Abustan et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Marek Obrycki, Ralph Demarco, Gerard Klein Jr., Chief Michael O'Connor, Maria Agudelo, Luis Calle, Ludavina Feliz, Police Officer Carl Soreco, Luz Hoyos, Joseph Dispenza, James Marks, Dean Yanopulos, Louis Coleman, Jose Garcia, Louis Poli, Edictrudis Morales, Laura Pryor, Ray Carrero, Perry Lee Anderson Fabio Arevalo, Clive Boxhill, Adefunke Omobowale, Enrique Santos, John Williams, P.O. James Diaz, Henry Perez, Kassahun Negash, Liza Gecaj, Michael Diaz-Reyes, Loretta Dunn, Radames Velez, Raymond Trapani, Richard Metz, Gustavo Parra, Joseph Buccello, Martin Sollowen, Shakeer Alli, Belinda Peterkin, Joseph Pellicone, Keith Eckels, Murray Murad, Kurt Endelmann, Angel Lopez, Luis Yumbla, Kevin Kennison, Thomas Gillmore, Carlos Correa, Theodore Ubilla, Rodolfo Abustan, Freddy Fernandez, Carmen Jimenez, Roberto Rodriguez, Rory McGrath, Teresita Cayetano, Frank McCrea, Rudy Washington, Nelson Velasquez, Thomas Leprine, Douglas Campbell, Bernard Aden, Jose LanFranco, Ricardo Clarke, Thomas Gargiulo, Alan Wiltshire, Carlos Ogono, Cynthia Belzai, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Cynthia Delancey, John Mingione, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Wojciech Opoka, Robert Francis, Luis Velez, Gail Goodman, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Dennis Ryan, Wojciech Olkowicz, Alan Grande, Maria Guzman, Jaime Corcho, Ana Martinez, Sgt. Michael Ryan, Audrey McFadden, James Dykes, Anthony Bearese Cedric Bellamy, Elida Arias, Kenny Williams, Guy St. Clair, Joey Perez, Ismael Quinones, Annette Boyd, Alberto Lopez, Howard Campbell Abraham Campoverde, Francis Flynn, Bienvenido Rivera, Edward Washington, Aurea Negron, Edward Marengo, Paul Woitovich, Anthony Grogan, Victor Figueroa, Rosa Tineo, Michael Hinphy, Floradell Harrison, Carmelita Williams, Virginia Villa, Donald Collins, John Scirica, Patricia Dillon, Thomas Lane, Fitzroy Watts, Rohan Black, Antonia Delgado, Andrew Bondi, Evangeline Credell, Carmen Fruto, Eugene Banner, Martin Levine, Gerard Brown, Anthony Detoma, Perry Lee Anderson, Abraham Campoverde, Fabio Arevalo, Cedric Bellamy, Anthony Bearese, Howard Campbell and Patricia Dillon,as surviving spouse and Personal Representative of the Estate of James Dillon
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Case Number: 1:2018cv07030
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 14, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by James Diaz, Anthony Detoma, Louis Poli, Thomas Leprine, John Williams, Audrey McFadden, Rosa Tineo, Elida Arias, Michael O'Connor, Jaime Corcho, Martin Sollowen, Luis Calle, Rory McGrath, Gerard Brown, Fabio Arevalo, Francis Flynn, Floradell Harrison, Wojciech Opoka, John Mingione, Carlos Correa, Michael Ryan, Luz Hoyos, Thomas Lane, Virginia Villa, Dean Yanopulos, Edward Washington, Ismael Quinones, Raymond Trapani, Belinda Peterkin, Ralph Demarco, Alan Wiltshire, Joseph Dispenza, Cynthia Belzai, Laura Pryor, Abraham Campoverde, Aurea Negron, Radames Velez, Thomas Gargiulo, Henry Perez, Bienvenido Rivera, Kassahun Negash, Luis Velez, Alberto Lopez, Cynthia Delancey, Thomas Gillmore, Kurt Endelmann, Martin Levine, John Scirica, Paul Woitovich, Carmen Jimenez, Freddy Fernandez, Rohan Black, Annette Boyd, Cedric Bellamy, Carlos Ogono, Alan Grande, Gerard Klein Jr., Michael Hinphy, Guy St. Clair, Richard Metz, Angel Lopez, Robert Francis, Joseph Pellicone, Murray Murad, Douglas Campbell, Howard Campbell, Jose LanFranco, Maria Guzman, Edward Marengo, Frank McCrea, James Marks, Bernard Aden, Joseph Buccello, Rodolfo Abustan, Luis Yumbla, Joey Perez, Antonia Delgado, Carl Soreco, Rudy Washington, Wojciech Olkowicz, Donald Collins, Evangeline Credell, Patricia Dillon, Adefunke Omobowale, Edictrudis Morales, Ludavina Feliz, Anthony Bearese, Clive Boxhill, Carmelita Williams, Ana Martinez, Kevin Kennison, Liza Gecaj, Louis Coleman, Theodore Ubilla, Anthony Grogan, Teresita Cayetano, Perry Lee Anderson, Kenny Williams, Marek Obrycki, Ray Carrero, Victor Figueroa, Carmen Fruto, Ricardo Clarke, Andrew Bondi, Nelson Velasquez, Enrique Santos, Gustavo Parra, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Loretta Dunn, Dennis Ryan, Fitzroy Watts, Gail Goodman, Jose Garcia, Eugene Banner, Keith Eckels, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Maria Agudelo, Michael Diaz-Reyes, James Dykes, Roberto Rodriguez, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Shakeer Alli, Patricia Dillon,as surviving spouse and Personal Representative of the Estate of James Dillon.(Grey, Robert)
