Acker et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Richard Burban, Miroslaw Chrostowski, Michael Dee, Landon Goodleaf, Tomar Johnson, David Green, Martha Hoyos, Robert Albano, Jerzy Choromanski, George Freyre, Krystyna Huryn, Doretta Fabbri, Jerzy Drazek, Rafael Hernandez, Julia Giambrone, Peter Carretta, Waldemar Balcer, Janusz Huss, Olanrewaju Ayinde, Gregory Elyashkevich, Henry Acker, Ricardo Espinoza, Albert Benzaquen, Beatriz Carvajal, Michael Brumer, Anna Gorska, Maritza Iglesia, John Bosee, Dmitri Arshavsky, James Impastato, James Eisert, Ramiro Ayala, Gwendoyn James, Paul Dantona, Jan Glowczynski, Joseph Delre, Dewayne Catterton, Janusz Kowalewski, Brewster Paley, Mykhaylo Vynar, Eric Schnellbacher, Maria Sander, Andrew Obszanski, Dariusz Nosorowski, Corenelius Miles, Lorraine Miller, Fern Parness, Rudolf Pisarcik, Miroslav Zuscak, Anthony Rafaniello, David Rivera, Shaukat Khan, Piotr Rzasa, Zanon Skardow, Antoni Wilinski, Jozef Terejko, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Dennis Kelly, Robert Marchak, Volodymyr Zarytskyy, Bogumil Olszewski, Gerald Logan, James Rossiter, Lara Roth-Biester, Dalila Ramos, Alexandra Muszak, Eileen Rawlinson, Victor Zapata, Michael Wade, Roman Kaczowska, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Joseph Rabito, Lawrence Levine, Robert Yuknavech, Jan Wojdyla, Rosa Valentin, Wieslaw Mroz, Jan Welenc, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Joseph Rizzo, Hanna Pieczynska, Adam Rozanski, Zbigniew Sosnowski, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, Gwendolyn James, Mykola Uglyk, Richard Lee, Silvia Tineo, Waldemar Ropel, Rajka Rajacic, Nancy Nina, Francisca Martinez, Dinorah Mejia, Mieczyslaw Sowa, Deighton Cleve Taylor, Janusz Maciejaszek, Melvyn Richard Williams, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Bogumil Wojcicki, Michael Valentino, Zbyszek Szalaj, Khalil Mrabet, Samuel Taylor Seawright, Daniel Shaufler, Marialisa Zywotchenko, Jacek Tyminski, Krzysztof Turowski, Robert Rzasa, Larysa Prokhna, Delfin Polanco, Tomasz Siemiatkowski, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Jerzy Maslinski, Vincent Pastore, Peter Mikes, Mario Persichilli, Henry Podkowa, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Irena Perzynska, Maria Moreno, Luis O'Campo, Thomas Warner, Ephanis Wright, Jerzy Stefanski, Andrzej Szplitgejber, David Zimmer, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan, Robert Mauceri, Leslie E. Weinberg, Jan Strohbach, Nadir Zouak, Waldemar Strojek, Dariusz Wyszomirski, Boguslaw Zalewski, Andrzej Mulka, Zdzislaw Usewicz, Michael Delfino, Robert W. Warrington, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski, Melvin Weiner, Demetrius Samad Jopoulos, Loretta O'Donnell and Esardai S. Sewdass
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv06922
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 22, 2018 re: (29 in 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 69 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 22 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN, 59 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 626 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 69 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 391 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN, 62 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 579 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 30 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN, 36 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN, 1024 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 817 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 91 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 607 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 4077 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 450 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN, 392 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 33 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN, 90 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 56 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN) LETTER MOTION for Discovery re Confidentiality Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated July 31, 2018. . Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jerzy Maslinski, Janusz Maciejaszek, Rafael Hernandez, Dennis Kelly, Rajka Rajacic, Paul Dantona, Fern Parness, Joseph Rizzo, Joseph Delre, Anthony Rafaniello, Loretta O'Donnell, Nancy Nina, Peter Carretta, Eric Schnellbacher, Lorraine Miller, Dariusz Nosorowski, Julia Giambrone, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Brewster Paley, Miroslaw Chrostowski, Joseph Rabito, Krystyna Huryn, Landon Goodleaf, Jan Glowczynski, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Hanna Pieczynska, Maria Moreno, Robert Albano, Michael Delfino, Corenelius Miles, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Maria Sander, Robert Rzasa, Dalila Ramos, Jerzy Choromanski, Alexandra Muszak, Gwendolyn James, Robert Marchak, Rudolf Pisarcik, Ricardo Espinoza, Piotr Rzasa, Lawrence Levine, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Andrzej Mulka, Tomar Johnson, James Rossiter, Gregory Elyashkevich, Peter Mikes, Richard Lee, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, Irena Perzynska, John Bosee, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Adam Rozanski, Olanrewaju Ayinde, Jerzy Drazek, David Green, Albert Benzaquen, George Freyre, David Rivera, Janusz Huss, Robert Mauceri, Janusz Kowalewski, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Richard Burban, Mario Persichilli, Maritza Iglesia, Waldemar Ropel, Luis O'Campo, Bogumil Olszewski, Lara Roth-Biester, Beatriz Carvajal, Wieslaw Mroz, Michael Dee, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Henry Acker, Dinorah Mejia, Shaukat Khan, Larysa Prokhna, Roman Kaczowska, Doretta Fabbri, Francisca Martinez, James Impastato, Martha Hoyos, Eileen Rawlinson, Anna Gorska, Andrew Obszanski, Delfin Polanco, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Khalil Mrabet, James Eisert, Dewayne Catterton, Waldemar Balcer, Dmitri Arshavsky, Gerald Logan, Michael Brumer, Ramiro Ayala, Henry Podkowa, Vincent Pastore, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. Document filed by Jerzy Maslinski; Jan Strohbach; Janusz Maciejaszek; Rafael Hernandez; Dennis Kelly; Rajka Rajacic; Paul Dantona; Zbigniew Sosnowski; Fern Parness; Nadir Zouak; Thomas Warner; Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski; Joseph Rizzo; Joseph Delre; Anthony Rafaniello; Loretta O'Donnell; Nancy Nina; Peter Carretta; Leslie E. Weinberg; Eric Schnellbacher; Lorraine Miller; Dariusz Wyszomirski; Dariusz Nosorowski; Julia Giambrone; Mykola Uglyk; Jozef Terejko; Wladyslaw Kwasnik; Zanon Skardow; Brewster Paley; Miroslaw Chrostowski; Joseph Rabito; Krystyna Huryn; Landon Goodleaf; Rosa Valentin; Jan Glowczynski; Candida Perdomo Ramirez; Jacek Tyminski; Hanna Pieczynska; Tomasz Siemiatkowski; Maria Moreno; Robert Albano; Michael Delfino; Waldemar Strojek; Corenelius Miles; Arkadiusz Orlowski; Maria Sander; Silvia Tineo; Robert Rzasa; Krzysztof Turowski; Daniel Shaufler; Esardai S. Sewdass; Dalila Ramos; Jerzy Choromanski; Alexandra Muszak; Gwendolyn James; Robert Marchak; Rudolf Pisarcik; Ricardo Espinoza; Piotr Rzasa; Melvin Weiner; Lawrence Levine; Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton; Andrzej Mulka; Samuel Taylor Seawright; Tomar Johnson; James Rossiter; Gregory Elyashkevich; Peter Mikes; Richard Lee; Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez; Irena Perzynska; Andrzej Szplitgejber; Ephanis Wright; Michael Wade; John Bosee; Sylwester Kurpiewski; Adam Rozanski; Olanrewaju Ayinde; Jerzy Drazek; David Green; Albert Benzaquen; George Freyre; Melvyn Richard Williams; David Rivera; Mieczyslaw Sowa; Janusz Huss; Robert Mauceri; Jerzy Stefanski; Deighton Cleve Taylor; Janusz Kowalewski; Eva Salapa-Dawdo; Richard Burban; Jan Welenc; Mario Persichilli; Maritza Iglesia ; Waldemar Ropel; Luis O'Campo; Bogumil Olszewski; David Zimmer; Lara Roth-Biester; Beatriz Carvajal; Marialisa Zywotchenko; Wieslaw Mroz; Michael Dee; Zdzislaw Usewicz; Victor Zapata; Volodymyr Romanchuk; Henry Acker; Dinorah Mejia; Shaukat Khan; Larysa Prokhna; Roman Kaczowska; Boguslaw Zalewski; Demetrius Samad Jopoulos; Doretta Fabbri; Francisca Martinez; Volodymyr Zarytskyy; Jan Wojdyla; James Impastato; Martha Hoyos; Eileen Rawlinson; Miroslav Zuscak; Anna Gorska; Andrew Obszanski; Bogumil Wojcicki; Delfin Polanco; Robert