Taylor v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Nakia Taylor
Defendant: The City of New York, Police Officer Vincent Circosta, The New York City Police Department and Lieutenant Christopher Siani
Case Number: 1:2018cv08421
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER terminating #180 Letter Motion for Conference re: #180 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter Motion Respectfully Requesting the Court Vacate the Taxation of Costs (ECF 179) Pursuant to LR 54.1 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated August 11, 2023. In light of the pending motion for reconsideration, taxation of costs are stayed until the motion is decided. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/15/23) (yv)
August 11, 2023 Filing 180 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter Motion Respectfully Requesting the Court Vacate the Taxation of Costs (ECF 179) Pursuant to LR 54.1 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated August 11, 2023. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
August 4, 2023 Filing 179 TAXATION OF COSTS as to #146 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation,. Costs are taxed in favor of plaintiff against defendant in the amount of $10,026.48.(laq)
July 24, 2023 Filing 178 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial . . Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
June 21, 2023 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial . . Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
June 21, 2023 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Courtney F. Kane in Opposition re: #140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial .. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Trial Transcript Day 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Trial Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Trial Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Trial Exhibit 21Ai, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Trial Exhibit 21Bi, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Trial Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Trial Exhibit 21Gi, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Trial Transcript Day 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Trial Exhibit 36, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Trial Exhibits 37-42, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Trial Transcript Day 2, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Trial Transcript Day 5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - Trial Transcript Day 4).(Rohme, Cassandra)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request for an extension is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/23) (yv)
May 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/22/2023, Replies due by 7/22/2023. (yv)
May 16, 2023 Filing 174 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Defendants' Post Trial Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Courtney F. Kane dated 05/16/2023. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Kane, Courtney)
May 15, 2023 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. Corrected Filing of May 12, 2023 Reply. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Rohme, Cassandra)
May 15, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #171 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. Refile and link to #119 MOTION. (db)
May 13, 2023 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #121 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Declaration and Exhibits. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Rohme, Cassandra)
May 13, 2023 Filing 171 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Cassandra Rohme in Support re: #121 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Declaration and Exhibits.. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Rohme, Cassandra) Modified on 5/15/2023 (db).
May 12, 2023 Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #124 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Second Amended Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
April 29, 2023 Filing 169 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. Ex. G to Faddis Decl.. Document filed by Christopher Siani, Nakia Taylor. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #134 .(Faddis, Hannah)
April 29, 2023 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #120 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law. . Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Faddis, Hannah)
April 29, 2023 Filing 167 DECLARATION of Hannah V. Faddis in Opposition re: #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel.. Document filed by Christopher Siani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Exhibit Ex E, #6 Supplement Ex F, #7 Exhibit Ex I).(Faddis, Hannah)
April 28, 2023 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial . . Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
April 28, 2023 Filing 165 DECLARATION of Nicolette Pellegrino in Support re: #140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . MOTION for New Trial .. Document filed by Christopher Siani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Trial Transcript), #2 Exhibit B (Trial Exhibit C-2), #3 Exhibit C (Trial Exhibit E-3), #4 Exhibit D (Trial Exhibit 21A-i), #5 Exhibit E (Trial Exhibit 29), #6 Exhibit F (Trial Exhibit E-2), #7 Exhibit G (November 30, 2022 Final Pre Trial Transcript), #8 Exhibit H (excerpts from Lt. Siani's July 2, 2019 Deposition Transcript), #9 Exhibit I (proposed Trial Exhibit M, a screen grab), #10 Exhibit J (cover sheet only concerning proposed Trial Exhibit M, a video), #11 Exhibit K (Trial Exhibit K1), #12 Exhibit L (Trial Exhibit K2), #13 Exhibit M (Trial Exhibit K3)).(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
April 7, 2023 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/16/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/16/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara Beiter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 162 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/15/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/15/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/13/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/13/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 158 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/8/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/8/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/7/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 7, 2023 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/7/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara Beiter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. On January 17, 2023, a judgment in this case was entered following a jury trial. ECF No. 139. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed to close this case. This order is without prejudice to motions filed after judgment was entered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/17/23) (yv)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #151 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/16/2023) (vfr)
