Tecocoatzi-Ortiz et al v. Just Salad LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz, Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza, Diego De La Cruz Rosas, Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad, Jose Pereda Abarca, Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes, Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela, Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez, Adelaido Galeana, Reymundo Molina Medel, Anthony Peter Rosario, Neftali D Baten and Camilo Ramos Flores
Defendant: Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Nicholas F Kenner, Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC and Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv07342
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-10183-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so redesignated. (wb)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. Responses due by 10/19/2018 Return Date set for 11/8/2018 at 09:30 AM.(Miranda, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John Troy dated October 10, 2018 re: Cover Letter to Response to Defendants Letter (Dkt. No. 22). Document filed by Neftali D Baten, Diego De La Cruz Rosas, Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad, Adelaido Galeana, Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela, Reymundo Molina Medel, Jose Pereda Abarca, Camilo Ramos Flores, Anthony Peter Rosario, Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz, Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza, Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez, Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit October 5, 2018 letter, #2 Exhibit email to Chambers & Defense counsel containing October 5, 2018 letter)(Troy, John)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (Miranda, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Michael A. Miranda in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Miranda, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner.(Miranda, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael A. Miranda dated October 9, 2018 re: Response to plaintiff's letter opposing relatedness. Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner.(Miranda, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: On September 28, 2018, the Court received a letter from Defendants in the above-captioned case requesting that it be deemed related to two other cases, Jose Alvino Rea et al. v. Just Salad et al., (JGK) 15-cv-10183 and Famadou Camara et al. v. Just Salad et al., (JGK)(BCM) 16-cv-7078, which share certain parties and subject matter with the above-captioned case. Dkt. No. 22. On or before October 5, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file a letter informing the Court of any reason why these cases should not be deemed related. Alternatively, if the cases should be deemed related, Plaintiffs shall explain why they did not designate the later matter as related when they filed their complaint. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2018) (cf)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael A. Miranda dated September 28, 2018 re: request to have action deemed related. Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner.(Miranda, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the respective parties herein, that the time for Defendants to appear, answer or move with respect to the Complaint in this action is extended up to and including October 9, 2018. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that Defendants' will not assert any defenses based upon lack of personal service with respect to the Summons and Complaint. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that Defendants' will accept service of any amended pleadings pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 30 Rock LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 315 PAS LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 600 Third LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 663 Lex LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 8th St LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad GP LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad Herald Square LLC answer due 10/9/2018; Just Salad Hudson Square LLC answer due 10/9/2018. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/5/2018) (js)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (Miranda, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Miranda on behalf of Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (Miranda, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption. If all parties and party text do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Pereda Abarca; Just Salad LLC; Just Salad 600 Third LLC; Just Salad GP LLC; Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC; Just Salad Partners LLC; Just Salad 315 PAS LLC; Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC; Just Salad 30 Rock LLC; Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC; Just Salad WWP LLC; Just Salad 663 Lex LLC; Just Salad Park Slope LLC; Just Salad 8th St LLC; Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC; Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC; Just Salad Hudson Square LLC; Just Salad State Street LLC; Just Salad Herald Square LLC; Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC; Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC; Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC; Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC; Just Salad Woodbury LLC; Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC; Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC; Nicholas F Kenner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Reymundo Molina Medel.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Anthony Peter Rosario.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Camilo Ramos Flores.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jose Pereda Abarca.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Adelaido Galeana.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Neftali D Baten.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Diego De La Cruz Rosas.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz.(Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JUST SALAD LLC d/b/a Just Salad; JUST SALAD 600 THIRD LLC d/b/a Just Salad Murray Hill; JUST SALAD GP LLC d/b/a Just Salad Fashion District; JUST SALAD 134 37TH ST. LLC d/b/a Just Salad Fashion District; JUST SALAD PARTNERS LLC d/b/a Just Salad Financial District; JUST SALAD 315 PAS LLC d/b/a Just Salad 315 Park Ave South; JUST SALAD 320 PARK AVE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Park Avenue; JUST SALAD 30 ROCK LLC d/b/a Just Salad 30 Rock; JUST SALAD 706 6TH AVE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Chelsea; JUST SALAD WWP LLC d/b/a Just Salad World Wide Plaza; JUST SALAD 663 LEX LLC d/b/a Just Salad Lexington; JUST SALAD PARK SLOPE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Park Slope; JUST SALAD 8TH ST LLC d/b/a Just Salad 8th Street (NYU); JUST SALAD 1471 3RD AVE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Upper East Side (83rd and 3rd); JUST SALAD 1ST AVENUE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Upper East Side (70th and 1st); JUST SALAD HUDSON SQUARE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Hudson Square; JUST SALAD STATE STREET LLC d/b/a Just Salad Downtown Brooklyn; JUST SALAD HERALD SQUARE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Macys Herald Square; JUST SALAD 90 BROAD STREET LLC d/b/a Just Salad Financial District (90 Broad Street); JUST SALAD 2056 BROADWAY LLC d/b/a Just Salad Upper West Side; JUST SALAD 140 8TH AVE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Chelsea (8th Ave); JUST SALAD 233 BROADWAY LLC d/b/a Just Salad City Hall; JUST SALAD WOODBURY LLC d/b/a Just Salad Woodbury; JUST SALAD 291 7TH AVENUE LLC d/b/a Just Salad FIT; JUST SALAD 437 5TH AVENUE LLC d/b/a Just Salad Bryant Park; NICHOLAS F KENNER, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Neftali D Baten, Diego De La Cruz Rosas, Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad, Adelaido Galeana, Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela, Reymundo Molina Medel, Jose Pereda Abarca, Camilo Ramos Flores, Anthony Peter Rosario, Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz, Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza, Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez, Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes. (Troy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John) Modified on 8/15/2018 (jgo).
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC, Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC, Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC, Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC, Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC, Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 30 Rock LLC, Just Salad 315 PAS LLC, Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC, Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC, Just Salad 600 Third LLC, Just Salad 663 Lex LLC, Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC, Just Salad 8th St LLC, Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC, Just Salad GP LLC, Just Salad Herald Square LLC, Just Salad Hudson Square LLC, Just Salad LLC, Just Salad Park Slope LLC, Just Salad Partners LLC, Just Salad State Street LLC, Just Salad WWP LLC, Just Salad Woodbury LLC, Nicholas F Kenner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15449392)Document filed by Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez, Camilo Ramos Flores, Adelaido Galeana, Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz, Diego De La Cruz Rosas, Jose Pereda Abarca, Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad, Neftali D Baten, Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza, Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela, Reymundo Molina Medel, Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes, Anthony Peter Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Consent to Sue Form, #4 Exhibit 04 Just Salad Interstate Purchase of Ingredients, #5 Exhibit 05 Just Salad NYC Locations, #6 Exhibit 06 Tough Love is Hard to Give Nick Kenner Firing Manager)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecocoatzi-Ortiz et al v. Just Salad LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Tecocoatzi-Ortiz
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernaldo Tlaczani Carranza
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego De La Cruz Rosas
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Dositeo Encalada Abad
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Pereda Abarca
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Zempoalteca Montes
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Jofree Lema Mayancela
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Raul Zapotitlan Sanchez
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaido Galeana
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reymundo Molina Medel
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Peter Rosario
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neftali D Baten
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilo Ramos Flores
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 90 Broad Street LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 140 8th Ave LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 8th St LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 663 Lex LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 315 PAS LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 437 5th Avenue LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 320 Park Ave LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad State Street LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 30 Rock LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad Hudson Square LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad GP LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad Park Slope LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 291 7th Avenue LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad Herald Square LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad Partners LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 706 6th Ave LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas F Kenner
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 134 37th St. LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 2056 Broadway LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad Woodbury LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 233 Broadway LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 600 Third LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad WWP LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 1st Avenue LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Salad 1471 3rd Ave LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?