N.T.C. et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: H.M.C. and N.T.C.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex Azar, Ronald Vitiello, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Scott Lloyd, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv06428
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/17/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 23, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/17/2018 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 19, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Southern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:18-cv-01626, filed on 07/19/2018. (sjo)
July 19, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of California (rjm)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 1404(a), the Court transfers this case to the Southern District of California. See, e.g., Contl Grain Co. v. The Barge FBL-585, 364 U.S. 19, 26 (1960) ("To permit a situation in which two cases involving precisely the same issues are simultaneously pending in different District Courts leads to the wastefulness of time, energy and money that 1404(a) was designed to prevent."); Wyndham Assocs. v. Bintliff, 398 F.2d 614, 619 (2d Cir. 1968) (recognizing a "strong policy favoring the litigation of related claims in the same tribunal"); Stroud Prods. & Enters. v. Castle Rock Entm't, No. 07-CV-8638 (HB), 2009 WL 2391676, at *3 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 4, 2009) ("[T]rial efficiency and the interests of justice weigh heavily in favor of litigating all related causes of action... in a single forum." (citation omitted)). Further, to preserve the status quo, the temporary relief granted by this Court on July 17, 2018, (Docket No. 9), is extended to give Judge Sabraw an opportunity to consider Plaintiffs request for broader emergency relief. The parties should promptly present those issues to Judge Sabraw so that he can decide whether to maintain, modify, or vacate the order granting temporary relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California, to be assigned to Judge Sabraw. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer immediately, notwithstanding Local Rule 83.1, and then to close the case in this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/19/2018) (rjm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by N.T.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Martinez Declaration, #2 Exhibit Holtzman Declaration, #3 Exhibit Murphy Declaration, #4 Exhibit Krause Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hoffman Declaration, #6 Exhibit Zambrano Declaration, #7 Exhibit Seperated Parent's Removal Form, #8 Exhibit Fores Settlement)(Gillman, Sarah)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #17 Letter filed by N.T.C. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file redacted versions of the documents at issue. (Indeed, the redactions are mandated by Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/18/2018) (Furman, Jesse) (ab).
July 18, 2018 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sarah T. Gillman dated 07/18/2018 re: ECF 13 Order. Document filed by N.T.C..(Gillman, Sarah)
July 18, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Brandon M. Waterman dated July 18, 2018 re: Corrected Government Letter. Document filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Government Letter, #2 Election Form (i.e., Notice of Potential Rights))(Waterman, Brandon)
July 18, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Brandon M. Waterman dated July 18, 2018 re: The government's response to the Court's request for additional information. Document filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 7/17/18 Conference Transcript)(Waterman, Brandon)
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gregory P. Copeland dated July 18, 2018 re: ECF No. 11 Order. Document filed by H.M.C., N.T.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Flores Settlement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, Commander White Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, Ms. L Order re on Notice, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, Ms L July 13 Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, Separated Parent's Removal Form, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, Ms. L Notice of Potential Rights, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, Reunification Form)(Copeland, Gregory)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To ensure that the record in this case is complete, Plaintiffs shall, no later than July 19, 2018, file on ECF electronic versions of their application for emergency relief and supporting materials. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/18/2018) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Byars, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Show Cause Hearing re TRO held on 7/17/2018. Gregory Copeland, Sarah Gillman, and Jennifer Levy present for Plaintiffs. Brandon Waterman and Michael Byars present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ab)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: In the letters to be filed tomorrow, the parties should also address the following questions: (1) whether there would be any impediment, legal or practical, to the Plaintiffs' intervening in the Ms. L litigation in the Southern District of California (and, in the Government's case, whether it would consent to Plaintiffs' intervention in the Ms. L litigation); (2) in the alternative, whether this case should be transferred to the Southern District of California to be consolidated with the Ms. L litigation; (3) whether there is any relief that Plaintiffs are seeking here that could not be obtained in the Ms. L litigation if intervention were granted; and (4) whether the order granting temporary relief should be extended (and, if so, for how long) to allow Plaintiffs' to seek intervention and relief in the Ms. L litigation. In addition, Plaintiffs' counsel shall confer with Plaintiffs' counsel in the Ms. L litigation and advise the Court of the latter's views on the questions of intervention or transfer as well. In light of these additional questions to address, the parties are granted until 3 p.m. to file the letters. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/17/2018) (Text Only Order)(Furman, Jesse)
July 17, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Brandon M. Waterman dated July 17, 2018 re: Submission of electronic copies of the documents submitted at today's conference. Document filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Ms. L. conference transcript 7-16-18, #2 Ms. L plaintiffs' motion for a stay of removal and TRO, #3 Ms. L. order granting TRO, #4 Ms. L. status report concerning dueling Notices, #5 Ms. L court-approved current Notice of Potential Rights (English), #6 Ms. L court-approved current Notice of Potential Rights (Spanish))(Waterman, Brandon)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED, that Defendants ARE HEREBY RESTRAINED from taking any action to remove minor children clients of the Legal Aid Society from New York State who are in ORR custody without providing forty-eight (48) hours' advance notice of such forthcoming action to children and their counsel (including, without limitation, the location to which the minor child client will be moved, the location where the child's parent or parents currently reside, and whether the movement is for the purpose of release, detention, and/or repatriation), in order to permit consultation among the child, the child's parent or other close family member(s), and counsel to protect the child's ability to make informed decisions about his or her legal rights and potential claims. It is further ORDERED, that the injunction set forth in the foregoing paragraph is in effect from the time of issuance of this order until 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 19, 2018, subject to extension, other modification or vacatur by further order of the assigned judge. It is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' counsel shall deliver to Defendants' counsel a list of the names of the client children by 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, July 17, 2018, and that, pending such delivery, Defendants shall assume that all minor children in New York in ORR custody who have been forcibly separated from their parents are clients of the Legal Aid Society. It is further ORDERED, that no bond is required. It is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file their Complaint in the office of the Clerk of Court by 9:30 a.m. on Tuesday July 17, 2018, and promptly inform Defendants' counsel of the name of the assigned judge. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain, Part 1, on 7/16/2018) (rro)
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer L. Levy on behalf of H.M.C., N.T.C.. (Levy, Jennifer)
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gregory P. Copeland dated July 17, 2018 re: Transcript of Order to Show Cause Hearing. Document filed by H.M.C., N.T.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTC v ICE OTSC 7.17.18 Transcript)(Copeland, Gregory)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Paul Copeland on behalf of H.M.C., N.T.C.. (Copeland, Gregory)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of N.T.C.. (Gillman, Sarah)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The parties shall appear for a conference with the Court TODAY, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. All counsel who appeared last night before Judge Swain or will appear before this Court shall promptly enter a notice of appearance on ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/17/2018) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Waterman, Brandon)
July 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 7/17/2018. Court Reporter Michael McDaniel present. TRO HEARING held. Defendants are restrained from taking any action to remove minor children who are in ORR custody w/o providing 48 hrs advance notice. The injunction is in effect until 10am on Thursday, 7/19/2018. (Order to follow.) (lan)
July 17, 2018 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Scott Alan Rosenberg for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc)
July 16, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 16, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (jgo).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401213888)Document filed by H.M.C., N.T.C..(pc) (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.T.C. et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.M.C.
Represented By: Scott Alan Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory Paul Copeland
Represented By: Jennifer L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.T.C.
Represented By: Scott Alan Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory Paul Copeland
Represented By: Sarah Telo Gillman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?