March 16, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/23/2023 Replies due by 6/9/2023. (vfr)
March 14, 2023 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #143 FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
March 10, 2023 Filing 151 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated March 10, 2023. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
February 28, 2023 Filing 150 BILL OF COSTS OBJECTIONS to re: #145 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation, #146 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation,. Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/2023) (ks)
February 17, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/11/2023 Replies due by 4/28/2023. (ks)
February 15, 2023 Filing 148 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants respectfully request an extension of time for the Defendants to file their memorandum in support of their post-trial motions and to respond to the Plaintiff's sanctions motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated February 15, 2023. Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #144 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted. Defendant shall have until March 14, 2023, to oppose Plaintiffs January 31, 2023 motion for fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/14/23) (yv)
February 14, 2023 Filing 146 BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against All Defendants. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 2/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Itemization of Costs).(Kane, Courtney)
February 14, 2023 Filing 145 BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against All Defendants. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 2/28/2023.(Kane, Courtney)
February 14, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/14/2023 (yv)
February 13, 2023 Filing 144 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Plaintiff's January 31, 2023 Motion for Fees addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated February 13, 2023. Document filed by Christopher Siani..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
January 31, 2023 Filing 143 FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Kane, Courtney)
January 31, 2023 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Frances Kane on behalf of Nakia Taylor..(Kane, Courtney)
January 31, 2023 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen John Liakas on behalf of Nakia Taylor..(Liakas, Stephen)
January 17, 2023 Filing 140 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ., MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 JUDGMENT. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That after a Jury Trial before the Honorable Alvin K. Hellerstein, United States District Judge, Plaintiff Nakia Taylor have judgment in the amount of $100,000.00 for compensatory damages and $250,000.00 for punitive damages as against the defendant. So Ordered., (The City of New York terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/12/23) (yv)
January 9, 2023 Filing 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/19/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 9, 2023 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/19/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 9, 2023 Filing 136 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/6/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 9, 2023 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/6/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #132 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 100-10 and 121-8. The motion to seal is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal Docket Entries Nos. 100-10 and 121-8, which shall only be viewable by Plaintiff Nakia Taylor, Defendant The City of New York, and Defendant Lieutenant Christopher Siani. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/4/2023) (jca)
December 29, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen John Liakas on behalf of Nakia Taylor..(Liakas, Stephen)
December 22, 2022 Filing 132 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 100-10 and 121-8 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated December 22, 2022. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re: #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. filed by Nakia Taylor, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. : I deferred consideration of Plaintiff's motion for sanctions until after trial. Defendant has until February 17, 2023, to file an opposition. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is to be filed by March 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 2/17/2023, Replies due by 3/3/2023.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/22) (yv)
December 21, 2022 Filing 130 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #128 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Nakia Taylor. ENDORSEMENT: Rejected. I do not accept exparte letters. See my Rule 2.E. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/22) (yv)
December 21, 2022 Filing 129 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #127 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by The City of New York, Christopher Siani. ENDORSEMENT: Rejected. I do not accept exparte letters. See my Rule 2.E. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/22) (yv)
December 21, 2022 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #121 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Declaration and Exhibits. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Defense Counsel, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of Trial Transcript, #3 Exhibit Blank Pedigree Form, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from Trial Transcript).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #123 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law., #120 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law.. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
December 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #121 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Declaration and Exhibits. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
December 20, 2022 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. Request to Strike Exhibits and Deny Motion, or Set Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
December 20, 2022 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Cassandra Rohme in Support re: #124 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Second Amended Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 125 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #124 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Second Amended Notice of Motion. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 124 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Second Amended Notice of Motion. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 123 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 122 AMENDED MOTION in Limine Notice of Motion. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 121 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Declaration and Exhibits. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 120 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 20, 2022 Filing 119 AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant and Defense Counsel. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 19, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/8/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 19, 2022 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/8/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 19, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 12/7/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 19, 2022 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 12/7/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #100 MOTION for Sanctions . ERROR(S): Supporting documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