September 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Robert Elliot Grey. The following parties have been removed from this case: Perry Lee Anderson Fabio Arevalo, Anthony Bearese Cedric Bellamy, Howard Campbell Abraham Campoverde. The parties were added to the case in error. (pne)
September 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Grey to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 Complaint,,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Patricia Dillon must be added to CM ECF a second time, with party text "as surviving Spouse and Personal Representative of the Estate of James Dillon"; all filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
September 14, 2018 Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk. Transmitted re: #5 Notice of Application to Reopen Case, Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement, #4 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,, #6 Complaint,,,,,,,, Case Reopened, Case Designated ECF, #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification,, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Statement of Relatedness,,,,,,,, Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading,,, Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet, Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice,, Add Party for Pleading,,,,,,,,, to Attorney Services/Help Desk for case processing. (pne)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by James Diaz, Anthony Detoma, Louis Poli, Thomas Leprine, John Williams, Audrey McFadden, Rosa Tineo, Elida Arias, Michael O'Connor, Jaime Corcho, Martin Sollowen, Luis Calle, Rory McGrath, Gerard Brown, Fabio Arevalo, Francis Flynn, Floradell Harrison, Wojciech Opoka, John Mingione, Carlos Correa, Michael Ryan, Luz Hoyos, Thomas Lane, Virginia Villa, Dean Yanopulos, Edward Washington, Ismael Quinones, Raymond Trapani, Belinda Peterkin, Ralph Demarco, Alan Wiltshire, Joseph Dispenza, Cynthia Belzai, Laura Pryor, Abraham Campoverde, Aurea Negron, Radames Velez, Thomas Gargiulo, Henry Perez, Bienvenido Rivera, Kassahun Negash, Luis Velez, Alberto Lopez, Cynthia Delancey, Thomas Gillmore, Kurt Endelmann, Martin Levine, John Scirica, Paul Woitovich, Carmen Jimenez, Freddy Fernandez, Rohan Black, Cedric Bellamy, Annette Boyd, Carlos Ogono, Alan Grande, Gerard Klein Jr., Michael Hinphy, Guy St. Clair, Richard Metz, Angel Lopez, Robert Francis, Joseph Pellicone, Murray Murad, Douglas Campbell, Howard Campbell, Jose LanFranco, Maria Guzman, Edward Marengo, Frank McCrea, James Marks, Bernard Aden, Joseph Buccello, Rodolfo Abustan, Luis Yumbla, Joey Perez, Antonia Delgado, Carl Soreco, Rudy Washington, Wojciech Olkowicz, Donald Collins, Evangeline Credell, Patricia Dillon, Adefunke Omobowale, Edictrudis Morales, Ludavina Feliz, Anthony Bearese, Clive Boxhill, Carmelita Williams, Ana Martinez, Kevin Kennison, Liza Gecaj, Louis Coleman, Theodore Ubilla, Anthony Grogan, Teresita Cayetano, Perry Lee Anderson, Kenny Williams, Marek Obrycki, Ray Carrero, Victor Figueroa, Carmen Fruto, Ricardo Clarke, Andrew Bondi, Nelson Velasquez, Enrique Santos, Gustavo Parra, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Loretta Dunn, Dennis Ryan, Fitzroy Watts, Anthony Bearese Cedric Bellamy, Gail Goodman, Jose Garcia, Eugene Banner, Keith Eckels, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Maria Agudelo, Michael Diaz-Reyes, James Dykes, Roberto Rodriguez, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Shakeer Alli.(Grey, Robert) Modified on 9/14/2018 (pne).
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Grey, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 10/15/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/17) (laq)
August 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
August 15, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (laq)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03mdl1570. Document filed by Rodolfo Abustan, Bernard Aden, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Maria Agudelo, Shakeer Alli, Perry Lee Anderson, Fabio Arevalo, Elida Arias, Eugene Banner, Anthony Bearese, Cedric Bellamy, Cynthia Belzai, Rohan Black, Andrew Bondi, Clive Boxhill, Annette Boyd, Gerard Brown, Joseph Buccello, Luis Calle, Douglas Campbell, Howard Campbell, Abraham Campoverde, Ray Carrero, Teresita Cayetano, Ricardo Clarke, Louis Coleman, Donald Collins, Jaime Corcho, Carlos Correa, Evangeline Credell, Cynthia Delancey, Antonia Delgado, Ralph Demarco, Anthony Detoma, James Diaz, Michael Diaz-Reyes, Patricia Dillon, Joseph Dispenza, Loretta Dunn, James Dykes, Keith Eckels, Kurt Endelmann, Ludavina Feliz, Freddy Fernandez, Victor Figueroa, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Francis