Massey v. Morgan
Plaintiff: Tyrone H. Massey
Defendant: Morgan
Case Number: 1:2018cv03994
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated May 21, 2021 (ECF No. 108.). Caner Demirayak has filed a notice of appearance on behalf of the Plaintiff. (ECF No. 97.) There is nothing on the docket to suggest that M r. Demirayak has withdrawn from representation. Thus, there is no reason to appoint counsel at this time. Upon the resolution of the motion for summary judgment that is currently before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr., this Court will schedule a conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/3/2021) (mro)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Given the pending summary judgment motion, Plaintiff's new counsel shall notify the court by May 20, 2021 whether Plaintiff wishes to withdraw (without prejudice) the motion for leave to amend the complaint, compel disclosur e and request for a temporary restraining order (ECF No. 89). Plaintiff will be permitted, as appropriate, to resubmit an appropriate motion with assistance of counsel after determination of the pending motion for summary judgment. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/6/2021) (mro)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Defendant is hereby ordered to respond to Plaintiff's motion filed at ECF No. 89, dated February 12, 2021, as well as Plaintiffs letters filed at ECF Nos. 92, 93, and 94 by Friday, April 23, 2021. Defendant's filing should respond to the relief requested by Plaintiff in his motion, as well as the assertions made by Plaintiff in his letters, and the implications those assertions have on the case going forward. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED (Responses due by 4/23/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/9/2021) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 75 Letter Motion to Seal. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/8/2021) (js)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/20/2021) (js)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A Status Conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for Monday, December 21, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the Warden or other official in charge of the Manhattan Detention Complex produce Plaintiff Tyrone H. Massey, B&C #95200522/NYSID #01083103M, on December 21, 2020, no later than 1:00 p.m., to a suitable location within the Manhattan Detention Complex that is equipped with a telephone, for the purpose of participa ting by telephone in a conference with the Court and Defendant's counsel. If the scheduled time and date presents a hardship, the Warden or the Warden's designee should promptly inform chambers by calling Courtroom Deputy Chris Aie llo at (212) 805-0234; as further set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff at following address: Tyrone Massey, B&C # 895200522/NYSID #01083103M, Manhattan D etention Complex, 125 White Street, New York, NY 100013. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/19/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The status conference scheduled for today, September 29, 2020 is hereby adjourned given Defense counsel's ex parte representation to the court regarding an emergency situation at the prison in whic h Plaintiff is currently incarcerated. That status conference is hereby rescheduled for Monday, October 26, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for Defendant is directed to telephone chambers at Judge Parker's AT&T Conference Line with the Plaintif f on the line, at the time and date of the conference. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff at following address: Tyrone Massey, Mi d-Hudson Forensic Psychiatric Center, 2834 Route 17M, New Hampton, NY 10958-0158. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/29/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: On April 12, 2019, Judge Parker recommended this action be dismissed without prejudice. (ECF No. 37). The Report and Recommendation advised that Plaintiff would have seventeen days from the date of service to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 72(b). On October 21, 2019, Plaintiff requested an extension of his deadline. (ECF No. 38). Defendant responded on January 20, 2020. (ECF No. 41). Plaintiff's request for an extension is GRANTED. Plai ntiff should submit objections to Judge Parker's Report and Recommendation by July 27, 2020. Defendant's response is due August 24, 2020. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due September 14, 2020. SO ORDERED, Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2020, Responses due by 8/24/2020, Replies due by 9/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/26/2020) (rj)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re: 38 Letter, filed by Tyrone Hiram Massey, Tyrone H. Massey. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's October 21, 2019 letter. (ECF No. 38). Defendants should file a response by January 20, 2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/6/2020) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone H. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?