Rusis et al v. International Business Machines Corp.

Plaintiff: Phil McGonegal, Henry Gerrits and Edvin Rusis
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08434
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of of Opt-In Consent Form Filing. Document filed by Henry Gerrits, Phil McGonegal, Edvin Rusis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt-In Consent Forms)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of of Opt-In Consent Form Filing. Document filed by Henry Gerrits, Phil McGonegal, Edvin Rusis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt-In Consent Forms)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion for Shannon Liss-Riordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/11/2018) (rro)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to International Business Machines Corp.. (sj)
September 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
September 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet not signed by attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edvin Rusis; Henry Gerrits; Phil McGonegal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Henry Gerrits, Phil McGonegal, Edvin Rusis. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Shannon Liss-Riordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15578131. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Shannon Liss-Riordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15578131. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry Gerrits, Phil McGonegal, Edvin Rusis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) Modified on 9/18/2018 (sj).
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15577999)Document filed by Edvin Rusis, Phil McGonegal, Henry Gerrits.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rusis et al v. International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil McGonegal
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Gerrits
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edvin Rusis
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?