Yuknavech; Oleksiy Miroshnychenko; Khalil Mrabet; Antoni Wilinski; James Eisert; Michael Valentino; Dewayne Catterton; Mykhaylo Vynar; Waldemar Balcer; Dmitri Arshavsky; Gerald Logan; Michael Brumer; Ramiro Ayala; Robert W. Warrington; Henry Podkowa; Zbyszek Szalaj; Vincent Pastore; Wanda Roguso-Sheehan. (Grochow, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina waiver sent on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. Document filed by Jerzy Maslinski; Jan Strohbach; Janusz Maciejaszek; Rafael Hernandez; Dennis Kelly; Rajka Rajacic; Paul Dantona; Zbigniew Sosnowski; Fern Parness; Nadir Zouak; Thomas Warner; Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski; Joseph Rizzo; Joseph Delre; Anthony Rafaniello; Loretta O'Donnell; Nancy Nina; Peter Carretta; Leslie E. Weinberg; Eric Schnellbacher; Lorraine Miller; Dariusz Wyszomirski; Dariusz Nosorowski; Julia Giambrone; Mykola Uglyk; Jozef Terejko; Wladyslaw Kwasnik; Zanon Skardow; Brewster Paley; Miroslaw Chrostowski; Joseph Rabito; Krystyna Huryn; Landon Goodleaf; Rosa Valentin; Jan Glowczynski; Candida Perdomo Ramirez; Jacek Tyminski; Hanna Pieczynska; Tomasz Siemiatkowski; Maria Moreno; Robert Albano; Michael Delfino; Waldemar Strojek; Corenelius Miles; Arkadiusz Orlowski; Maria Sander; Silvia Tineo; Robert Rzasa; Krzysztof Turowski; Daniel Shaufler; Esardai S. Sewdass; Dalila Ramos; Jerzy Choromanski; Alexandra Muszak; Gwendolyn James; Robert Marchak; Rudolf Pisarcik; Ricardo Espinoza; Piotr Rzasa; Melvin Weiner; Lawrence Levine; Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton; Andrzej Mulka; Samuel Taylor Seawright; Tomar Johnson; James Rossiter; Gregory Elyashkevich; Peter Mikes; Richard Lee; Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez; Irena Perzynska; Andrzej Szplitgejber; Ephanis Wright; Michael Wade; John Bosee; Sylwester Kurpiewski; Adam Rozanski; Olanrewaju Ayinde; Jerzy Drazek; David Green; Albert Benzaquen; George Freyre; Melvyn Richard Williams; David Rivera; Mieczyslaw Sowa; Janusz Huss; Robert Mauceri; Jerzy Stefanski; Deighton Cleve Taylor; Janusz Kowalewski; Eva Salapa-Dawdo; Richard Burban; Jan Welenc; Mario Persichilli; Maritza Iglesia ; Waldemar Ropel; Luis O'Campo; Bogumil Olszewski; David Zimmer; Lara Roth-Biester; Beatriz Carvajal; Marialisa Zywotchenko; Wieslaw Mroz; Michael Dee; Zdzislaw Usewicz; Victor Zapata; Volodymyr Romanchuk; Henry Acker; Dinorah Mejia; Shaukat Khan; Larysa Prokhna; Roman Kaczowska; Boguslaw Zalewski; Demetrius Samad Jopoulos; Doretta Fabbri; Francisca Martinez; Volodymyr Zarytskyy; Jan Wojdyla; James Impastato; Martha Hoyos; Eileen Rawlinson; Miroslav Zuscak; Anna Gorska; Andrew Obszanski; Bogumil Wojcicki; Delfin Polanco; Robert Yuknavech; Oleksiy Miroshnychenko; Khalil Mrabet; Antoni Wilinski; James Eisert; Michael Valentino; Dewayne Catterton; Mykhaylo Vynar; Waldemar Balcer; Dmitri Arshavsky; Gerald Logan; Michael Brumer; Ramiro Ayala; Robert W. Warrington; Henry Podkowa; Zbyszek Szalaj; Vincent Pastore; Wanda Roguso-Sheehan. (Grochow, Robert)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michael K. Kellogg dated August 14, 2018 re: Document Production Status. Document filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to carefully review the Court's July 10, 2018 Amended Order in its entirety. By August 17, 2018, the plaintiffs are ORDERED to terminate 40 plaintiffs from this action and file an Amended Saudi Arabia Short Form Complaint substantially in the form attached as Exhibit B to the Court's July 10, 2018 Amended Order. The Amended Saudi Arabia Short Form Complaint may not include more than 100 plaintiffs. The plaintiffs are free to file claims on behalf of the terminated plaintiffs in a separate action in accordance with the Court's July 10, 2018 Amended Order. If they do so, the plaintiffs must also submit a letter to the Honorable George B. Daniels and the Honorable Sarah Netburn, docketed in the MDL, requesting that the new action be made part of the MDL. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/9/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN. (ras) Modified on 8/9/2018 (ras).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo) Modified on 8/29/2018 (sjo). (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/29/2018) (sjo).
