Wedil David v. The Weinstein Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Police Officer "Jane" Doe and Wedil David
Defendant: Robert Weinstein, Lance Maerov, Dirk Ziff, Tarak Ben Ammar, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Marc Lasry, Richard Koenigsberg, Jeff Sackman, James Dolan, Tim Sarnoff, Does 12 through 25, inclusive, David Glasser, Harvey Weinstein, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, Paul Tudor Jones and Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv05414
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1):Plaintiff WEDIL DAVID and Defendants HARVEY WEINSTEIN, THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY, LLC, and THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY HOLDINGS, LLC, hereby stipulate to dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) with leave to reinstate within 120 days with tolling should the Sexual Misconduct Claims Fund not be disbursed in the bankruptcy proceeding, In re: The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, No. 18-10601 (MFW) (Bankr. D. Del.). If the Sexual Misconduct Claims Fund is distributed or 120 days expire without reinstatement, whichever is earlier, the dismissal will be with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. This case is hereby closed as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/2/2021) (jca)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the telephone conference scheduled previously in the above-captioned action for April 15, 2021, is canceled. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 4/2/2021) (va)
April 2, 2021 Filing 241 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Harvey Weinstein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Wedil David. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Mintzer, Kevin)
April 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Mintzer, Kevin. RE-FILE Document No. #240 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
April 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #241 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
April 1, 2021 Filing 240 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Wedil David, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Harvey Weinstein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Wedil David. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Mintzer, Kevin) Modified on 4/2/2021 (tp).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic status conference shall be held in the above-captioned action on April 15, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. All parties are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and, thereafter, enter access code 4862532. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 4/1/2021) (va)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #237 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2021 and Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 237 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Kevin Mintzer dated September 21, 2020. Document filed by Wedil David..(Mintzer, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Now before the Court are Harvey Weinstein's objections to Magistrate Judge Fox's February 12, 2020 and May 8, 2020 orders, which directed Weinstein to respond to Plaintiff's first set of discovery requests without the ability to assert objections. For the reasons that follow, Judge Fox's orders are affirmed and Weinstein's objections are overruled. For the foregoing reasons, Weinstein's Rule 72(a) objections are overruled. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/17/2020) (rj)
June 11, 2020 Filing 235 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bryan L. Arbeit dated June 11, 2020 re: Informing the Court that Defendant Weinstein's Rule 72(a) Objections are Fully Briefed. Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #229 Letter Motion for Discovery. In summary, Weinstein must meet his production supplementation obligation without further delay, except as that obligation relates to electronically stored information not yet available to him for production, as noted above. The parties are reminded that failing to obey a court order may result in sanctions, including contempt of court. This order resolves Docket Entry No. 229. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 6/4/2020) (va)
June 2, 2020 Filing 233 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 06/02/2020 re: Response to Court's Order dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
May 29, 2020 Filing 232 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #228 Notice (Other), . Document filed by Wedil David..(Wigdor, Douglas)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER with respect to #229 Motion for Discovery. To assist the Court in resolving the controversy discussed in Docket Entry Nos. 229 and 230, defendant Harvey Weinstein ("Weinstein") shall, on or before June 2, 2020, identify for the Court the : 1) binding authority upon which he relies in support of his position that he may delay meeting his discovery supplementation obligation by lodging a Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) objection; and 2) e-discovery vendor Weinstein has engaged to facilitate his disclosure of electronically stored information, the date the vendor will complete the assigned task(s) or the date the vendor has provided to Weinstein as the projected completion date. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 230 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated May 27, 2020 re: Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Motion dated May 26, 2020 seeking an order directing defendant to produce documents by June 3, 2020. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
May 26, 2020 Filing 229 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated May 26, 2020. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Document Requests).(Arbeit, Bryan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE of Objection Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 72(a) -Timely Objection to Order. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Imran H. Ansari, #2 Objection Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Ex. A: Plaintiff's letter motion, #4 Exhibit Ex. B: Response, #5 Exhibit Ex. C: 2/12/20 Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. D: Defendant's Request for Reconsideration and/or Clarification).(Ansari, Imran)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 PRODUCTION PROTOCOL: WHEREAS, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), counsel for Plaintiff Wedil David ("Plaintiff"), counsel for Harvey Weinstein ("Weinstein") and The Weinstein Company, LLC ("TWC"), (collectively, the "Parties," and each, a "Party") have met and conferred regarding application of the production of electronically stored information ("ESI") set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Southern District of New York, to this case; WHEREAS, the Parties have reached agreement on certain of the issues discussed regarding such discovery and have entered into this Stipulation and Order Concerning Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("Stipulation and Order"). WHEREAS, the Parties have entered into this Stipulation and Order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive conduct of discovery involving ESI and to promote, to the fullest extent possible, the resolution of disputes regarding the discovery of ESI without Court intervention; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 5/13/2020) (va)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 5/13/2020) (va)
May 13, 2020 Filing 225 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Proposed Production Protocol, #2 Exhibit 2 - Revised Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redline of Proposed Production Protocol, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redline of Proposed Protective Order).(Arbeit, Bryan)