December 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #104 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. (db)
December 15, 2022 Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 12/15/2022 re: Defendants' Letter. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 14, 2022 Filing 113 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated December 14, 2022 re: Request to Preclude Testimony Prohibited by FRCP 26b4B and to Recall Plaintiff for a Limited Purpose. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Errata Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Exhibit Ex E).(Faddis, Hannah)
December 14, 2022 Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated December 14, 2022 re: Defendants' request for an updated Electronic Device Order. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Def. Electronic Device Order)).(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
December 13, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Jury Trial held on 12/13/2022. (Court Reporter Sharonda Jones, Pam Utter) (Jones, Brigitte)
December 12, 2022 Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated December 12, 2022 re: Stipulation Regarding Respondeat Superior. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Proposed Stipulation).(Faddis, Hannah)
December 12, 2022 Filing 110 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 12/12/2022 re: Defendants' Letter. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Argument Excerpt).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 12, 2022 Filing 109 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated December 12, 2022 re: Request to Cross-Examine Plaintiff Regarding Prior Assault and to Offer Evidence of Prior Consistent Statement. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D).(Faddis, Hannah)
December 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #86 FIRST MOTION in Limine on behalf of Plaintiff. ERROR(S): (1) Motion has no signature or s/. (2) Supporting documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. First refile Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
December 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Jury Trial held on 12/8/2022. (Court Reporter Sharonda Jones, Pam Utter) (Jones, Brigitte)
December 8, 2022 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated December 7, 2022 re: Declaration Regarding Radio Runs and Scheduling of Defense Expert Witness. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration).(Faddis, Hannah)
December 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Jury Trial held on 12/7/2022. (Court Reporter Sharonda Jones, Pam Utter) (Jones, Brigitte)
December 6, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Jury Trial begun on 12/6/2022. (Court Reporter Sharonda Jones, Pam Utter) (Jones, Brigitte)
December 6, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/29/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 6, 2022 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 11/29/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 5, 2022 Filing 105 AMENDED OPPOSITION BRIEF to Defendants' Motion to Preclude. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cassandra Rohme, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F).(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 5, 2022 Filing 104 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra) Modified on 12/19/2022 (db).
December 5, 2022 Filing 103 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated December 4, 2022 re: Response in Support of Dec. 2, 2022 Request (refiled Dkt. No. 99). Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
December 5, 2022 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicolette Pellegrino dated December 2, 2022 re: MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from making arguments concerning a purported missing witness (refiled Dkt. No. 97).. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
December 5, 2022 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #100 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
December 5, 2022 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sanctions . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Cassandra Rohme, #3 Exhibit Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit Original ICAD, #5 Exhibit New ICAD, #6 Exhibit Emails, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Draft Proposed JPTO with Stipulations, #8 Exhibit Defendant Siani's Prior Lawsuits, #9 Exhibit Defendants Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit Defendant's Exchange of Disciplinary Records, #11 Exhibit Disciplinary Records obtained via FOIL).(Rohme, Cassandra) Modified on 12/19/2022 (db).
December 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nicolette Pellegrino to RE-FILE Document #97 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from making arguments concerning a purported missing witness.. Use the event type Other Filings- Other Documents found under the event list Letter. (kj)
December 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme to RE-FILE Document #98 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,. Use the event type Other Filings- Other Documents found under the event list Letter. (kj)
December 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nicolette Pellegrino to RE-FILE Document #99 Response in Support of Motion,. Use the event type Other Filings- Other Documents found under the event list Letter. (kj)
December 4, 2022 Filing 99 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #97 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from making arguments concerning a purported missing witness. . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pl. 50-H Hearing Transcript)).(Pellegrino, Nicolette) Modified on 12/5/2022 (kj).
December 3, 2022 Filing 98 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Cassandra Rohme in Opposition re: #97 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from making arguments concerning a purported missing witness.. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Cassandra Rohme, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from Def. Rule 26 Disclosure, #3 Exhibit Circosta memo book, #4 Exhibit Defendant's memo book, #5 Exhibit NYPD Complaint Report, #6 Exhibit Defendants' exchange of redacted DANY file, #7 Exhibit Page from search for witness).(Rohme, Cassandra) Modified on 12/5/2022 (kj).
