Stanley v. CUNY, John Jay College
Plaintiff: David Stanley
Case Number: 1:2018cv04844
Filed: May 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. Mr. Stanley's pro se motion requesting a ninety-day extension of time to file his second amended complaint (Dkt. No. 52) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Stanley and to note the mailing on the public docket.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/17/21) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons articulated above, Defendant's motion pursuant to Rule 60 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file a second amended complaint no later than 90 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully dire cted to vacate the judgment, re-open this case, and mail a copy of this order to Mr. Stanley. This resolves Dkt. No. 40. SO ORDERED. Granting 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, 34 Clerk's Judgment filed by David Stanley. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/19/2020) (rjm). Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. The Court extends Mr. Davy's deadline to respond to the Order to Show Cause to January 21, 2020. If Mr. Davy does not respond by this date, the Court will refer this matter to the Grievance Committee. Chambers will mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Stanley and Mr. Davy and note its mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/8/20) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (yv)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, On November 18, 2019, the Court received a letter from Plaintiff that has now been docketed. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks relief from the judgment, he must make a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60. The Court sets December 23, 2019 as the deadline by which Plaintiff may make this motion on the grounds raised in his letter. Before filing any motion, Plaintiff must either obtain new counsel or file a notice of pro se appearance. Chambers will mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and note its mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/23/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/21/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons articulated above, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. This resolves Dkt. Nos. 11 and 26. SO ORDERED. Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/30/2019) (rjm). Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. CUNY, John Jay College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stanley
Represented By: Courtney Kirk-Patrick Davy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?