May 8, 2020 Filing 224 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated May 8, 2020 re: Defendant Harvey Weinstein's May 7, 2020 Letter Requesting Reconsideration or Clarification of the Court's February 12, 2020 Order. Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
May 7, 2020 Filing 223 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 05/07/2020 re: Request and/or Clarification and Limitation of Scope of February 12, 2020 Order. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the telephone conference shall be held in the above captioned action on May 8, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and, thereafter, enter access code 4862532. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 5/6/2020) (va)
May 5, 2020 Filing 221 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Production Protocol).(Arbeit, Bryan)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #219 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for defendant Harvey Weinstein to Answer Interrogatories. Answer to Interrogatories due by 5/15/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 219 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery from 3/23/20 to 5/15/20 addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 03/23/2020. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #217 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadlines proposed by the parties in the letter appearing at Docket Entry No.217 are adopted by the Court and will govern the parties' pretrial discovery activities. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 217 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated March 18, 2020. Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #211 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Harvey Weinstein shall answer the plaintiff's interrogatories on or before March 23, 2020. No additional application of this ilk will be entertained by the Court. This resolves Docket Entry No. 211. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 3/6/2020) (va)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HARVEY WEINSTEIN: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, that Aidala, Bertuna & Kamins, PC shall be substituted in the place and stead of Nesenoff & Miltenberg, LLP as counsel of record for defendant Harvey Weinstein in the above-captioned matter. Defendant enters into this substitution of counsel knowingly and voluntarily. Attorney Imran H. Ansari for Harvey Weinstein added. Attorney Philip Arwood Byler terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/4/2020) (mro)
March 3, 2020 Filing 214 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Byler, Philip)
March 2, 2020 Filing 213 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
March 2, 2020 Filing 212 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated March 2, 2020 re: #211 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated February 28, 2020. . Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 211 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated February 28, 2020. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Miltenberg, Andrew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #208 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Answer to Interrogatories due by 2/28/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 209 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated February 20, 2020 re: #208 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated February 20, 2020. . Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 208 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated February 20, 2020. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Byler, Philip)
February 14, 2020 Filing 207 ANSWER to #161 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Byler, Philip)
February 14, 2020 Filing 206 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Karen Bitar dated February 14, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C...(Bitar, Karen)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #200 Letter Motion for Discovery. On or before February 20, 2020, defendant Harvey Weinstein ("Weinstein") shall respond to the plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories without asserting objections, as objections have been waived perforce of his unjustified failure to respond to the plaintiff's discovery demands timely. Weinstein's request for a stay, Docket Entry No. 203, which rehashes arguments that have been rejected previously, is denied. The docket sheet maintained by the Clerk of Court for this action does not reflect Weinstein's answer to the plaintiff's third amended complaint. Weinstein shall file his answer on or before February 14, 2020. Weinstein's failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including contempt of court, for disobeying a court order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
February 10, 2020 Filing 204 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated February 10, 2020 re: #200 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Concerning Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Failure to Respond to Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Wedil David..(Arbeit, Bryan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 203 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Philip A. Byler, Esq. dated February 7, 2020 re: #200 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Concerning Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Failure to Respond to Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Conference Order, #2 Exhibit 2-Canosa 12.12 Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3-Canosa 12.13 Order).(Byler, Philip)
February 7, 2020 Filing 202 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Arwood Byler on behalf of Harvey Weinstein..(Byler, Philip)
February 7, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Miltenberg on behalf of Harvey Weinstein..(Miltenberg, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox: A Telephone Conference was held on 2/4/2020. (Midwood, Laura)
February 4, 2020 Filing 200 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Concerning Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Failure to Respond to Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated February 4, 2020. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1.31.20 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Canosa v. Weinstein, et al. Order).(Arbeit, Bryan)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the telephone conference previously scheduled in the above-captioned action for February 4, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. shall be held on that date at 5:00 p.m. Counsel are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and, thereafter, enter access code 4862532. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 1/7/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (ks)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 OPINION & ORDER: re: #167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. filed by Robert Weinstein, #164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaint. filed by Harvey Weinstein. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Harvey Weinstein's motion to dismiss is denied, and Defendant Robert Weinstein's motion to dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs claims for sexual battery, gender violence, battery, assault, sex trafficking, negligence, and negligent retention or supervision will proceed against Harvey Weinstein, The Weinstein Company LLC, and The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 164 and 167. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/19/2019) (ks) Party Robert Weinstein terminated. Modified on 1/15/2020 (ks).
