Williams v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gashia Williams
Defendant: Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Health Care Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08388
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
0 Judge: James L Cott
1 Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by Gashia Williams. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Hansen, Pamela)
October 24, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER: The Court directs counsel promptly to meet and confer as to next steps in this multi-district litigation. The Court asks counsel to consider whether, as in the earlier multi-district litigation involving Mirena presided over by Judge Seibel, this case should now proceed to motions for summary judgment limited to the issue of general causation. A joint letter, setting forth the parties' proposal(s) as to next steps, is due Friday, November 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc)
October 24, 2018 12 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER re: (134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155,158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTIONS to exclude testimony filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Bayer's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' seven general-causation witnesses, and denies, as potentially moot, plaintiffs' motions to exclude Bayer's 12 general-causation witnesses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155, 158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175. An order as to next steps in this case will follow shortly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) Modified on 10/24/2018 (anc).
September 18, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 06/23/2017) (sjo)
September 17, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. (sjo)
September 17, 2018 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer Pharma AG. (pne)
September 17, 2018 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer OY. (pne)
September 17, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 17, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Pamela VanGeffen Hansen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
September 17, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 17MD2767. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
September 14, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Pharma AG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gashia Williams. (Hansen, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer OY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gashia Williams. (Hansen, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Health Care Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gashia Williams. (Hansen, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-MD-2767. Document filed by Gashia Williams.(Hansen, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 3 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Pamela) Modified on 9/17/2018 (pne).
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer Health Care Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15570979)Document filed by Gashia Williams.(Hansen, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gashia Williams
Represented By: Pamela VanGeffen Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer OY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Health Care Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?