Sesame Workshop v. STX Productions, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Sesame Workshop seeks an injunction to bar Defendants STX Productions, LLC, STX Financing, LLC, and STX Filmworks, Inc. from infringing on Plaintiff's "Sesame Street" trademark by using the allegedly infringing tagline "No Sesame. All Street." in Defendant's "The Happytime Murders" movie trailer.

Plaintiff: Sesame Workshop
Defendant: STX Productions, LLC, STX Financing, LLC and STX Filmworks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04597
Filed: May 24, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Vernon S. Broderick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2018 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER). . Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 19 DECLARATION of Robert Springer in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 18 DECLARATION of Noah Fogelson in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 17 DECLARATION of Keri Moore in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 16 DECLARATION of David Halberstadter in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 15 DECLARATION of Adam Fogelson in Opposition re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Goldberg, David)
May 28, 2018 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by STX Filmworks, Inc..(Goldberg, David)
May 25, 2018 13 DECLARATION of John Gallacher in Support re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 12 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Salvo in Support re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 11 DECLARATION of John N. Orsini in Support re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER).. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER). . Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 9 PROPOSED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (re: Docket Number: 8 ORDER). Document filed by Sesame Workshop.(Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: On May 24, 2018, I held a hearing in this matter pertaining to Plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order. Accordingly, and for the reasons discussed on the record, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's TRO papers on or before May 28, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. EST and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before May 29, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. EST. The parties are directed to appear for a hearing on the TRO on May 30, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Replies due by 5/29/2018. Status Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/25/2018) (ras)
May 25, 2018 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sesame Workshop.(Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STX Productions, LLC, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STX Financing, LLC, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 25, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STX Filmworks, Inc., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sesame Workshop. (Mulligan, Mary)
May 24, 2018 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mulligan, Mary)
May 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Andrew W. Goldwater to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 24, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 24, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 24, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc)
May 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against STX Filmworks, Inc., STX Financing, LLC, STX Productions, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401210073)Document filed by Sesame Workshop.(pc) (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sesame Workshop v. STX Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sesame Workshop
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Mulligan
Represented By: John Nicholas Orsini
Represented By: David Joseph Ranzenhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STX Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STX Financing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STX Filmworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?