December 11, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 11/6/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 11/6/2019 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HARVEY WEINSTEIN: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, that Nesenoff & Miltenberg, LLP shall be substituted in the place and stead of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP as counsel of record for defendant Harvey Weinstein in the above-captioned matter. Defendant enters into this substitution of counsel knowingly and voluntarily. SO ORDERED. Attorney Elior Daniel Shiloh terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/26/2019) (jca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 194 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying #189 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court has considered the parties' respective letters Docket Entry Nos. 188, 189, 190 and 191 and has determined that a conference is not needed. The application by defendant Harvey Weinstein for a stay of the proceedings from December 1, 2019, through April 1, 2020, is denied. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #188 Letter Motion. The proposed scheduling order, Docket Entry No. 188-1, is adopted by the Court and will govern the parties' pretrial activities. A telephonic status conference will be held with the parties on February 4, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 4862532. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 191 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated November 13, 2019 re: #189 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Discovery) addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Elior D. Shiloh dated November 12, 2019. . Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from April 4, 2019 Oral Argument Transcript)(Arbeit, Bryan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 190 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. dated November 12, 2019 re: Discovery. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- November 12, 2019 Email)(Maatman, Gerald)
November 12, 2019 Filing 189 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Discovery) addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Elior D. Shiloh dated November 12, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiloh, Elior)
November 12, 2019 Filing 188 LETTER MOTION for Discovery and Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Bryan L. Arbeit dated November 12, 2019. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Arbeit, Bryan)
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Oral Argument held on 11/6/2019 re: #167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Robert Weinstein, #164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaintfiled by Harvey Weinstein. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: The parties shall confer, as contemplated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and, thereafter, submit to the Court, on or before November 12, 2019, a proposed scheduling order that will govern their pretrial activities. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 10/24/2019) (ks)
October 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox: A Telephone Conference was held on 10/22/2019. (Midwood, Laura)
October 18, 2019 Filing 186 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Douglas H. Wigdor dated October 18, 2019 re: Ordering Defendant Harvey Weinstein to Participate in a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Wedil David.(Wigdor, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephone conference shall be held in the above-captioned action on October 22, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel are directed to call (888) 363-4749 and, thereafter, enter access code 7185839#. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 10/18/2019) ( Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (ks)
October 18, 2019 Filing 184 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Elior D. Shiloh dated October 18, 2019 re: discovery. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
September 17, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simi Bhutani on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Bhutani, Simi)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #177 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Discovery shall be stayed as to Defendant Robert Weinstein pending the Court's resolution of his motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. The Court will refer this case, by separate order, to Magistrate Judge Lehrburger for general pretrial purposes with respect to Defendants Harvey Weinstein and The Weinstein Companies. The Court will hold oral argument as to Defendants' motions to dismiss on November 6, 2019 at 4 p.m.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/16/2019) (rj)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) Defendants Harvey Weinstein and the Wenstein Companies. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Motions referred to Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/16/2019) (rj)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 11/6/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (rj)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniiel Fox. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (wb)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger no longer referred to the case. (wb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 180 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior Shiloh dated September 12, 2019 re: Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
September 12, 2019 Filing 179 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gary Stein dated September 12, 2019 re: Response to letter from Plaintiffs counsel, dated September 10, 2019. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 178 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Discovery addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas H. Wigdor dated September 10, 2019. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Excerpt from "She Said: Breaking the Sexual Harassment Story Story That Helped Ignite a Movement Hardcover" (Penguin Press, 1st ed., 2019))(Wigdor, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 177 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gary Stein dated August 19, 2019. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 176 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 175 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
August 12, 2019 Filing 174 ANSWER to #161 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C..(Maatman, Gerald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 173 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lantern Capital LP, Corporate Parent Lantern Entertainment, LLC for The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C.. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C..(Maatman, Gerald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of James Dolan. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, United States 10019, 6464945000. (Rosenberg, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew H. Giger on behalf of James Dolan. New Address: Rosenberg, Giger & Perala P.C., 1330 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 1800, New York, NY, United States 10019, 6464945050. (Giger, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Wedil David. (Wigdor, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Wedil David. (Wigdor, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #163 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #161 Amended Complaint, or otherwise Respond. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC answer due 8/10/2019; The Weinstein Company L.L.C. answer due 8/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/21/2019) (jca)
June 21, 2019 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
June 21, 2019 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Sex Trafficking in the Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
June 19, 2019 Filing 163 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #161 Amended Complaint, or otherwise Respond addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr., Esq. dated June 19, 2019. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order)(Maatman, Gerald)
June 10, 2019 Filing 162 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. dated June 10, 2019 re: Status of Terminating the Bankruptcy Stay. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C..(Maatman, Gerald)
June 6, 2019 Filing 161 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #147 Amended Complaint, against The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wedil David. Related document: #147 Amended Complaint,.(Wigdor, Douglas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 4, 2019 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/4/2019 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Tape Number: 4/4/19. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER terminating #154 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 147 Amended Complaint., Defendant Koenigsberg is directed to the Court's Order at Dkt. 155. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/3/2019) (rj)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: By June 10, 2019, the Weinstein Companies shall inform the Court of their status in seeking leave from the bankruptcy stay with respect to the instant litigation, see Dkt. 141. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/03/2019) (ama)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER terminating #153 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Dolan, Jones, Sarnoff, and Ziff are directed to the Court's Order AT Dkt. 155. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/3/2019) (ne)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #148 Letter filed by Wedil David. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Plaintiff's acknowledgment that the additional allegations against the Director Defendants in it its third amended complaint, with the exception of Robert Weinstein, do not "support a different result on the Director Defendants' motion to dismiss," Plaintiff, by June 7, 2019, shall amend its complaint to remove these defendants. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/31/2019) (ama)