August 9, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
August 9, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 9, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 9, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (dnh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA; SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Henry Acker, Robert Albano, Dmitri Arshavsky, Ramiro Ayala, Olanrewaju Ayinde, Waldemar Balcer, Albert Benzaquen, John Bosee, Michael Brumer, Richard Burban, Peter Carretta, Beatriz Carvajal, Dewayne Catterton, Jerzy Choromanski, Miroslaw Chrostowski, Paul Dantona, Michael Dee, Michael Delfino, Joseph Delre, Jerzy Drazek, James Eisert, Gregory Elyashkevich, Ricardo Espinoza, Doretta Fabbri, George Freyre, Julia Giambrone, Jan Glowczynski, Landon Goodleaf, Anna Gorska, David Green, Rafael Hernandez, Martha Hoyos, Krystyna Huryn, Janusz Huss, Maritza Iglesia, James Impastato, Gwendolyn James, Tomar Johnson, Roman Kaczowska, Dennis Kelly, Shaukat Khan, Janusz Kowalewski, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Richard Lee, Lawrence Levine, Gerald Logan, Janusz Maciejaszek, Robert Marchak, Francisca Martinez, Jerzy Maslinski, Robert Mauceri, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Dinorah Mejia, Peter Mikes, Corenelius Miles, Lorraine Miller, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Maria Moreno, Khalil Mrabet, Wieslaw Mroz, Andrzej Mulka, Alexandra Muszak, Nancy Nina, Dariusz Nosorowski, Luis O'Campo, Loretta O'Donnell, Andrew Obszanski, Bogumil Olszewski, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Brewster Paley, Fern Parness, Vincent Pastore, Mario Persichilli, Irena Perzynska, Hanna Pieczynska, Rudolf Pisarcik, Henry Podkowa, Delfin Polanco, Larysa Prokhna, Joseph Rabito, Anthony Rafaniello, Rajka Rajacic, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, Dalila Ramos, Eileen Rawlinson, David Rivera, Joseph Rizzo, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Waldemar Ropel, James Rossiter, Lara Roth-Biester, Adam Rozanski, Piotr Rzasa, Robert Rzasa, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Demetrius Samad Jopoulos, Maria Sander, Eric Schnellbacher, Samuel Taylor Seawright, Esardai S. Sewdass, Daniel Shaufler, Tomasz Siemiatkowski, Zanon Skardow, Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski, Zbigniew Sosnowski, Mieczyslaw Sowa, Jerzy Stefanski, Jan Strohbach, Waldemar Strojek, Zbyszek Szalaj, Andrzej Szplitgejber, Deighton Cleve Taylor, Jozef Terejko, Silvia Tineo, Krzysztof Turowski, Jacek Tyminski, Mykola Uglyk, Zdzislaw Usewicz, Rosa Valentin, Michael Valentino, Mykhaylo Vynar, Michael Wade, Thomas Warner, Robert W. Warrington, Leslie E. Weinberg, Melvin Weiner, Jan Welenc, Antoni Wilinski, Melvyn Richard Williams, Bogumil Wojcicki, Jan Wojdyla, Ephanis Wright, Dariusz Wyszomirski, Robert Yuknavech, Boguslaw Zalewski, Victor Zapata, Volodymyr Zarytskyy, David Zimmer, Nadir Zouak, Miroslav Zuscak, Marialisa Zywotchenko. (Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Henry Acker, Robert Albano, Dmitri Arshavsky, Ramiro Ayala, Olanrewaju Ayinde, Waldemar Balcer, Albert Benzaquen, John Bosee, Michael Brumer, Richard Burban, Peter Carretta, Beatriz Carvajal, Dewayne Catterton, Jerzy Choromanski, Miroslaw Chrostowski, Paul Dantona, Michael Dee, Michael Delfino, Joseph Delre, Jerzy Drazek, James Eisert, Gregory Elyashkevich, Ricardo Espinoza, Doretta Fabbri, George Freyre, Julia Giambrone, Jan Glowczynski, Landon Goodleaf, Anna Gorska, David Green, Rafael Hernandez, Martha Hoyos, Krystyna Huryn, Janusz Huss, Maritza Iglesia, James Impastato, Gwendolyn James, Tomar Johnson, Roman Kaczowska, Dennis Kelly, Shaukat Khan, Janusz Kowalewski, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Richard Lee, Lawrence Levine, Gerald Logan, Janusz Maciejaszek, Robert Marchak, Francisca Martinez, Jerzy Maslinski, Robert Mauceri, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Dinorah Mejia, Peter Mikes, Corenelius Miles, Lorraine