December 2, 2022 Filing 97 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from making arguments concerning a purported missing witness. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette) Modified on 12/5/2022 (kj).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER terminating #92 Letter Motion for Discovery; terminating #93 Letter Motion to Compel. Several motions have been made with regard to the forthcoming trial, scheduled to begin with the selection of a jury at 10:00 am on December 6, 2022. I order as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion to postpone the trial one week is denied. The trial was set by endorsed letter of October 21, 2022 (ECF No.74). Plaintiff has had adequate notice to assure the attendance of all witness whom have been notified to appear. Plaintiff's counsel's statement of sudden illness lacks any substance or objective support and is therefore not a sufficient excuse. 2. Plaintiff's motion to introduce a statement of her treating physician Dr. Mondshine in lieu of testimony, is denied. It is too late now for deposition, and without cross examination, there is no testimony. 3. Plaintiff's motion to depose Lieutenant Schmidt is denied. I granted defendant leave to take his deposition because of the plaintiff's failure to identify the witness until the eve of the trial. I did not grant leave to the plaintiff. 4. The plaintiff seeks to present the testimony of Dr. Chaudhary on December 6, directly after the selection of jury and the opening statement. Leave is granted. 5. The clerk shall terminate ECF Nos. 92-94. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/2022) (vfr)
December 1, 2022 Filing 95 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 12/1/2022 re: #93 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to participate in the de bene esse deposition of Dr. Mondshine addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 11/30/2022. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
December 1, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 12/6/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (vfr)
November 30, 2022 Filing 94 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated November 30, 2022 re: #93 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to participate in the de bene esse deposition of Dr. Mondshine addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 11/30/2022. . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 30, 2022 Filing 93 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to participate in the de bene esse deposition of Dr. Mondshine addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cassandra Rohme dated 11/30/2022. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 29, 2022 Filing 92 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Untimely Deposition Subpoena to Non-Party Witness addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated November 29, 2022. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Schmidt Deposition Subpoena).(Faddis, Hannah)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #82 Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Nakia Taylor. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2022) (kv)
November 29, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/29/2022. (Court Reporter Pam Utter) (Jones, Brigitte)
November 28, 2022 Filing 90 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #79 MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cassandra Rohme, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I).(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 28, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicolette Pellegrino on behalf of Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Pellegrino, Nicolette)
November 28, 2022 Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Hannah V. Faddis dated November 28, 2022 re: Defendants' Request for Electronic Device Order. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Def. Electronic Device Order).(Faddis, Hannah)
November 28, 2022 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/28/2022 (km).
November 28, 2022 Filing 86 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION in Limine on behalf of Plaintiff. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motions in Limine, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Cassandra Rohme, #3 Exhibit 50-h Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Answer to Amended Complaint).(Rohme, Cassandra) Modified on 12/12/2022 (db).