May 31, 2019 Filing 154 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #147 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from John C. Scalzo dated May 31, 2019. Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg.(Scalzo, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 153 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Larry S. Spiegel, James V. Masella, III, Marvin S. Putnam, and John J. Rosenberg dated May 31, 2019. Document filed by Dirk Ziff.(Spiegel, Lawrence)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Harvey Weinstein answer due 6/21/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/29/2019) (rj)
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/22/2019 Replies due by 8/19/2019. (rj)
May 28, 2019 Filing 151 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior Shiloh dated May 28, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #149 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/28/2019) (ks)
May 28, 2019 Filing 149 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (on consent) addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian T. Kohn dated May 28, 2019. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Kohn, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Robert Weinstein answer due 6/21/2019. Responses due by 7/22/2019 Replies due by 8/19/2019. (ks)
May 17, 2019 Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas H. Wigdor dated May 19, 2019 re: Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Wedil David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redline Comparison))(Wigdor, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 147 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #81 Amended Complaint, against Tarak Ben Ammar, James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wedil David. Related document: #81 Amended Complaint,.(Wigdor, Douglas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Harvey Weinstein answer due 5/24/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/10/2019) (rj)
May 9, 2019 Filing 145 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior D. Shiloh dated May 9, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/1/2019) (kv)
April 30, 2019 Filing 143 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #142 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Set Deadlines,,, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas H. Wigdor dated April 30, 2019. Document filed by Wedil David.(Wigdor, Douglas)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION & ORDER re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Richard Koenigsberg, #95 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Robert Weinstein, #93 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, #100 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Jeff Sackman, Lance Maerov, #98 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by James Dolan., For the foregoing reasons, the Director Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted without prejudice. If Plaintiff chooses to amend her second amended complaint, and has a good faith basis to do so, she shall submit the third amended complaint by May 3, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 93, 95, 98, 100, and 102. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/24/2019) (rj)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #140 Letter, filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: No later than May 1, 2019, TWC shall seek leave from the automatic bankruptcy stay. TWC shall promptly inform the Court of the bankruptcy court's decision on this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/24/2019) (jca)
April 23, 2019 Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. dated April 23rd, 2019 re: TWC's position with respect to the lifting of the bankruptcy stay. Document filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C..(Maatman, Gerald)
April 23, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Yasmine Bitar on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C.. (Bitar, Karen)
April 23, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr on behalf of The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C.. (Maatman, Gerald)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: On April 5, 2019, the Weinstein Companies were Ordered to inform the Court, by April 12, 2019, whether they object to seeking leave from the bankruptcy stay with respect to the instant litigation. See Dkt. 133. As of April 16, 2019, the Weinstein Companies have not responded to the Court's Order. The Weinstein Companies shall do so by April 23, 2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/16/2019) (jwh)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to amend the docket of this matter by replacing the name "Jane Doe," which is currently used to identify Plaintiff, with "Wedil David." SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/16/2019) (jca)
April 12, 2019 Filing 135 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kevin Mintzer dated April 12, 2019 re: Court's inquiry re plaintiff's anonymous status. Document filed by "Jane" Doe.(Mintzer, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: re: #86 Notice (Other) filed by Harvey Weinstein. For the reasons stated on the record at yesterday's conference, Defendant Harvey Weinstein's motion to stay pending the resolution of related criminal proceedings, see Dkt. 86, is denied, without prejudice, as overly broad. Defendant Weinstein may identify particular aspects of the instant action (e.g., depositions, interrogatories, etc.) that he believes will unduly burden the exercise of his Fifth Amendment rights, and the Court will then determine whether to stay these aspects of the litigation. Defendant Weinstein shall have until May 10, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. 86. SO ORDERED., Harvey Weinstein answer due 5/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/5/2019) (rj)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: The Court understands that, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a)(1), all pending civil litigation brought against the Weinstein Company LLC and the Weinstein Company Holdings LLC (the "Companies") is automatically stayed by virtue of the bankruptcy proceeding currently pending before the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. By April 12, 2019, the Companies shall inform the Court whether they object to seeking leave from this stay with respect to the instant litigation. If the Companies have any such objections, they shall distinguish this case from Canosa v. Ziff, et al., 18-cv-04115, where the Bankruptcy Court agreed to lift the stay with respect to that action, see Canosa, Dkt. 71. If the Companies have no such objections, by April 19, 2019, they shall request the Bankruptcy Court enter an order lifting the stay with respect to the instant litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/5/2019) (rj)
April 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Oral Argument held on 4/4/2019 re: #86 Notice (Other) filed by Harvey Weinstein, #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Richard Koenigsberg, #95 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Robert Weinstein, #93 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, #100 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Jeff Sackman, Lance Maerov, #97 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian T. Kohn dated November 15, 2018. filed by Robert Weinstein, #98 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by James Dolan. (Court Reporter Steven Griffing) (arc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #129 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-reply Addressing the Motion to Dismiss Decision in Canosa v. Weinstein, No. 18-cv-04115(PAE) (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 28, 2019) addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bryan L. Arbeit dated March 4, 2019., #95 MOTION to Dismiss ., #93 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #98 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiff's Sur-reply Addressing the Motion to Dismiss Decision in Canosa v. Ziff et al., No. 18-cv-04115 (PAE), 2019 WL 498865 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 28, 2019). Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Wigdor, Douglas)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #129 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/5/2019) (jwh)
March 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 3/13/2019. (jwh)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #126 Letter Motion for Oral Argument: Application Granted. On April 4, 2019, oral argument shall take place in this case on the pending motions to dismiss and the motion to stay this action: See Dkt. 118. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/4/2019) (jwh) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jwh).
