Nicholas et al v. Trump et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Liane Nikitovich, Jason B. Nicholas and Kristine Rakowsky
Defendant: William B. Long and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 1:2018cv08828
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, William B. Long,, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason B. Nicholas, Liane Nikitovich, Kristine Rakowsky. (Siegel, Norman)
October 4, 2018 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman H Siegel on behalf of Jason B. Nicholas, Liane Nikitovich, Kristine Rakowsky. (Siegel, Norman)
October 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/3/2018. Plaintiffs Kristine Rakowsky and Liane Nikitovich present. AUSA Anthony Sun present. Michelle Lienao and Rick Neal on behalf of FEMA present telephonically. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (tn)
October 3, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: For the reasons set forth in Court earlier today, Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Entry 3. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/3/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
October 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (tn)
October 2, 2018 5 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: This morning, the Court became aware that it has been assigned this case, the Complaint for which was filed with a motion for a preliminary injunction on September 26, 2018. (Dkt. #1, 3). The motion requests a resolution by October 1, 2018. Upon receiving the Complaint, the Court undertook efforts to find a telephone number or email address for Plaintiffs, but was unsuccessful. Recognizing the urgency of Plaintiffs' motion, the Court schedules a conference on that motion for Wednesday, October 3, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court expects that Plaintiffs will effect service of the summons and Complaint on Defendants prior to appearing at that conference. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/2/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
September 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William B. Long, Donald J. Trump. (jgo)
September 26, 2018 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Jason B. Nicholas, Liane Nikitovich, Kristine Rakowsky. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation in Support)(jgo)
September 26, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo)
September 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against William B. Long, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401219164)Document filed by Jason B. Nicholas, Liane Nikitovich, Kristine Rakowsky.(jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liane Nikitovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Rakowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?