Shanahan et al v. Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Walsh and Laura Shanahan
Defendant: Imerys USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Brenntag North America, Johnson & Johnson, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc. and Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08317
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Little, Brendan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Thomas P. Kurland in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, October 3, 2018 deposition of Plaintiff Laura Shanahan (Excerpts), #2 Exhibit B, Transcript of the June 20, 2018 oral argument (Excerpts))(Kurland, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 THIRD RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc..(Pelliccio, Richard)
October 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard John Pelliccio to RE-FILE Document #28 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (The docket text that was entered for the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement docket entry is not consistent with the information on the PDF.) (lb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Knowlton Development Corp for Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.. Document filed by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc..(Pelliccio, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2018 (lb).
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Knowlton Development Corp for Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.. Document filed by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc..(Pelliccio, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2018 (lb).
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc..(Pelliccio, Richard)
October 12, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Brendan Little in Support re: #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Little, Brendan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh. (Little, Brendan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh.(Little, Brendan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan E. Little on behalf of Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh. (Little, Brendan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Stephen Kozak on behalf of Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Kozak, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne Micheline Ratcliffe on behalf of Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh. (Ratcliffe, Suzanne)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Michael Russo on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Russo, Louis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Robert Kuszmerski on behalf of Brenntag North America, Brenntag Specialties, Inc.. (Kuszmerski, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to October 25, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. until Oct. 25, 2018 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Richard J. Pelliccio, Esq. dated September 26, 2018. Document filed by Kolmar Laboratories, Inc..(Pelliccio, Richard)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard John Pelliccio on behalf of Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.. (Pelliccio, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/18/2018) (jca)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Sapon on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Imerys USA, Inc.. (Sapon, Andrew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert L'Homme on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Imerys USA, Inc.. (L'Homme, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert L'Homme on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Imerys USA, Inc.. (L'Homme, Michael)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Paul G. Gardephe is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 190330/2018..Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Levy Standard Asbestos Complaint for Personal Injury, #3 Exhibit C - Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - Shanahan State Court File)(Kurland, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Attorneys for Plaintiffs and Attorneys for Defendants on September 13, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kurland, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190330/2018..Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Levy Standard Asbestos Complaint for Personal Injury, #3 Exhibit C, Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D, Shanahan State Court File)(Kurland, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Laura Shanahan, Vincent Walsh, Imerys Talc America, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Metropolitan Talc, American Talc, Resource Processors, Inc. and Charles Mathieu, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Kurland, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas Philip Kurland to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party names on attached rider do not exactly match as listed on initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Philip Kurland to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Imerys Talc America, Inc. with party text 'as successor-in-interest to Metropolitan Talc, American Talc, Resource Processors, Inc. and Charles Mathieu, Inc.'; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to pleading must be labeled. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Kurland, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson.(Kurland, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Kurland, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson.(Kurland, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jgo).
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190330/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15561706).Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanahan et al v. Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Louis Michael Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America
Represented By: Daniel Robert Kuszmerski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Louis Michael Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Robert Kuszmerski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Sapon
Represented By: Michael Robert L'Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Richard John Pelliccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Walsh
Represented By: Brendan E. Little
Represented By: Suzanne Micheline Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Shanahan
Represented By: Brendan E. Little
Represented By: Suzanne Micheline Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?