March 4, 2019 Filing 129 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-reply Addressing the Motion to Dismiss Decision in Canosa v. Weinstein, No. 18-cv-04115(PAE) (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 28, 2019) addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bryan L. Arbeit dated March 4, 2019. Document filed by "Jane" Doe.(Arbeit, Bryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 127 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. . Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 126 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Matthew H. Giger dated March 1, 2019. Document filed by James Dolan.(Giger, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 125 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by James Dolan. (Giger, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 124 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman. (David, Israel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 123 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, Dirk Ziff. (Masella, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alejandro Hari Cruz on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Cruz, Alejandro)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Laura Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/28/2019) (ks)
February 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #120 MOTION for Laura Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16414267. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION for Laura Washington to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16414267. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Laura Washington, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Laura)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED ORDER: The conference in this case scheduled for March 15, 2019 is hereby rescheduled for Thursday, April 4, 2019, at 4 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on February 20, 2019) (arc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: The conference in this case scheduled for March 15, 2019 is hereby rescheduled for Wednesday, April 4, 2019, at 4 p.m. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/19/2019) (ama)
January 11, 2019 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Douglas H. Wigdor in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #95 MOTION to Dismiss ., #93 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #98 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Employment Agreement)(Wigdor, Douglas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #95 MOTION to Dismiss ., #93 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #98 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Wigdor, Douglas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Benjamin Brafman in Support re: #86 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
January 7, 2019 Filing 114 BRIEF re: #86 Notice (Other) Reply in Support of Motion to Stay. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application Granted. So Ordered. Replies due by 1/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/4/2019) (js)
January 4, 2019 Filing 112 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior D. Shiloh dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application Granted. The court conference scheduled for February 12, 2019 is hereby adjourned and rescheduled for March 15, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. At the conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the pending motions to dismiss and the motion to stay this action. Discovery in this case shall be stayed pending resolution of these matters. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/19/2018) (rj)
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (rj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 110 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #95 MOTION to Dismiss ., #93 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #98 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bryan L. Arbeit dated December 18, 2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe.(Arbeit, Bryan)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #108 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 17, 2018. APPLICATION GRANTED. Replies due by 1/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/18/2018) (rj)
December 17, 2018 Filing 108 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior D. Shiloh dated December 17, 2018. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
December 12, 2018 Filing 107 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #86 Notice (Other) Motion to Stay. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas H. Wigdor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Wigdor, Douglas)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application Granted. Plaintiffs opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due by December 21, 2018, and any replies by Defendants shall be due by January 25, 2019. The conference scheduled for January 8, 2019 is hereby adjourned and rescheduled for February 12, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. At this conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the pending motions to dismiss and the motion to stay this action. Discovery in this case shall be stayed pending resolution of these motions. re #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #98 MOTION to Dismiss . #93 MOTION to Dismiss . #95 MOTION to Dismiss . #100 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/21/2018 Replies due by 1/25/2019.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/27/2018) (js)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (js)
November 21, 2018 Filing 105 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., #95 MOTION to Dismiss ., #93 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #98 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kevin Mintzer dated November 21, 2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe.(Mintzer, Kevin)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Richard Koenigsberg, #95 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Robert Weinstein, #93 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Dirk Ziff, Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, #100 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Jeff Sackman, Lance Maerov, #98 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by James Dolan. All parties in this case shall appear for a conference before the Court on January 8, 2019, at 10 a.m., in Courtroom 1506 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. At this conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the pending motions to dismiss and the motion to stay this action. Discovery in this case shall be stayed pending resolution of these motions, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/16/2018) (jca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. . Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Richard Koenigsberg.(Scalzo, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman. (David, Israel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman.(David, Israel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by James Dolan. (Giger, Matthew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by James Dolan.(Giger, Matthew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 97 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian T. Kohn dated November 15, 2018. Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Kohn, Brian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #95 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Robert Weinstein.(Stein, Gary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, Dirk Ziff. (Masella, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Paul Tudor Jones, Tim Sarnoff, Dirk Ziff.(Masella, James)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: On November 14, 2018, Defendant filed a motion to stay this action pending the resolution of related criminal proceedings. If Plaintiff opposes this motion, Plaintiff shall file opposition papers no later than December 12, 2018. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be due December 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/12/2018, Replies due by 12/21/2018.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/15/2018) (jca)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/15/2018) (jca)
