Collins v. NEXUS Global et al
Plaintiff: jennifer Collins
Defendant: Giving Back Fund, Inc. and NEXUS Global
Case Number: 1:2018cv08812
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party in favor of Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global against Jennifer Collins. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated August 6, 2019, the only plausible inference that can be drawn from the allegations of the pleading and the affidavit and its exhibits is that Collins was dropped from the NEXUS Summit because Lindstrom told NEXUS officials that she represented a risk. Collins cannot make a federal case out of her rejection. The motion to dismiss is granted. All claims asserted against NEXUS and GBF are dismissed with prejudice and with costs to Defendants. As the claims against Lindstrom were already dismissed, and so have been stricken from the pleading at issue, there is nothing left of this case. Dismissal is with prejudice and with costs to the Defendants; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/7/2019) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(km)
August 6, 2019 Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. (mml)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING COLLINS' MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT granting #16 Motion to Dismiss; denying #19 Motion to Substitute Party. The only plausible inference that can be drawn from the allegations of the pleading and the affidavit attached thereto and its exhibits is that Collins was dropped from the NEXUS Summit because Lindstrom told NEXUS officials that she represented a risk. Collins cannot make a federal case out of her rejection. The motion to dismiss is granted. All claims asserted against NEXUS and GBF are dismissed with prejudice and with costs to Defendants. As the claims against Lindstrom were already dismissed, and so have been stricken from the pleading at issue, there is nothing left of this case. Dismissal is with prejudice and with costs to the Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the motions at Dkts. Nos. 16 and 19 from the court's list of open motions, and to close the case. This "written opinion" constitutes the decision and order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/6/2019) (mml)
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Rachel Cohen in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Asher, Monica)
January 9, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Asher, Monica)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. One page sur-reply limited to the topic noted at the bottom of this page. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/3/2019) (mml)
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to address Plaintiff's Affidavit addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Monica Asher dated January 3, 2019. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global.(Asher, Monica)
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Asher, Monica)
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF JENNIFER COLLINS IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (sc)
December 23, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIRMATION of Joshua A Douglass in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (Douglass, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 FIRST MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: NEXUS GLOBAL, New Party: JONAH WITTKAMPER . . Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Asher, Monica)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 FIRST MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: NEXUS GLOBAL, New Party: JONAH WITTKAMPER . Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Douglass, Joshua)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Asher, Monica)
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Monica S. Asher in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Asher, Monica)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global.(Asher, Monica)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global.(Asher, Monica)
November 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-06696-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Giving Back Fund, Inc. answer due 12/10/2018; NEXUS Global answer due 12/10/2018. (anc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/7/2018) (anc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Monica Asher dated November 6, 2018. Document filed by Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global.(Asher, Monica)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Giving Back Fund, Inc. served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. Service was accepted by Marc Pollick. Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (Douglass, Joshua)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. (dnh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEXUS GLOBAL and Giving Back Fund, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (Douglass, Joshua)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Alan Douglass to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Douglass, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-06696-cm. Document filed by Jennifer Collins.(Douglass, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEXUS GLOBAL and Giving Back Fund, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Collins. (Douglass, Joshua) Modified on 10/1/2018 (dnh).
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Giving Back Fund, Inc., NEXUS Global. Document filed by Jennifer Collins.(Douglass, Joshua)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Alan Douglass to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; party name on pdf 'To' section does not exactly match as listed on initial pleading; the incorrect case number is on the pdf;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 18-cv-6696. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Alan Douglass. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 443 (Civil Rights: Accomodations); Origin code 4 (Reinstated/Reopened Case); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 440 (Civil Rights: Other); the Origin code has been modified to 1 (Original Proceeding); the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Joshua Alan Douglass to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pdf case caption for the newly filed case does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua Alan Douglass to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Alan Douglass to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Christopher Rockefeller Lindstrom; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-06696-CM. Document filed by jennifer Collins.(Douglass, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2018 (jgo).
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Douglass, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2018 (jgo).
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Collins in Support re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by jennifer Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiff's Affidavit)(Douglass, Joshua)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEXUS GLOBAL and Giving Back Fund, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by jennifer Collins. (Douglass, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2018 (jgo).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15620204)Document filed by jennifer Collins.(Douglass, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. NEXUS Global et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giving Back Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Susan Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXUS Global
Represented By: Monica Susan Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jennifer Collins
Represented By: Joshua Alan Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?