Wilmington Savings Fund Soceity, FSB v. Lee et al
Petitioner: Wilmington Savings Fund Soceity, FSB
Respondent: John Doe, Delores Lee and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv08533
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Delores Lee at 1609 Adee Avenue, First Floor Bronx, NY 10469. (arc)
November 6, 2018 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - County Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E532310016482 on 11/6/18. (yv)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Removal to this Court was improper and the case shall be remanded. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand this case to the Bronx County Supreme Court and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/5/18) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 25, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order to Show Cause to Delores Lee at 1609 Adee Avenue First Floor, Bronx, NY 10469. (arc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Accordingly, no later than 30 days from the date of this order, Defendants shall show cause as to why this matter should not be remanded to Bronx County Supreme Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/25/2018) (rj)
September 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sj)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 046798-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465407016347).Document filed by Delores Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Soceity, FSB v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Delores Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilmington Savings Fund Soceity, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?