November 14, 2018 Filing 90 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Elior D. Shiloh dated November 14, 2018. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein.(Shiloh, Elior)
November 14, 2018 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #86 Notice (Other) . Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 14, 2018 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Benjamin Brafman in Support re: #86 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 14, 2018 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Elior D. Shiloh in Support re: #86 Notice (Other). Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 14, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of of Motion to Stay Action. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
November 13, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of James Dolan. (Rosenberg, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew H. Giger on behalf of James Dolan. (Giger, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Elizabeth Davis on behalf of Dirk Ziff. (Davis, Abigail)
November 13, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Steve Spiegel on behalf of Dirk Ziff. (Spiegel, Lawrence)
October 17, 2018 Filing 81 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #77 Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint, against Tarak Ben Ammar, James Dolan, Paul Tudor Jones, Richard Koenigsberg, Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman, Tim Sarnoff, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company L.L.C., Harvey Weinstein, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Related document: #77 Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint,.(Wigdor, Douglas)
October 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Douglas Holden Wigdor to RE-FILE Document No. #77 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carly Jeanine Halpin on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Halpin, Carly)
October 16, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Theodore Kohn on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Kohn, Brian)
October 16, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Stein on behalf of Robert Weinstein. (Stein, Gary)
October 16, 2018 Filing 77 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Amended Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Related document: Amended Complaint,.(Wigdor, Douglas) Modified on 10/17/2018 (pc).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's unopposed motion to amend the complaint and hereby grants it in the interests of justice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint no later than October 22, 2018. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 64. SO ORDERED. Granting #64 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/15/2018) (rjm)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2018. (rjm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to the Southern District of New York Local Rule 1.4, that Wigdor LLP and The Law Office of Kevin Mintzer, P.C. hereby are substituted as counsel of record in the above captioned case for Plaintiff Jane Doe in place of the law firms Allred Maroko & Goldberg and Cuti Hecker Wang, LLP. This order of substitution is presented with the consent of Plaintiff and the withdrawing firms are not asserting a charging or retaining lien. SO ORDERED. Attorney Nathan Goldberg; Eric J. Hecker; Marcus John Spiegel; Gloria Rachel Allred and Christina Cheung terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/10/2018) (rj)
October 9, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Louis Arbeit on behalf of "Jane" Doe. (Arbeit, Bryan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Holden Wigdor on behalf of "Jane" Doe. (Wigdor, Douglas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Todd Mintzer on behalf of "Jane" Doe. (Mintzer, Kevin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 71 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Mintzer Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4) (Mintzer, Kevin)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. All Defendants who have appeared in this action shall have until either (a) 30 days after entry of an order denying the motion to amend, in which case they shall respond to the First Amended Complaint, or (b) 30 days after the filing of a Second Amended Complaint ("SAC"), in the event the Court enters an order granting the filing of a SAC, to answer or otherwise respond to the operative pleading. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/30/2018) (ne)
August 30, 2018 Filing 69 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time adjusting deadline to respond to operative complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James V. Masella, III dated August 30, 2018. Document filed by Paul Tudor Jones.(Masella, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order (Doc. No. 67) served on Defendants, Robert Weinstein, Dirk Ziff, and James Dolan on 8/16/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Court Order (Doc. No. 67))(Spiegel, Marcus)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Any Defendant that opposes Plaintiff's motion shall file opposition papers no later than September 14, 2018. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be due September 28, 2018. Plaintiff is ordered to serve any Defendants that have not yet appeared on ECF with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated no later than September 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 9/14/2018. Replies due by 9/28/2018.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/15/2018) (anc)
August 15, 2018 Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Related Document Number: #64 . (Spiegel, Marcus) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 15, 2018 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Marcus Spiegel in Support re: #64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-SAC, #2 Exhibit 2-Orig. Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-FAC, #4 Exhibit 4-Answer TWCs, #5 Exhibit 5-Answer-HW, #6 Exhibit 6-Amendments to Complaint)(Spiegel, Marcus)
August 15, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by "Jane" Doe.(Spiegel, Marcus)
August 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marcus John Spiegel to RE-FILE Document #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
August 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #66 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DAVID GLASSER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a), this action shall be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant David Glasser only, and without costs to either party against the other. IT IS SO ORDERED., David Glasser (formerly Doe 3) terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/03/2018) (ama)
August 2, 2018 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcus Spiegel, #2 Exhibit 1-SAC, #3 Exhibit 2-Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3-FAC, #5 Exhibit 4-TWC's Answer, #6 Exhibit 5-HW's Answer, #7 Exhibit 6-Amendments to Complaint, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus) Modified on 8/15/2018 (ldi).