Miller, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Maria Moreno, Khalil Mrabet, Wieslaw Mroz, Andrzej Mulka, Alexandra Muszak, Nancy Nina, Dariusz Nosorowski, Luis O'Campo, Loretta O'Donnell, Andrew Obszanski, Bogumil Olszewski, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Brewster Paley, Fern Parness, Vincent Pastore, Mario Persichilli, Irena Perzynska, Hanna Pieczynska, Rudolf Pisarcik, Henry Podkowa, Delfin Polanco, Larysa Prokhna, Joseph Rabito, Anthony Rafaniello, Rajka Rajacic, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, Dalila Ramos, Eileen Rawlinson, David Rivera, Joseph Rizzo, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Waldemar Ropel, James Rossiter, Lara Roth-Biester, Adam Rozanski, Piotr Rzasa, Robert Rzasa, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Demetrius Samad Jopoulos, Maria Sander, Eric Schnellbacher, Samuel Taylor Seawright, Esardai S. Sewdass, Daniel Shaufler, Tomasz Siemiatkowski, Zanon Skardow, Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski, Zbigniew Sosnowski, Mieczyslaw Sowa, Jerzy Stefanski, Jan Strohbach, Waldemar Strojek, Zbyszek Szalaj, Andrzej Szplitgejber, Deighton Cleve Taylor, Jozef Terejko, Silvia Tineo, Krzysztof Turowski, Jacek Tyminski, Mykola Uglyk, Zdzislaw Usewicz, Rosa Valentin, Michael Valentino, Mykhaylo Vynar, Michael Wade, Thomas Warner, Robert W. Warrington, Leslie E. Weinberg, Melvin Weiner, Jan Welenc, Antoni Wilinski, Melvyn Richard Williams, Bogumil Wojcicki, Jan Wojdyla, Ephanis Wright, Dariusz Wyszomirski, Robert Yuknavech, Boguslaw Zalewski, Victor Zapata, Volodymyr Zarytskyy, David Zimmer, Nadir Zouak, Miroslav Zuscak, Marialisa Zywotchenko.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Michael Delfino added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Michael Delfino. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Allen Grochow. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gwendolyn James. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Allen Grochow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 18:2333; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Michael Delfino; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Nadir Zouak, Boguslaw Zalewski, Marialisa Zywotchenko, David Zimmer, Victor Zapata, Miroslav Zuscak, Volodymyr Zarytskyy added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Nadir Zouak, Boguslaw Zalewski, Marialisa Zywotchenko, David Zimmer, Victor Zapata, Miroslav Zuscak, Volodymyr Zarytskyy. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Rosa Valentin, Krzysztof Turowski, Andrzej Szplitgejber, Ephanis Wright, Melvyn Richard Williams, Mykhaylo Vynar, Thomas Warner, Mykola Uglyk, Jan Welenc, Robert W. Warrington, Robert Yuknavech, Antoni Wilinski, Bogumil Wojcicki, Silvia Tineo, Dariusz Wyszomirski, Deighton Cleve Taylor, Michael Wade, Michael Valentino, Jan Wojdyla, Melvin Weiner, Leslie E. Weinberg, Jacek Tyminski, Jozef Terejko, Zdzislaw Usewicz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Rosa Valentin, Krzysztof Turowski, Andrzej Szplitgejber, Ephanis Wright, Melvyn Richard Williams, Mykhaylo Vynar, Thomas Warner, Mykola Uglyk, Jan Welenc, Robert W. Warrington, Robert Yuknavech, Antoni Wilinski, Bogumil Wojcicki, Silvia Tineo, Dariusz Wyszomirski, Deighton Cleve Taylor, Michael Wade, Michael Valentino, Jan Wojdyla, Melvin Weiner, Leslie E. Weinberg, Jacek Tyminski, Jozef Terejko, Zdzislaw Usewicz. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mieczyslaw Sowa, Dalila Ramos, Waldemar Strojek, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Zbigniew Sosnowski, Eileen Rawlinson, Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski, Zbyszek Szalaj, Tomasz Siemiatkowski, Rajka Rajacic, Daniel Shaufler, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Jan Strohbach, Eric Schnellbacher, Lara Roth-Biester, James Rossiter, Waldemar Ropel, Adam Rozanski, Esardai S. Sewdass, Joseph Rizzo, Demetrius Samad Jopoulos, Piotr Rzasa, Zanon Skardow, Maria Sander, Jerzy Stefanski, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Samuel