Flynn, Robert Francis, Carmen Fruto, Jose Garcia, Thomas Gargiulo, Liza Gecaj, Thomas Gillmore, Gail Goodman, Alan Grande, Anthony Grogan, Maria Guzman, Floradell Harrison, Michael Hinphy, Luz Hoyos, Carmen Jimenez, Kevin Kennison, Gerard Klein Jr., Jose LanFranco, Thomas Lane, Thomas Leprine, Martin Levine, Alberto Lopez, Angel Lopez, Edward Marengo, James Marks, Ana Martinez, Frank McCrea, Audrey McFadden, Rory McGrath, Richard Metz, John Mingione, Edictrudis Morales, Murray Murad, Kassahun Negash, Aurea Negron, Michael O'Connor, Marek Obrycki, Carlos Ogono, Wojciech Olkowicz, Adefunke Omobowale, Wojciech Opoka, Gustavo Parra, Joseph Pellicone, Henry Perez, Joey Perez, Perry Lee Anderson Fabio Arevalo, Belinda Peterkin, Louis Poli, Laura Pryor, Ismael Quinones, Bienvenido Rivera, Roberto Rodriguez, Dennis Ryan, Michael Ryan, Enrique Santos, John Scirica, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Martin Sollowen, Carl Soreco, Guy St. Clair, Rosa Tineo, Raymond Trapani, Theodore Ubilla, Nelson Velasquez, Luis Velez, Radames Velez, Virginia Villa, Edward Washington, Rudy Washington, Fitzroy Watts, Carmelita Williams, John Williams, Kenny Williams, Alan Wiltshire, Paul Woitovich, Dean Yanopulos, Luis Yumbla.(Grey, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grey, Robert)
August 14, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,.Document filed by James Diaz, Anthony Detoma, Louis Poli, Thomas Leprine, John Williams, Audrey McFadden, Rosa Tineo, Elida Arias, Michael O'Connor, Jaime Corcho, Martin Sollowen, Luis Calle, Rory McGrath, Gerard Brown, Francis Flynn, Floradell Harrison, Wojciech Opoka, John Mingione, Carlos Correa, Michael Ryan, Luz Hoyos, Thomas Lane, Virginia Villa, Dean Yanopulos, Edward Washington, Ismael Quinones, Raymond Trapani, Belinda Peterkin, Ralph Demarco, Alan Wiltshire, Joseph Dispenza, Cynthia Belzai, Laura Pryor, Aurea Negron, Radames Velez, Thomas Gargiulo, Henry Perez, Bienvenido Rivera, Kassahun Negash, Luis Velez, Alberto Lopez, Cynthia Delancey, Thomas Gillmore, Kurt Endelmann, Martin Levine, John Scirica, Paul Woitovich, Carmen Jimenez, Freddy Fernandez, Rohan Black, Annette Boyd, Carlos Ogono, Alan Grande, Gerard Klein Jr., Michael Hinphy, Guy St. Clair, Richard Metz, Angel Lopez, Robert Francis, Joseph Pellicone, Murray Murad, Douglas Campbell, Jose LanFranco, Maria Guzman, Edward Marengo, Frank McCrea, James Marks, Bernard Aden, Joseph Buccello, Rodolfo Abustan, Luis Yumbla, Joey Perez, Antonia Delgado, Carl Soreco, Rudy Washington, Wojciech Olkowicz, Donald Collins, Evangeline Credell, Patricia Dillon, Adefunke Omobowale, Edictrudis Morales, Ludavina Feliz, Clive Boxhill, Carmelita Williams, Ana Martinez, Kevin Kennison, Liza Gecaj, Louis Coleman, Theodore Ubilla, Anthony Grogan, Teresita Cayetano, Kenny Williams, Marek Obrycki, Ray Carrero, Victor Figueroa, Carmen Fruto, Ricardo Clarke, Andrew Bondi, Nelson Velasquez, Enrique Santos, Gustavo Parra, Loretta Dunn, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Dennis Ryan, Fitzroy Watts, Gail Goodman, Jose Garcia, Eugene Banner, Keith Eckels, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Maria Agudelo, Michael Diaz-Reyes, James Dykes, Roberto Rodriguez, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Shakeer Alli, Cedric Bellamy, Howard Campbell, Perry Lee Anderson, Fabio Arevalo, Abraham Campoverde, Anthony Bearese. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,.(Grey, Robert)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Grey to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (second defendant must be listed). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/13/2018. (laq)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Elliot Grey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, Perry Lee Anderson, Fabio Arevalo, Anthony Bearese, Cedric Bellamy, Howard Campbell, Abraham Campoverde, Patricia Dillon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Grey. