Cabrera v. The United States Of America
Plaintiff: Dionicio Cabrera
Defendant: The United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv07270
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: John F Keenan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The conference in this case is adjourned from October 23 to December 13, 2018 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 20-C. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/9/2018) (jca)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 20-C on October 23, 2018 at 11:00 a.m., for an initial pretrial conference, for the purpose of discussing the status of this case. This conference will not be adjourned except by order of the Court. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan). (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/14/2018) (rjm)
August 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John F. Keenan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles Finelli to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
August 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Charles Finelli to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles Finelli. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); Nature of Suit code 345 (Marine Product Liability); Dollar Demand $3,000,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 350 (Motor Vehicle); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (pc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against The United States Of America. Document filed by Dionicio Cabrera.(Finelli, Charles)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dionicio Cabrera. (Finelli, Charles) Modified on 8/14/2018 (pc).
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against The United States Of America. Document filed by Dionicio Cabrera.(Finelli, Charles) Modified on 8/14/2018 (pc).
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against The United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15439791)Document filed by Dionicio Cabrera.(Finelli, Charles) Modified on 8/14/2018 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera v. The United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionicio Cabrera
Represented By: Charles Finelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?