November 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED ORDER TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SDNY FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL. Notice to Attorney Cassandra Rohme re: Document #87 Proposed Order, was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Order to Bring Personal Electronic Device(s) or General Purpose Computing Device(s) Into the Courthouses of the SDNY for Use in a Proceeding or Trial should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (km)
November 26, 2022 Filing 85 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 26, 2022 Filing 84 REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 26, 2022 Filing 83 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 26, 2022 Filing 82 PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL ORDER. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marked Pleadings).(Rohme, Cassandra)
November 26, 2022 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Hannah V. Faddis in Support re: #79 MOTION in Limine .. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Plaintiff Expert Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Plaintiff Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Plaintiff Response to Discovery Requests, #5 Exhibit Ex E - Pl. Dep. Tr. Ex., #6 Exhibit Ex F - Pl. Employment Rec. Response).(Faddis, Hannah)
November 26, 2022 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #79 MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 26, 2022 Filing 79 MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 25, 2022 Filing 78 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 25, 2022 Filing 77 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 25, 2022 Filing 76 REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Faddis, Hannah)
November 16, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Amy Seligman on behalf of Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Seligman, Rachel)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request is granted. The final pre-trial conference currently scheduled for November 2, 2022, is adjourned to November 29, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The trial currently scheduled to begin on November 7, 2022, is adjourned to December 6, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.)(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/21/22) (yv)
October 13, 2022 Filing 73 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Trial addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mostafa Khairy dated October 13, 2022. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Khairy, Mostafa)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #71 Motion for Cassandra Rohme to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/2022) (rro)
September 13, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 FIRST MOTION for Cassandra Rohme to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nakia Taylor. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26661876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 12, 2022 Filing 71 FIRST MOTION for Cassandra Rohme to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nakia Taylor. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26661876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. Return Date set for 9/26/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cassandra Rohme, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Rohme, Cassandra)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. The request is granted. So ordered. ( Attorney Nicholas Henry Mindicino terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/22) (yv)
June 24, 2022 Filing 69 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Nicholas Mindicino, New Attorney: Paul Prestia addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicholas Mindicino dated June 24, 2022. Document filed by Nakia Taylor..(Mindicino, Nicholas)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: On March 31, 2020, I granted the parties' request to stay the case for 90 days. The stay expired on June 29, 2020, discovery has been completed since then, and the case is scheduled for trial. Accordingly, the Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect that the case is no longer stayed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/15/2022) (tg)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #62 Motion to Substitute Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The substitution is approved. The Clerk shall terminate ECF No. 62. So ordered. Attorney Niki Renee Bargueiras terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/16/2022) (tg)
January 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 1/7/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein., Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
January 7, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Settlement Conference held on 1/7/2022. Case did not settle. Trial is set for 11/7/2022. (Jones, Brigitte)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference is scheduled to be held on January 7, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., and will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749; Access code: 7518680. Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/3/2022) (va)
December 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Settlement Conference held on 12/2/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (rsh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Settlement Conference has been rescheduled for 12/2/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's individual Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties are further instructed to submit their pre-conference submissions, along with their Attendance Acknowledgment Form (available in pdf fillable format as attachment to the Settlement Conference Procedures) no later than November 25, 2021, by 5:00 p.m.(rsh)
October 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2021 at 11:30 a.m. (rsh)
September 30, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's individual Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties are further instructed to submit their pre-conference submissions, along with their Attendance Acknowledgment Form (available in pdf fillable format as attachment to the Settlement Conference Procedures) no later than November 1, 2021, by 5:00 p.m.(rsh)
September 30, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices and Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties shall call the teleconference line at (888)-398-2342 and enter access code: 9543348.(rsh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Niki R. Bargueiras, New Attorney: Mostafa Khairy . Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(Khairy, Mostafa)
September 23, 2021 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Niki Bargueiras dated September 23, 2021 re: Reassignment of Case to a New Attorney and Scheduling Settlement Conference. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Bargueiras, Niki)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/21) (yv)
September 17, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 9/17/2021, ( Status Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) Case referred to the Magistrate for settlement. Conference with Magistrate to be held at least 30 from today. (Jones, Brigitte)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on September 17, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680 To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than September 15, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. (Telephone Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/2021) (rro)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned until September 17, 2021 at 10:00 am. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/21) (yv)
July 14, 2021 Filing 57 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Niki Bargueiras dated July 14, 2021. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Bargueiras, Niki)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for Friday, July 16, 2021, is hereby adjourned to Friday, July 23, 2021, at 10:30 a.m., which conference will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than July 19, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. Telephone Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/6/2021) (nb)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for Friday, June 17, 2021, is hereby adjourned to Friday, July 16, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., which conference will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680 To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than July 12, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/17/2021) (kv)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status conference is adjourned to June 18, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., which conference will be held via the following call-in number: call-in number: 888-363-4749, Access code: 7518680. So Ordered. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/8/21) (yv)
