Drew v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Keith Drew
Defendant: Grievance Coordinator Doe, City of New York, Captain Williams, Warden Doe, Correction Officer Gaskin, Captain Wetzel, Captain Mitchell, Grievance Officer Doe, Correction Officer Jane Doe and Correction Officer Yani
Interested Party: Corporation Counsel NYC Law Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv08529
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 11/14/18 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Keith Drew. New Address: 10 Paladino Ave., #16B, New York, NY, 10035. (sc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. Document filed by City of New York. (Wachs, Melissa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Gaskins, Yani, Williams, Mitchell. Document filed by Captain Mitchell, Captain Williams, Correction Officer Gaskin, Correction Officer Yani. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Warden Doe waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019; Captain Wetzel waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. Document filed by Warden Doe; Captain Wetzel. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
October 29, 2018 Received Return Receipt of Mail Order by Certified Mail as to NYC Law Dept. 100 Church Street New York NY 10007, which was served by Certified Mail # 7017 3040 0000 9027 8370, on 10/15/2018. (vba)
October 29, 2018 Received Return Receipt of Mail Order by Certified Mail as to NYC Law Dept. 100 Church Street New York NY 10007, which was served by Certified Mail # 7017 3040 0000 9027 8387, on 10/15/2018. (vba)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Wachs on behalf of Corporation Counsel NYC Law Department. (Wachs, Melissa)
October 10, 2018 Mailed a copy of #2 Complaint, to NYC Law Dept. 100 Church Street New York NY 10007 by Certified Mail # 7017 3040 0000 9027 8387 with Return Receipt Requested. (vba)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Keith Drew NYSID: 05797888N B&C: 349-18-04964 Anna M. Kross Center 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370, at, on 10/10/2018 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
October 10, 2018 Mailed a copy of #6 Order of Service, to NYC Law Dept. 100 Church Street New York NY 10007 by Certified Mail # 7017 3040 0000 9027 8370 with Return Receipt Requested. (vba)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that the following Defendants waive service of summons: the City of New York, Manhattan Criminal Court Correction Officers Gaskin and Yani, the Manhattan Detention Complex Warden and MDC Captains Wetzel and Williams, and AMKC Captain Mitchell. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, N.Y. 10007. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. Local Civil Rule 33.2, which requires defendants in certain types of prisoner cases to respond to specific, court-ordered discovery requests, applies to this action. Those discovery requests are available on the Court's website under "Forms" and are titled "Plaintiff's Local Civil Rule 33.2 Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents." Within 120 days of service of the complaint, Defendants must serve responses to these standard discovery requests. In their responses, Defendants must quote each request verbatim. An "Amended Complaint" form is attached to this order. SO ORDERED. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2018. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/9/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 3, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Keith Drew represented by Keith Drew NYSID: 05797888N B&C: 349-18-04964 Anna M. Kross Center 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (vba)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (anc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Keith Drew.(anc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Captain Mitchell, Captain Wetzel, Captain Williams, City of New York, Correction Officer Gaskin, Correction Officer Jane Doe, Correction Officer Yani, Grievance Coordinator Doe, Grievance Officer Doe. Document filed by Keith Drew.(anc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Keith Drew.(anc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Coordinator Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Officer Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Yani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Corporation Counsel NYC Law Department
Represented By: Melissa Wachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?