Angel Basurto et al v. Superruay Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Hugo Neri De Jesus and Jose Luis Angel Basurto
Defendant: Nirun Noree, Khao Doe, Ratchanee Sumpatboon and Superruay Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06368
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/9/2018.(mf)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/4/2018. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/3/16) (mf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Move until September 28 2018. Document filed by Nirun Noree, Ratchanee Sumpatboon, Superruay Corp.. (Halsband, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Seth Halsband on behalf of Nirun Noree, Ratchanee Sumpatboon, Superruay Corp.. (Halsband, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Superruay Corp. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually); Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Khao Doe served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Service was accepted by Mr. Kim, Co-Worker. Document filed by Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually); Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ratchanee Sumpatboon served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Service was accepted by Mr. Kim, Co-Worker. Document filed by Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually); Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Nirun Noree served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Service was accepted by Mr. Kim, Co-Worker. Document filed by Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually); Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually); Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Khao Doe. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nirun Noree. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ratchanee Sumpatboon. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Superruay Corp.. (dnh)
July 18, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Khao Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nirun Noree, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ratchanee Sumpatboon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Superruay Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Haleigh Amant on behalf of Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually). (Amant, Haleigh)
July 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 16, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Khao Doe, Nirun Noree, Ratchanee Sumpatboon, Superruay Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15319882)Document filed by Hugo Neri De Jesus(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(Individually), Hugo Neri De Jesus(Individually), Jose Luis Angel Basurto(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel Basurto et al v. Superruay Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Neri De Jesus
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Angel Basurto
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirun Noree
Represented By: David Seth Halsband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khao Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratchanee Sumpatboon
Represented By: David Seth Halsband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superruay Corp.
Represented By: David Seth Halsband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?