Taylor Seawright, Robert Rzasa, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, David Rivera, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Mieczyslaw Sowa, Dalila Ramos, Waldemar Strojek, Volodymyr Romanchuk, Zbigniew Sosnowski, Eileen Rawlinson, Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski, Zbyszek Szalaj, Tomasz Siemiatkowski, Rajka Rajacic, Daniel Shaufler, Candida Perdomo Ramirez, Jan Strohbach, Eric Schnellbacher, Lara Roth-Biester, James Rossiter, Waldemar Ropel, Adam Rozanski, Esardai S. Sewdass, Joseph Rizzo, Demetrius Samad Jopoulos, Piotr Rzasa, Zanon Skardow, Maria Sander, Jerzy Stefanski, Eva Salapa-Dawdo, Samuel Taylor Seawright, Robert Rzasa, Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez, David Rivera, Wanda Roguso-Sheehan. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Andrzej Mulka, Luis O'Campo, Alexandra Muszak, Joseph Rabito, Maria Moreno, Larysa Prokhna, Khalil Mrabet, Rudolf Pisarcik, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Bogumil Olszewski, Loretta O'Donnell, Brewster Paley, Delfin Polanco, Dariusz Nosorowski, Irena Perzynska, Fern Parness, Anthony Rafaniello, Hanna Pieczynska, Mario Persichilli, Henry Podkowa, Vincent Pastore, Wieslaw Mroz, Nancy Nina, Andrew Obszanski added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Andrzej Mulka, Luis O'Campo, Alexandra Muszak, Joseph Rabito, Maria Moreno, Larysa Prokhna, Khalil Mrabet, Rudolf Pisarcik, Arkadiusz Orlowski, Bogumil Olszewski, Loretta O'Donnell, Brewster Paley, Delfin Polanco, Dariusz Nosorowski, Irena Perzynska, Fern Parness, Anthony Rafaniello, Hanna Pieczynska, Mario Persichilli, Henry Podkowa, Vincent Pastore, Wieslaw Mroz, Nancy Nina, Andrew Obszanski. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 2, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Dinorah Mejia, Jerzy Maslinski, Janusz Kowalewski, Gerald Logan, Peter Mikes, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Roman Kaczowska, Dennis Kelly, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Lorraine Miller, Robert Mauceri, Corenelius Miles, Robert Marchak, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Shaukat Khan, Janusz Maciejaszek, Francisca Martinez, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Lawrence Levine, Richard Lee added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Dinorah Mejia, Jerzy Maslinski, Janusz Kowalewski, Gerald Logan, Peter Mikes, Sylwester Kurpiewski, Roman Kaczowska, Dennis Kelly, Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton, Lorraine Miller, Robert Mauceri, Corenelius Miles, Robert Marchak, Wladyslaw Kwasnik, Shaukat Khan, Janusz Maciejaszek, Francisca Martinez, Oleksiy Miroshnychenko, Lawrence Levine, Richard Lee. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 1, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anna Gorska, Janusz Huss, David Green, Julia Giambrone, Jan Glowczynski, Gwendoyn James, Rafael Hernandez, Landon Goodleaf, James Impastato, Maritza Iglesia, Tomar Johnson, Krystyna Huryn, Martha Hoyos added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Anna Gorska, Janusz Huss, David Green, Julia Giambrone, Jan Glowczynski, Gwendoyn James, Rafael Hernandez, Landon Goodleaf, James Impastato, Maritza Iglesia, Tomar Johnson, Krystyna Huryn, Martha Hoyos. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Grochow, Robert)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grochow, Robert)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA; SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Henry Acker, Robert Albano, Dmitri Arshavsky, Ramiro Ayala, Olanrewaju Ayinde, Waldemar Balcer, Albert Benzaquen, John Bosee, Michael Brumer, Richard Burban, Peter Carretta, Beatriz Carvajal, Dewayne Catterton, Jerzy Choromanski, Miroslaw Chrostowski, Paul Dantona, Michael Dee, Joseph Delre, Jerzy Drazek, James Eisert, Gregory Elyashkevich, Ricardo Espinoza, Doretta Fabbri, George Freyre. (Grochow, Robert) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jgo).