August 2, 2018 Filing 61 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) David Glasser and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #61 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. Stipulation and Order needs to have Judge's signature. (km)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL DEFENDANT MARC LASRY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a), this action shall be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant Marc Lasry only, and without costs to either party as against the other. IT IS SO ORDERED. Marc Lasry (formerly Doe 8) terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/1/2018) (rj)
August 1, 2018 Filing 59 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Marc Lasry and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
August 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #59 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. Stipulation and proposed order needs to have Judge's signature. (km)
July 31, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rae Ginsberg on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Ginsberg, Melissa)
July 31, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Vincent Masella, III on behalf of Paul Tudor Jones. (Masella, James)
July 31, 2018 Filing 56 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the July 25, 2018 Summons issued by SDNY, French Translated copy of the July 25, 2018 Summons issued by SDNY, The Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed on January 2, 2018, French Translated copy of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed on January 2, 2018, Copy of the Doe Amendment filed on March 19, 2018, French Translated copy of the Doe Amendment filed on March 19, 2018, Copy of the July 23, 2018 Endorsed Letter to the Court re: Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tarak Ben Ammar, French Translated copy of the July 23, 2018 Endorsed letter to the Court re: Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tarak Ben Ammar, Certificate of Translation mailed to Tarak Ben Ammar, 8 Villa Montmorency Auteuil, Paris 16 E France on July 31, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772841647141, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (jca)
July 30, 2018 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tarak Ben Ammar. (laq)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter regarding Request for Issuance of Summons as to Defendant, Tarak Ben Ammar, filed by "Jane" Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has instructed the Clerk of the Court to issue a summons as requested in this letter. When Plaintiff serves Tarak Ben Ammar with the summons and State Court FAC, she is further ordered to serve him with the amendment filed at Dkt. 1-8, which added Tarak Ben Ammar's name to the FAC, and to serve him with a copy of this Endorsed Letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/25/2018) (rj)
July 25, 2018 Transmission to the Case Openings Clerk. Transmitted re: #54 Memo Endorsement, to the Case Openings Clerk for case processing. (rj)
July 25, 2018 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tarak Ben Ammar. (pne)
July 23, 2018 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marcus Spiegel dated 7/23/2018 re: Request for Issuance of Summons as to Defendant, Tarak Ben Ammar. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-FAC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 20, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel David on behalf of Lance Maerov, Jeff Sackman. (David, Israel)
July 19, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Christian Scalzo on behalf of Richard Koenigsberg. (Scalzo, John)
July 19, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Peter Gordon on behalf of Richard Koenigsberg. (Gordon, Jonathan)
July 18, 2018 Filing 48 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tarak Ben Ammar, re: Amended Complaint,, Amended Complaint,. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Spiegel, Marcus) Modified on 7/20/2018 (vf). Modified on 7/25/2018 (pne).
July 18, 2018 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lance Maerov waiver sent on 7/16/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 18, 2018 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeff Sackman waiver sent on 7/16/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 18, 2018 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Dolan waiver sent on 7/13/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 18, 2018 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dirk Ziff waiver sent on 7/13/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 17, 2018 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Weinstein waiver sent on 7/13/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 17, 2018 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tarak Ben Ammar, re: Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Spiegel, Marcus) Modified on 7/18/2018 (dnh). Modified on 7/30/2018 (laq).
July 16, 2018 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard Koenigsberg waiver sent on 7/12/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 16, 2018 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Tudor Jones waiver sent on 7/12/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Marcus J. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie)
July 16, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eric J. Hecker to RE-FILE Document No. #37 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request is not linked to a document. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 13, 2018 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tarak Ben Ammar, re: Amended Complaint,, Amended Complaint,. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Hecker, Eric) Modified on 7/16/2018 (vf).
July 13, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric J. Hecker on behalf of "Jane" Doe. (Hecker, Eric)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION & ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby STIPULATED AND AGREED between and among counsel for plaintiff and defendants Sarnoff and Glasser as follows: Plaintiff shall move for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before August 3, 2018; Defendants Sarnoff's and Glasser's time to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is adjourned until: (a) 30 days after entry of an order denying the motion to amend, in which case they shall respond to the FAC; or (b) 30 days after the filing of a Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") in the event the Court enters an order granting the filing of a SAC. IT IS SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 8/3/2018.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/11/2018) (ama)
July 11, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 18cv4115 and declined by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
July 11, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 18cv4857 and declined by Judge Alvin K Hellerstein and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
July 11, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 17cv9554 and declined by Judge Alvin K Hellerstein and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
July 11, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
July 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
July 6, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Marcus J. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15291192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Spiegel, Marcus)
July 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Marcus J. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15291192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 26, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 18cv4115. (pc)
June 21, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Pete on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Pete, Brian)
June 21, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elior Daniel Shiloh on behalf of Harvey Weinstein. (Shiloh, Elior)
June 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15215353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 18, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Joshua G. Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15215353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua G. Hamilton, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Joshua)
June 15, 2018 Filing 30 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-04115 (PAE). Document filed by Tim Sarnoff.(Putnam, Marvin)
June 15, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marvin S. Putnam on behalf of Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin)
