Sankara v. Martuscello

Petitioner: Ahmadou Sankara
Respondent: Daniel F. Martuscello, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06308
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 12, 2018 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Northern; Case Number: 9:18-cv-00699. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 6, 2018 7 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 1. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York; 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to electronically transfer this action to the Clerk of the Southern District of New York; 3. The Court hereby waives the fourteen (14) day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/5/18. (served on petitioner by regular mail)(alh, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 5, 2018 6 Letter from Ahmadou Sankara dated 7/1/18 in further support of his claim. (alh, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 27, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge David N. Hurd on 6/27/18. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 27, 2018 4 Submission in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ahmadou Sankara. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 27, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ahmadou Sankara. (nas, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 15, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 6/15/18. (served on petitioner with form by regular mail)(alh, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 14, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ahmadou Sankara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits and Copy of State Court Papers, #2 Envelope)(alh, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sankara v. Martuscello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel F. Martuscello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ahmadou Sankara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?