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Grey, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15411210)Document filed by James Diaz, Anthony Detoma, Louis Poli, Thomas Leprine, Abraham Campoverde, John Williams, Audrey McFadden, Rosa Tineo, Elida Arias, Michael O'Connor, Jaime Corcho, Perry Lee Anderson, Martin Sollowen, Luis Calle, Rory McGrath, Gerard Brown, Francis Flynn, Floradell Harrison, Wojciech Opoka, John Mingione, Carlos Correa, Michael Ryan, Luz Hoyos, Thomas Lane, Virginia Villa, Dean Yanopulos, Howard Campbell, Edward Washington, Ismael Quinones, Raymond Trapani, Belinda Peterkin, Cedric Bellamy, Ralph Demarco, Alan Wiltshire, Joseph Dispenza, Cynthia Belzai, Laura Pryor, Aurea Negron, Radames Velez, Thomas Gargiulo, Henry Perez, Bienvenido Rivera, Kassahun Negash, Luis Velez, Alberto Lopez, Cynthia Delancey, Thomas Gillmore, Kurt Endelmann, Martin Levine, John Scirica, Paul Woitovich, Carmen Jimenez, Freddy Fernandez, Rohan Black, Annette Boyd, Carlos Ogono, Alan Grande, Gerard Klein Jr., Michael Hinphy, Guy St. Clair, Richard Metz, Angel Lopez, Robert Francis, Joseph Pellicone, Murray Murad, Douglas Campbell, Jose LanFranco, Maria Guzman, Edward Marengo, Frank McCrea, James Marks, Bernard Aden, Joseph Buccello, Rodolfo Abustan, Luis Yumbla, Joey Perez, Antonia Delgado, Carl Soreco, Rudy Washington, Wojciech Olkowicz, Donald Collins, Evangeline Credell, James Dillon, Adefunke Omobowale, Edictrudis Morales, Ludavina Feliz, Clive Boxhill, Carmelita Williams, Ana Martinez, Kevin Kennison, Liza Gecaj, Louis Coleman, Theodore Ubilla, Anthony Grogan, Teresita Cayetano, Kenny Williams, Marek Obrycki, Ray Carrero, Victor Figueroa, Carmen Fruto, Ricardo Clarke, Andrew Bondi, Nelson Velasquez, Enrique Santos, Fabio Arevalo, Gustavo Parra, Victor Adkinson-Lamont, Loretta Dunn, Dennis Ryan, Fitzroy Watts, Anthony Bearese, Gail Goodman, Jose Garcia, Eugene Banner, Keith Eckels, Belinda Smith-Dixon, Maria Agudelo, Michael Diaz-Reyes, James Dykes, Roberto Rodriguez, Jorge Figueroa Diaz, Shakeer Alli.(Grey, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abustan et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek Obrycki
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Demarco
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Klein Jr.
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Michael O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Agudelo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Calle
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludavina Feliz
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Officer Carl Soreco
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Hoyos
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dispenza
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marks
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Yanopulos
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Coleman
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Poli
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edictrudis Morales
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Pryor
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Carrero
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lee Anderson Fabio Arevalo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clive Boxhill
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adefunke Omobowale
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Santos
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Williams
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.O. James Diaz
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Perez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassahun Negash
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Gecaj
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Diaz-Reyes
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Dunn
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radames Velez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Trapani
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Metz
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Parra
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Buccello
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sollowen
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakeer Alli
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Peterkin
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pellicone
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Eckels
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Murad
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Endelmann
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Lopez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Yumbla
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kennison
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gillmore
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Correa
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Ubilla
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Abustan
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Fernandez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Jimenez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory McGrath
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Cayetano
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank McCrea
