Harris v. Metlife Securities Inc. et al
Petitioner: Eric Harris
Respondent: Metlife Securities Inc., FINRA - Financial Regulatory Authority, MSI Financial Services, Inc. and FINRA
Case Number: 1:2018cv06412
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Summary Judgment served on Metlife, MSI, FINRA on 8/13/2018. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
August 13, 2018 Filing 23 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
August 13, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Brittany Weiner in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Uniform Submission Agreements, #2 Exhibit Executed Award, #3 Exhibit Stipulations)(Weiner, Brittany)
August 13, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Petitioner Harris)(Weiner, Brittany)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Eric Harris. Responses due by 9/6/2018(Weiner, Brittany)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that petitioner shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which it intends to support the petition, including any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits to the petition are true and correct copies of what they purport to be, no later than August 23, 2018. Petitioner is further ordered to submit a supplemental memorandum of law in support of its petition no later than August 23, 2018. Respondents' opposition is due by September 6, 2018. Petitioner's reply, if any, is due by September 13, 2018. Petitioner is directed to serve the petition and supporting materials upon respondents by August 16, 2018 and to file an affidavit of such service with the Court by August 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/8/2018) (anc)
August 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (anc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
August 6, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. FINRA served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE OF CSC. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 23, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. MSI Financial Services, Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018; Metlife Securities Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation re: no opposition)(Weiner, Brittany)
July 20, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSI Financial Services, Inc.. (dnh)
July 20, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metlife Securities Inc.. (dnh)
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FINRA. (dnh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSI Financial Services Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FINRA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the caption on the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; when using 'et al' list the leading party name as it reads on the pleading followed by 'et al' (Metlife Securities Inc., et al ). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 17, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FINRA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/18/2018 (dnh).
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSI Financial Services Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/18/2018 (dnh).
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/18/2018 (dnh).
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiner, Brittany)
July 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
July 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The party information for the following party has been modified: FINRA. The information for the party has been modified for the following reason: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: no name or address entered for plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne).
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSI Financial Services Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne).
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FINRA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne).
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15327777).Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MOL in support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney Weiner, #3 Exhibit Executed Award)(Weiner, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Metlife Securities Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Metlife Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FINRA - Financial Regulatory Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MSI Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FINRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Harris
Represented By: Brittany Sloane Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?