June 15, 2018 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:18-cv-03725. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 15, 2018 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:17-cv-9554. (sjo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT TIM SARNOFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1412 #17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Hamilton, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to stipulation the scheduling conference is continued to July 30, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 25, 2018 to July 30, 2018 filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Rose Nunez counsel for Defendant The Weinstein Company LLC. Filed by defendant The Weinstein Company LLC. (Attorney Jennifer Rose Nunez added to party The Weinstein Company LLC(pty:dft))(Nunez, Jennifer) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER TAKING HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO USDC SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK #17 OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for June 18, 2018, is vacated and taken off calendar. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT TIM SARNOFF'S TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #20 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Tim Sarnoff's deadline to respond to plaintiff Jane Doe's First Amended Complaint is extended to July 16, 2018. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York #17 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Cheung, Christina) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York #17 filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Proposed Order)(Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina Cheung counsel for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Adding Marcus J. Spiegel as counsel of record for Plaintiff Jane Doe for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Cheung, Christina) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil)(Cheung, Christina) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Joint Rule 26(f) Meeting Report is due 6/11/2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. Notice of Supplementing State Court File for Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Dolan Amendment to First Amended Complaint)(Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT TIM SARNOFF'S TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Tim Sarnoff's deadline to respond to plaintiff Jane Doe's First Amended Complaint is extended to June 11, 2018. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 7, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant James Dolan amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 11 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be James Dolan. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted Attached to Notice of Supplementing State Court File for Notice of Removal Doc. #13 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L Maatman, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Lance Maerov amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Lance Maerov. Filed in State Curt on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit E Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant David Glasser amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Tim Sarnoff. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit F Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Richard Koenigsberg amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 4 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Richard Koenigsberg. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit G Attachment 7 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Robert Weinstein amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Robert Weinstein. Filed in State Curt on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit D Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company LLC, Harvey Weinstein. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Filed in State Court on 11/14/2017 Submitted with Exhibit M attachment 13 to notice of removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Tarak Ben Ammar amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 5 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Tarak Ben Ammar. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit H Attachment 8 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC, The Weinstein Company LLC, Harvey Weinstein amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Filed in State Court on 1/2/2018 Submitted with Exhibit B attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Tim Sarnoff amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 7 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Tim Sarnoff. Filed in State Curt on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit C Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC served on 11/17/2017, answer due 12/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares, clerk authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/29/2017 and submitted with Exhibit M Attachment 13 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Dirk Ziff amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 6 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Dirk Ziff. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit I Attachment 9 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant Harvey Weinstein. Filed in State Court on 1/16/2018 Submitted with Exhibit M Attachment 13 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF DEFENDANTS THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY, LLC and THE WEINSTEIN COMPANY HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed in State Court on 2/1/2018 Submitted as Exhibit M Attachment 13 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant The Weinstein Company LLC served on 11/17/2017, answer due 12/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Peck Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/29/2017 Submitted as Exhibit M Attachment 13 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Paul Tudor Jones amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 9 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Paul Tudor Jones. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit K Attachment 11 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Jeff Sackman amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 10 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Jeff Sackman. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit L Attachment 12 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Marc Lasry amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 8 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Marc Lasry. Filed in State Court on 3/19/18 Submitted as Exhibit J Attachment 10 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 5/4/2018 (car). [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , Notice (Other) #4 served on May 3, 2018. (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua G Hamilton counsel for Defendant Tim Sarnoff. Adding Joshua G. Hamilton as counsel of record for Tim Sarnoff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attorney Joshua G Hamilton added to party Tim Sarnoff(pty:dft))(Hamilton, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marvin S Putnam counsel for Defendant Tim Sarnoff. Adding Marvin S. Putnam as counsel of record for Tim Sarnoff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff, (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number BC683411 Receipt No: 0973-21693804 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Tim Sarnoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Sarnoff Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Weinstein Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Maerov Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Glasser Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Koenigsberg Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - Ben Ammar Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Ziff Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit J - Lasry Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit K - Jones Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit L - Sackman Amendment to First Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit M - State Court File) (Attorney Marvin S Putnam added to party Tim Sarnoff(pty:dft))(Putnam, Marvin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedil David v. The Weinstein Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Weinstein
Represented By: Carly Jeanine Halpin
Represented By: Gary Stein
Represented By: Brian Theodore Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Maerov
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Ziff
Represented By: Abigail Elizabeth Davis
Represented By: Lawrence Steve Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarak Ben Ammar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weinstein Company L.L.C.
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Jennifer Rose Nunez
Represented By: Laura Wilson Shelby
Represented By: Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr
Represented By: Karen Yasmine Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Lasry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Koenigsberg
Represented By: Jonathan Peter Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Scalzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sackman
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dolan
Represented By: Matthew H. Giger
Represented By: John Jacob Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sarnoff
Represented By: Joshua Garrett Hamilton
Represented By: Marvin S. Putnam
Represented By: Marvin S Putnam
Represented By: Laura R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 12 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Represented By: John L Barber
Represented By: Kelsey Elizabeth Scherr
Represented By: Imran H. Ansari
Represented By: Simi Bhutani
Represented By: Elior Daniel Shiloh
Represented By: Brian Pete
Represented By: Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Represented By: Philip Arwood Byler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Laura Wilson Shelby
Represented By: Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr
Represented By: Karen Yasmine Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tudor Jones
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Represented By: James Vincent Masella, III
Represented By: Alejandro Hari Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Officer "Jane" Doe
Represented By: Marcus John Spiegel
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Christina Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wedil David
Represented By: Gloria Rachel Allred
Represented By: Kevin Todd Mintzer
Represented By: Bryan Louis Arbeit
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Christina Cheung
Represented By: Marcus John Spiegel
Represented By: Eric J. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?