De'Shields v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. De'Shields
Defendant: City of New York, Captain Thomas, Correction Officer Gattor, Correction Officer Parker, Captain Smith, Correction Captain Miller, Mr. Joseph Ponte, Captain Massey and Correction Officer Christian Mizell
Interested Party: New York City Law Department Corporation Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv08885
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PHONE CONTACT NUMBER. Plaintiff informs the Court that the contact number for the purposes of legal phone calls such as a case conference with the Court is (315)287-7351. Document filed by Ronald E. De'Shields. (sc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Thomas, Smith, Massey, Parker, Gattor, Miller, Mizell. Document filed by Gattor, Massey, Miller, Christian Mizell, Parker, Smith, Thomas. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joseph Ponte waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Document filed by Joseph Ponte. (Maginley-Liddie, Lynelle)
November 9, 2018 Form Request Mailed: Request for Discovery Guide and Local Rule 33.2 Interrogatories & Requests for Production of Documents - Prisoner Cases from Ronald E. De'Shields 16-R-1590 Gouverneur Correctional Facility 112 Scotch Settlement Road Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370 mailed on 11/9/2018. (nb)
November 8, 2018 Request for Copy of Discovery Guide etc. Received: Re #9 Letter. Request for copy of Discovery Guide and formsfrom Ronald De'Shields received on 11/8/18. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
November 8, 2018 Request for Copy of Document Received: Re #9 Letter. Request for copies of discovery request responsesfrom Ronald De'Shields received on 11/8/18. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (sc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER from Ronald E. De'Shields, dated 11/5/18 re: COPIES OF DISCOVERY REQUEST. Document filed by Ronald E. De'Shields.(sc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Wachs on behalf of New York City Law Department Corporation Counsel. (Wachs, Melissa)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Ronald E. De'Shields 16-R-1590 Gouverneur Correctional Facility 112 Scotch Settlement Road Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370, at, on 10/31/2018 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to add Correction Officer Christian Mizell as a defendant under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. The Clerk of Court is further directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants City of New York, Commissioner Joseph Ponte, Captain Thomas, Captain Smith, Shield # 1217, Captain Massey, Correction Officer Parker, Correction Officer Gattor, Captain Miller, and Correction Officer Christian Mizell waive service of summons. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. Within 120 days of the date of this order, Defendants must serve responses to these standard discovery requests. In their responses, Defendants must quote each request verbatim. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Waiver of Service due by 11/29/2018.) (Christian Mizell added.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/30/2018) (rro)
October 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
October 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
October 15, 2018 Case Designated Local Rule 33.2. (ees)
October 11, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Ronald E. De'Shields 16-R-1590 Gouverneur Correctional Facility 112 Scotch Settlement Road Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370; The Superintendent Gouverneur Correctional Facility 112 Scotch Settlement Road Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370. (vba)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Ronald E. De'Shields.(vn)
September 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Gattor, Massey, Miller, Parker, Joseph Ponte, Smith, Thomas. Document filed by Ronald E. De'Shields.(vn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ronald E. De'Shields.(vn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De'Shields v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. De'Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Gattor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Captain Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Joseph Ponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Christian Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New York City Law Department Corporation Counsel
Represented By: Melissa Wachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?