
June 13, 2018 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles John Harder on behalf of Donald J. Trump. (Harder, Charles)
May 29, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Keenan, Catherine)
May 1, 2018 6 Featured Case NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 20, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, and as further set forth herein. (Initial Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/1/2018) (ras)
May 1, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump. (pne)
May 1, 2018 5 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Catherine R. Keenan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
May 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Catherine R. Keenan. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Stephanie Clifford, Donald J. Trump. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reason: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
May 1, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 1, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
April 30, 2018 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Catherine R. Keenan on behalf of Stephanie Clifford. New Address: Philip Russell, LLC, 66 FIELD POINT RD, GREENWICH, CT, 06830, (203) 661-4200. (Keenan, Catherine)
April 30, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Clifford. (Keenan, Catherine)
April 30, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Keenan, Catherine)
April 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15005277)Document filed by Stephanie Clifford.(Keenan, Catherine)
April 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15005277)Document filed by Stephanie Clifford.(Keenan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Clifford
Represented By: Catherine R. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Charles John Harder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?