Alexandria Rudolph v. Saks and Company LLC
Plaintiff: Alexandria Rudolph
Defendant: Saks and Company LLC, Hudsons Bay Company, Saks Incorporated, Lord & Taylor LLC and Saks Fifth Avenue LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08472
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Timothy J. Peter dated November 12, 2018 re: November 19, 2018 pre-trial conference. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Peter, Timothy)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #55 Amended Complaint against Hudsons Bay Company, Lord & Taylor LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Saks and Company LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. Related document: #55 Amended Complaint.(Varindani, Nina)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #73 Letter filed by Alexandria Rudolph. ENDORSEMENT: Leave granted. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint by November 12, 2018. Motion scheduling will be addressed at the November 19 conference. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2018.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/5/2018) (jwh)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Timothy J. Peter dated November 2, 2018 re: October 25, 2018 Endorsed Memo Order. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph.(Peter, Timothy)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #70 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall state unambiguously and unequivocally whether she wishes to further amend her complaint by letter filed by November 3, 2018. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/25/2018) (jwh)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Timothy J. Peter dated October 24, 2018 re: Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph.(Peter, Timothy)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gregory T. Parks dated October 18, 2018 re: pre-motion letter. Document filed by Hudsons Bay Company, Lord & Taylor LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Saks and Company LLC(a Delaware limited liability company).(Parks, Gregory)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J Peter on behalf of Alexandria Rudolph. (Peter, Timothy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Saks Incorporated waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Peter, Timothy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Saks Fifth Avenue LLC waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Peter, Timothy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lord & Taylor LLC waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Peter, Timothy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hudsons Bay Company waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Peter, Timothy)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Kristin M. Hadgis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Ezra D. Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Gregory T. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Ezra D. Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15643000. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #59 MOTION for Gregory T. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15642918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #61 MOTION for Kristin M. Hadgis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15643051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Kristin M. Hadgis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15643051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hudsons Bay Company, Lord & Taylor LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Saks and Company LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - New Jersey, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order)(Hadgis, Kristin)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Ezra D. Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15643000. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hudsons Bay Company, Lord & Taylor LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Saks and Company LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - New Jersey, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing - Louisiana, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Church, Ezra)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Gregory T. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15642918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hudsons Bay Company, Lord & Taylor LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Saks and Company LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Parks, Gregory)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nina Mahesh Varindani. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hudsons Bay Company; Lord & Taylor LLC; Saks Fifth Avenue LLC; Saks Incorporated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: It is hereby stipulated by the Parties hereto, through their respective counsel of record, as follows: 1) By October 18, 2018, Plaintiff will amend the Complaint; 2) Defendant(s) shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint within 21 days after Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint. 3) Should Defendant(s) intend to file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint other than an Answer, Defendant(s) shall file a pre-motion letter in accordance with Section 4.A of this Court's Individual Practices within 21 days after Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall respond within 4 business days of Defendant(s)' letter. 4) The parties and the Court may then address the pre-motion letter as contemplated by this Court's Individual Practices and set a briefing schedule at the Initial Pre-Trial Conference already scheduled for November 19, 2018. 5) If the Court finds that a formal motion and briefing would be appropriate, the parties would respectfully propose the following schedule: Motion and Opening Brief: December 5, 2018 Opposition to Motion Due: January 3, 2019 Reply in Support of Motion Due: January 22, 2019 (Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2018. Motions due by 12/5/2018. Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/28/2018) (jwh)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Benjamin Heikali to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Timothy J. Peter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Timothy J. Peter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15629383. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #54 MOTION for Benjamin Heikali to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15629388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Saks and Company LLC, Hudsons Bay Company, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated, Lord & Taylor LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph.(Varindani, Nina)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Benjamin Heikali to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15629388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Varindani, Nina)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Timothy J. Peter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15629383. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Varindani, Nina)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Alexandria Rudolph. (Varindani, Nina)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nina Mahesh Varindani on behalf of Alexandria Rudolph. (Varindani, Nina)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jawad B. Muaddi on behalf of Saks and Company LLC. (Muaddi, Jawad)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Saks and Company LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/19/2018) (mro)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Here, the plaintiff, Alexandria Rudolph, does not allege the citizenship of the constituent members (persons and entities) of defendant Saks & Company LLC. Within 7 days of this Order, plaintiff may serve upon the LLC an interrogatory limited to the citizenship, i.e., state (if a US citizen) or country (if not a US citizen), of all natural persons who are members of the LLC and, if a corporation is a member, the jurisdiction under whose laws it is incorporated and of the principal place of business. Defendant LLC shall have 7 days to respond to the interrogatory. Within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff shall amend its complaint to allege the citizenship of each of the constituent members of the LLC, or the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/18/2018) (jwh)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:18-cv-05107. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) #43 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 is hereby denied as moot. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR PARTIES' JOINT MOTION REQUESTING THAT THE DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 BE VACATED [filed 9/7/18; Docket No. #31 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. After considering the moving and opposing papers, and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: Plaintiff's Application is DENIED. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. correcting Reply (Motion related), #32 (Attachments: #1 Docket No. 37)(Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 #30 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION #31 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Duffy ISO Reply Brief, #2 Declaration of Anthony Longo in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #3 Declaration of Craig Slater, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 [Proposed] Order to Dismiss or Transfer re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Craig Slater in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Anthony Longo in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION of Joseph Duffy in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 #30 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joshua Nassir In Support of, #2 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin Heikali In Support Of, #2 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT SECOND JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Text Entry Order STRIKING Motion #26 . Motion hearing date is not timely. 28 days is required. Because October 8, 2018 is a Federal Court holiday, counsel may file their Motion beyond 35 days notice and set it for hearing on October 15, 2018 at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATEMENT SECOND JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 [STRICKEN] Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin Heikali In Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ENTRY ONLY ORDER STRIKING NOTICE OF MOTION AND JOINT MOTION REQUESTING THAT THE DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 BE VACATED #24 . Motion lacks required hearing date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 [stricken] Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 BE VACATED filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO, #2 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) Modified on 9/5/2018 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATEMENT SECOND JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York #18 filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF BENJAMIN HEIKALI IN SUPPORT, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC, identifying Hudson's Bay Company as Parent Company. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Joseph Duffy Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to the Southern District of New York filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anthony Longo, #3 Declaration of Jamie Rauch, #4 Declaration of Nicolette L. Young, #5 Exhibit s 1 and 2 to Young Declaration) (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Saks and Company LLC(pty:dft)) (Duffy, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATEMENT Joint Statement Concerning Local Rule 7-3 Conference filed by Defendant Saks and Company LLC (Young, Nicolette) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION #12 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO APPROVE JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING THAT DEADLINE IMPOSED UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 23-3 BE VACATED [filed 6/21/18; Docket No. #12 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court DECLINES TO APPROVE the Stipulation. However, this denial is without prejudice to the parties filing a Joint Motion seeking such relief. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Benjamin Heikali as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 1, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 17, 2018. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate The Deadline Imposed Under Civil Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. upon Saks and Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/20/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph Duffy. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-02649 JFW (SSx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05107 JFW (SSx). Signed by Judge John F. Walter (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Saks and Company LLC. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-02649-JFW-SS (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph, (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21898425 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Alexandria Rudolph. (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Alexandria Rudolph(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 9/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandria Rudolph v. Saks and Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Rudolph
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Nina Mahesh Varindani
Represented By: Timothy J Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks and Company LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Nicolette Leilani Young
Represented By: Jawad B. Muaddi
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Kristin Mckeon Hadgis
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudsons Bay Company
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Kristin Mckeon Hadgis
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks Incorporated
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Kristin Mckeon Hadgis
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord & Taylor LLC
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Kristin Mckeon Hadgis
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks Fifth Avenue LLC
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Represented By: Kristin Mckeon Hadgis
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?