Cruz v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cruz
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Bayer AG, BAYER : HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER : PHARMA AG, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Corporation, BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 1:2018cv07695
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Louisiana acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:18-cv-08670, filed on 09/24/2018. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Louisiana. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Louisiana. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/5/2018) (sjo)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Martin Covey on behalf of Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (Covey, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company.(Covey, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent OMJ PR Holdings for Janssen Ortho LLC; Corporate Parent Centocor Research & Development, Inc. for Janssen Research & Development LLC; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company.(Covey, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/28/2018) (kgo)
August 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 28, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 28, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 16cv1088 and declined by Judge Ronnie Abrams and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rothman, Alan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rothman, Alan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent NippoNex Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer Medical Care Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer West Coast Corporation, Corporate Parent Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Dr. Scholl's LLC, Corporate Parent Coppertone LLC, Corporate Parent MiraLAX LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare US Funding LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer Essure Inc. for Bayer Healthcare LLC. Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC.(Rothman, Alan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rothman, Alan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155851-18..Document filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Verified Complaint for Index No. 155851-18), #2 Exhibit B (Consent to Notice of Removal))(Rothman, Alan)
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Edward Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF docket entry text so the subject of the exhibit is clear. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alan Edward Rothman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: previously filed case number was entered in the wrong section of the civil cover sheet; Docket Number 16CV1088 is not a civil case now pending in S.D.N.Y. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alan Edward Rothman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Edward Rothman. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
August 24, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly similar to 16CV1088. (pne)
August 24, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 24, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alan Edward Rothman to RE-FILE Document #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Doc#'s 1-6 served on Michael A. London, Esq. & David Covey, Esq. on 8/23/2018. Service was made by FedEx. Document filed by BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Rothman, Alan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG, Other Affiliate German Aktiengesellschaft, Other Affiliate Bayer Healthcare LLC for BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC. Document filed by BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC.(Rothman, Alan) Modified on 8/24/2018 (lb).
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding LP, Other Affiliate Bayer AG, Other Affiliate Bayer Corporation, Other Affiliate German Aktiengesellschaft for Bayer Corporation. Document filed by Bayer Corporation.(Rothman, Alan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Edward Rothman on behalf of BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Rothman, Alan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-01088 (RA). Document filed by BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC, Bayer Corporation.(Rothman, Alan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rothman, Alan) Modified on 8/24/2018 (pne).
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: Case Number: Index# 155851/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15488264).Document filed by BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rothman, Alan) Modified on 8/24/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Represented By: David Martin Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER : HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER : PHARMA AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER : HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: David Martin Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David Martin Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Alan Edward Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: David Martin Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?