June 8, 2021 Filing 53 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Niki Bargueiras dated June 8, 2021. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Bargueiras, Niki)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference which was scheduled to be held on May 28, 2021 is adjourned to June 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., and will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749,Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than June 8, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/26/21) (yv)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Upon Plaintiffs' consent, time for Defendants to provide expert reports is enlarged to April 16, 2021, and time to complete expert depositions, if any, is enlarged to May 14, 2021. The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on May 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. So ordered. ( Deposition due by 5/14/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/31/21) (yv)
March 31, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (yv)
March 29, 2021 Filing 50 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Niki Bargueiras dated March 29, 2021. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Bargueiras, Niki)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties, jointly, shall agree to a schedule by which the remaining discovery items will be completed, and a Friday for the adjourned date of conference. So ordered., (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/1/21) (yv)
February 25, 2021 Filing 48 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Niki Bargueiras dated February 25, 2021. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Bargueiras, Niki)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion to Stay. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/31/20) (yv)
March 31, 2020 Filing 46 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay related to COVID-19 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Amatullah K. Booth dated March 31, 2020. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Booth, Amatullah)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall proceed as follows: Deposition due by 4/10/2020. Status Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/28/20) (yv)
February 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 2/28/2020, ( Status Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Conference. So Ordered. The timing for production of the expert report shall be discussed at the next conference. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/20/20) (yv)
February 19, 2020 Filing 43 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference concerning Settlement and an extension for Defendants to produce their expert report addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Amatullah K. Booth dated February 19, 2020. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York..(Booth, Amatullah)
January 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 1/10/2020, ( Status Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned until January 10, 2020 at 10:00 am. (Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/11/19) (yv)
December 9, 2019 Filing 41 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 3, 2020 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicholas Mindicino dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Nakia Taylor.(Mindicino, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Concerned Parties from Brigitte Jones, Courtroom Deputy by Order of Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein dated 11/21/19 re: status conf previously set for November 22, 2019 is hereby adjourned. ENDORSEMENT: You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for a status conf. Date: January 3, 2020 Time: 10:00 am Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007. It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. So Ordered., (Status Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/21/19) (yv) Modified on 12/20/2019 (yv).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference previously set for November 8, 2019 is adjourned. The parties are hereby notified that they are required to appear for a status conference on November 22, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 14D at the United States Courthouse for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/6/2019) (rjm)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Amatullah K. Booth dated 9/9/2019 re: respectfully request an enlargement of time to complete fact discovery. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. The status conf. set for 9/13/2019 is adjourned to Nov. 8, 2019. ( Fact Discovery due by 10/28/2019., Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/10/2019) (rro)
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Christopher Siani, The City of New York.(Booth, Amatullah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Christopher Siani served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. Service was accepted by John Cespedes. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Mindicino, Nicholas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Siani. (sj)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Concerned Parties from Brigitte Jones, Courtroom Deputy by Order of Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein dated 7/23/2019 re: The conf. previously set for July 26, 2019 is hereby adjourned. You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for status conf. Date: 9/13/19 Time: 10:00 a.m. Place: U.S. Courthouse - Southern District of New York 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 14D New York, New York 10007 It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Status Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/2019) (ne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIEUTENANT CHRISTOPHER SIANI, re: #31 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Mindicino, Nicholas)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Henry Mindicino to RE-FILE Document No. #32 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; you must include "c/o" or "via" on the second line of the "TO" field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIEUTENANT CHRISTOPHER SIANI, re: #31 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Mindicino, Nicholas) Modified on 7/22/2019 (sj).
July 19, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Complaint against The City of New York, Christopher Siani with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nakia Taylor. Related document: #8 Complaint.(Mindicino, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/17/2019) (ne)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SO ORDERED. The time to complete discovery is extended to September 11, 2019. The Status Conference scheduled for July 26, 2019 is adjourned to September 27, 2019, at 10 a.m. Discovery due by 9/11/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/09/2019) (ama)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings:( Status Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.), ***Hearings Terminated*** The following hearing(s) was terminated: Case Management Conference,. (ama)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicholas Mindicino dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Mindicino, Nicholas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Joint Application addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Amatullah K. Booth, Esq. dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by Vincent Circosta, The City of New York.(Booth, Amatullah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Henry Mindicino on behalf of Nakia Taylor. (Mindicino, Nicholas)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019. Upon the conclusion of non-expert discovery, counsel for the parties shall meet for at least two hours at the office of plaintiff's counsel, to discuss settlement. The date for the meeting is July 18, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Deposition due by 7/11/2019. Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, and as further set forth in this Civil Case Management Plan. So ordered.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/11/2019) (rjm)
January 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2019, ( Status Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.). (Jones, Brigitte)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #8 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #8 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Vincent Circosta, The City of New York.(Booth, Amatullah)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Denied. I am not participating in the plan for cases against n.y.c. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/6/2018) (ne) Modified on 6/6/2019 (ne).