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Washington
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Velasquez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Leprine
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Campbell
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Aden
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose LanFranco
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Clarke
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gargiulo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Wiltshire
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ogono
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Belzai
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Figueroa Diaz
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Delancey
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mingione
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Adkinson-Lamont
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wojciech Opoka
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Francis
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Velez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Goodman
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Smith-Dixon
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ryan
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wojciech Olkowicz
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Grande
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guzman
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Corcho
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Martinez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sgt. Michael Ryan
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey McFadden
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dykes
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bearese Cedric Bellamy
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Arias
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Williams
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy St. Clair
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Perez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Quinones
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Boyd
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Lopez
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Campbell Abraham Campoverde
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Flynn
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bienvenido Rivera
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Washington
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurea Negron
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Marengo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Woitovich
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Grogan
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Figueroa
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Tineo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hinphy
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floradell Harrison
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita Williams
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Villa
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Collins
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scirica
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dillon
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lane
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzroy Watts
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohan Black
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Delgado
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bondi
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangeline Credell
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Fruto
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Banner
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Levine
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Brown
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Detoma
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lee Anderson
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Campoverde
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabio Arevalo
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Bellamy
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bearese
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Campbell
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dillon,as surviving spouse and Personal Representative of the Estate of James Dillon
Represented By: Robert Elliot Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?