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15395555)Document filed by Peter Carretta, Jerzy Drazek, Albert Benzaquen, George Freyre, Robert Albano, James Eisert, Henry Acker, Paul Dantona, Gregory Elyashkevich, Dewayne Catterton, Doretta Fabbri, Waldemar Balcer, Dmitri Arshavsky, Michael Brumer, Beatriz Carvajal, Joseph Delre, Jerzy Choromanski, Miroslaw Chrostowski, John Bosee, Ramiro Ayala, Ricardo Espinoza, Richard Burban, Michael Dee, Olanrewaju Ayinde.(Grochow, Robert) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acker et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Burban
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslaw Chrostowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Goodleaf
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomar Johnson
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Green
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hoyos
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Albano
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Choromanski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Freyre
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystyna Huryn
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretta Fabbri
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Drazek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Giambrone
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Carretta
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldemar Balcer
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janusz Huss
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olanrewaju Ayinde
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Elyashkevich
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Acker
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Espinoza
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Benzaquen
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Carvajal
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brumer
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Gorska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Iglesia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bosee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitri Arshavsky
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Impastato
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eisert
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Ayala
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendoyn James
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dantona
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Glowczynski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Delre
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Catterton
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janusz Kowalewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewster Paley
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykhaylo Vynar
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Schnellbacher
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sander
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Obszanski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dariusz Nosorowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corenelius Miles
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Miller
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Parness
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolf Pisarcik
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslav Zuscak
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rafaniello
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rivera
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaukat Khan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piotr Rzasa
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zanon Skardow
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoni Wilinski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Terejko
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Salapa-Dawdo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kelly
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marchak
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volodymyr Zarytskyy
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogumil Olszewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Logan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rossiter
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Roth-Biester
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalila Ramos
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Muszak
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Rawlinson
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Zapata
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wade
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Kaczowska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylwester Kurpiewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rabito
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Levine
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Yuknavech
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Wojdyla
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Valentin
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wieslaw Mroz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Welenc
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelma Ann Mckenzie-Singleton
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rizzo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Pieczynska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Rozanski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbigniew Sosnowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volodymyr Romanchuk
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidalilia Maria Gomez Ramirez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn James
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykola Uglyk
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Tineo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldemar Ropel
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajka Rajacic
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Nina
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Martinez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinorah Mejia
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mieczyslaw Sowa
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deighton Cleve Taylor
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janusz Maciejaszek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Richard Williams
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleksiy Miroshnychenko
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogumil Wojcicki
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Valentino
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbyszek Szalaj
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalil Mrabet
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor Seawright
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Shaufler
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marialisa Zywotchenko
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacek Tyminski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krzysztof Turowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rzasa
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larysa Prokhna
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfin Polanco
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomasz Siemiatkowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Perdomo Ramirez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Maslinski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Pastore
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mikes
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Persichilli
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Podkowa
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkadiusz Orlowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irena Perzynska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Moreno
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis O'Campo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Warner
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ephanis Wright
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Stefanski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrzej Szplitgejber
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zimmer
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Roguso-Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mauceri
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie E. Weinberg
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Strohbach
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadir Zouak
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldemar Strojek
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dariusz Wyszomirski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boguslaw Zalewski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrzej Mulka
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zdzislaw Usewicz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Delfino
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Warrington
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wladyslaw Kwasnik
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugeniusz Skrzeczkowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Weiner
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Samad Jopoulos
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta O'Donnell
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esardai S. Sewdass
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?