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Enlarge the Time for Defendants to File an Answer, pursuant to the SDNY Plan Deadlines, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Amatullah K. Booth dated December 6, 2018. Document filed by The City of New York.(Booth, Amatullah)
October 31, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Vincent Circosta served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. Service was accepted by Catandella (Refused Full Name), Officer. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Abiboutros, Sara)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So ordered. The City of New York answer due 12/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2018) (ne)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2018) (ne)
October 18, 2018 Filing 18 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Sara L. AbiBoutros dated 10/18/2018 re: #17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint, #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Amatullah K. Booth dated October 17, 2018. . Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Abiboutros, Sara)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint, #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Amatullah K. Booth dated October 17, 2018. Document filed by The City of New York.(Booth, Amatullah)
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras, Clerk authorized to accept service. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Prestia, Paul)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras, Clerk Authorized To Accept. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Abiboutros, Sara)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The New York City Police Department served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. Service was accepted by P.O. Conwell. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Prestia, Paul)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent Circosta, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (dnh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Lynn Abiboutros on behalf of Nakia Taylor. New Address: Liakas Law, 65 Broadway, 13th Floor, New York, NY, 10006, 2129377765. (Abiboutros, Sara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York; The New York Police Department; and Police Officer Vincent Circosta In His Official and Individual Capacity, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Nakia Taylor. (Abiboutros, Sara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abiboutros, Sara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Nakia Taylor.(Abiboutros, Sara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Lynn Abiboutros on behalf of Nakia Taylor. (Abiboutros, Sara)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:18-cv-04414. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
September 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
September 17, 2018 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 12, 2018 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, as per Judge Carol Bagley Amon's 8/15/2018 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Change of Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404. (As per Local Civil Rule 83.1., the Clerk shall upon the expiration of seven (7) days effectuate the transfer of the case to the transferee court). Case transferred electronically to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York via CM/ECF Extract Civil Case. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Motion to Change Venue. Upon the affirmation of Paul V. Prestia, Esq., it is ORDERED, that sufficient reason having been shown, plaintiff's Motion for a Change of Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404, be granted and the above-matter be transferred to the United States District Court, Southern District of New York. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/15/2018. (As per Local Civil Rule 83.1., the Clerk shall upon the expiration of seven (7) days effectuate the transfer of the case to the transferee court) (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Second MOTION to Change Venue by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Prestia, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 : Plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with a Proposed Order transferring this case to the SDNY based on venue citing the appropriate rule of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/7/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION to Change Venue To SDNY by Nakia Taylor. (Prestia, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vincent Circosta, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Nakia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 3, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-10633479 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Amatullah Khaliha Booth
Represented By: Niki Renee Bargueiras
Represented By: Mostafa Khairy
Represented By: Niki Renee Slattery
Represented By: Rachel Amy Seligman
Represented By: Nicolette Pellegrino
Represented By: Hannah Victoria Faddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Vincent Circosta
Represented By: Amatullah Khaliha Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Christopher Siani
Represented By: Amatullah Khaliha Booth
Represented By: Niki Renee Bargueiras
Represented By: Mostafa Khairy
Represented By: Niki Renee Slattery
Represented By: Nicolette Pellegrino
Represented By: Hannah Victoria Faddis
Represented By: Rachel Amy Seligman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia Taylor
Represented By: Paul V. Prestia
Represented By: Sara Lynn Abiboutros
Represented By: Nicholas Henry Mindicino
Represented By: Cassandra Rohme
Represented By: Stephen John Liakas
Represented By: Courtney Frances Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?