Edward v. The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Edward
Defendant: The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations and Uthman Mohammed
Case Number: 1:2018cv08381
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Scott A. Harford dated November 2, 2018 re: Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Harford, Scott)
October 30, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Uthman Mohammed served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward. (Harford, Scott)
October 5, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations served on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Service was accepted by Yinka N.. Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward. (Harford, Scott)
September 20, 2018 8 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Pretrial Conference, One copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, Electronic Case Filing Instructions, Individual Rules of Practice of Judge Paul G. Gardephe, Individual Rules of Practice of Magistrate Judge Debra Freem mailed to H.E. Geoffrey Onyeama, Ministry of Foreign Affairs at Tafawa Balewa House, Federal Secretariat, Central Business District, Abuja, Nigeria on 09/20/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 7732 7196 5093, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc)
September 19, 2018 7 Featured Case NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2018) (cf)
September 17, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Uthman Mohammed. (pne)
September 17, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations. (pne)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott A. Harford. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1364; Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1391; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
September 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 14, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Uthman Mohammed, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward. (Harford, Scott)
September 14, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward. (Harford, Scott)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harford, Scott)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Uthman Mohammed, The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15569825)Document filed by Jennifer A. Edward.(Harford, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward v. The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Edward
Represented By: Scott A. Harford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanent Mission of Nigeria to the United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uthman Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?