Segarra v. Delta Airlines, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ferdinand Segarra
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Delta Airlines, Inc, XYZ Corporations and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv08135
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/2/2018. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) (Daniels, Anthony)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application denied. The Court grants leave for another attorney from Mr. James's firm to appear in his stead. That attorney should file a notice of appearance prior to the initial pretrial conference, and must be prepared to discuss all issues with respect to this matter. In the event that no other attorney at Mr. James's firm is available, Mr. James may reapply for an adjournment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/31/2018) (anc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 10/30/2018. Document filed by Ferdinand Segarra.(James, Lawrence)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 10/30/2018 re: Pretrial Conference Adjournment Request. Document filed by Ferdinand Segarra.(James, Lawrence)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael Maragoudakis dated October 26, 2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.(Maragoudakis, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/17/2018) (anc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Ferdinand Segarra(James, Lawrence)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 09/25/2018 filed by Ferdinand Segarra. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline to demand a jury trial is extended to October 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/28/2018) (anc)
September 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lawrence P. James to RE-FILE Document #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 09/25/2018. ERROR(S): Incomplete Document (i.e., No Parties, No Case Number, No Signature or S/). (db)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 09/25/2018. Document filed by Ferdinand Segarra. Return Date set for 10/4/2018 at 10:00 AM.(James, Lawrence) Modified on 9/26/2018 (db).
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence P. James on behalf of Ferdinand Segarra. (James, Lawrence)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application denied. As of September 20, 2018, Mr. James has not filed a notice of appearance in this case, and may not speak on behalf of Plaintiff. In its September 7, 2018 order, Dkt. No. 6, the Court directed Plaintiff's counsel to promptly file a notice of appearance, and directed Plaintiff to submit any jury demand by September 20, 2018. Neither has been filed. The Court orders Plaintiff to comply with its September 7, 2018 order forthwith. If Plaintiff wishes to file an untimely request for an extension of the deadline for filing a jury demand, he must do so through counsel who has appeared in this case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/20/2018) (mro)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Lawrence James dated 09/20/2018. Document filed by Ferdinand Segarra. Return Date set for 10/4/2018 at 10:00 AM.(James, Lawrence)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.(Martinez, Louis)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County on September 6, 2018. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than September 20, 2018. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc. is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/7/2018) (mro)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Other Initiating Documents served on FERDINAND SEGARRA on 09/07/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. (Maragoudakis, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Robert Martinez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G Maragoudakis on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Maragoudakis, Michael)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.(Martinez, Louis)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Martinez, Louis)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28555-2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15537229).Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- CSC Service of Process Receipt, #2 Exhibit B- Summons and Complaint)(Martinez, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segarra v. Delta Airlines, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferdinand Segarra
Represented By: Lawrence P. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Louis Robert Martinez
Represented By: Michael G Maragoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?