Adler v. Payward, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert C. Adler
Defendant: Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken and Payward, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08100
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Christoper N. LaVigne dated 11/1/2018 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Payward, Inc..(Lavigne, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including November 1, 2018. No Provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken hereby expressly reserves, any and all defenses. So Ordered. (Payward, Inc. answer due 11/1/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/19/18) (yv)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Payward, Inc.. (Lavigne, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Payward, Inc. (Lavigne, Christopher) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/18/2018 (km).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Christoper N. LaVigne dated 10/18/2018 re: Extension of Time to Respond. Document filed by Payward, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Lavigne, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Payward, Inc..(Lavigne, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Christopher Ludemann on behalf of Payward, Inc.. (Ludemann, Adam)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Norman Lavigne on behalf of Payward, Inc.. (Lavigne, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher Lavigne to RE-FILE Document #14 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken. (km)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Marion, Roger) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Roger K. Marion in Support re: #6 Notice (Other),. Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clerks Certificate of Default with Acknowledgement of Service)(Marion, Roger)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Request for the Clerk's Issuance of a Certificate of Default with Supporting Affidavit. Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgement of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Marion, Roger)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Payward, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. Service was accepted by Pam Merkadeau, Esq., In-House Counsel of Payward, Inc.. Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Marion, Roger)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marion, Roger)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Payward, Inc.. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roger Keith Marion. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1410000000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Roger Keith Marion. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roger Keith Marion. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Payward, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Payward, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Marion, Roger)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15533485)Document filed by Robert C. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Employment Contract)(Marion, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adler v. Payward, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payward, Inc. d/b/a Kraken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payward, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Ludemann
Represented By: Christopher Norman Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Adler
Represented By: Roger Keith Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?