Avalon Holdings Corporation v. Gentile et al
Plaintiff: Avalon Holdings Corporation
Defendant: John Doe, Guy Gentile, MintBroker International, Ltd. and John Does 1 thru 10
Case Number: 1:2018cv07291
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Guy Gentile served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; MintBroker International, Ltd. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service was accepted by Defendant Guy Gentile (individually and as owner of Defendant MintBroker International, Ltd.). Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Guy Gentile, MintBroker International, Ltd..Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - SEC Form 3, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Matched Short Swing Transactions, #3 Exhibit Ex C - SEC Form 4)(Tauber, Miriam)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Guy Gentile served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Service was made by and Additionally by MAIL. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by MCHAEL C. MILLER, registered agent. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
September 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guy Gentile (c/o MintBroker International Ltd), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MintBroker International, Ltd. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service was accepted by MICHAEL C. MILLER, Registered Agent. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion to Compel. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/29/2018). *** Party John Does 1 thru 10 terminated. (ama) Modified on 8/29/2018 (ama).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Compel Clerk of the Court to Alter Case Caption By Deleting John Doe Defendants addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David Lopez dated August 28, 2018. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation.(Lopez, David)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) John Does 1 thru 10. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Lopez, David)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Vernon S. Broderick for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
August 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. MintBroker International, Ltd. served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Service was accepted by SUE ZOUKY, Agent of NYS Secretary of State. Service was made by and Additionally by MAIL. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Guy Gentile served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Service was accepted by JANE DOE and additionally. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MintBroker International, Ltd.. (dnh)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MintBroker International, Ltd.. (dnh)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guy Gentile. (dnh)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MintBroker International, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MintBroker International, Ltd. (c/o Guy Gentile), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guy Gentile, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Tauber, Miriam)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Miriam Deborah Tauber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lopez on behalf of Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Lopez, David)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Tauber, Miriam)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Guy Gentile, MintBroker International, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15442577)Document filed by Avalon Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-MintBroker SEC Form 3, #2 Exhibit B-NYSE Avalon Trading Activity, #3 Exhibit C-MintBroker SEC Forms 4)(Tauber, Miriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalon Holdings Corporation v. Gentile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avalon Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Tauber
Represented By: David Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MintBroker International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 thru 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?